This case was last updated from PACER on 07/14/2020 at 11:42:22 (UTC).

Fortinet, Inc. v. Forescout Technologies, Inc.

Case Summary

On 05/15/2020 Fortinet, Inc filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against Forescout Technologies, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Edward M. Chen. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:20-CV-03343

  • Filing Date:

    05/15/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Edward M. Chen

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Fortinet, Inc.

Defendant

Forescout Technologies, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

James Y. Pak

Attorney at Skadden Arps Slate Meagher & Flom LLP

525 University Avenue, 14Th Floor

Palo Alto, CA 94301-1908

Douglas R. Nemec

Attorney at Skadden Arps Slate Meagher & Flom LLP

One Manhattan West

New York, NY 10001

John M. Neukom

Attorney at Skadden Arps Slate Meagher & Flom LLP

525 University Avenue, Suite 1400

Palo Alto, CA 94301-1908

Leslie A. Demers

Attorney at Skadden Arps Slate Meagher & Flom LLP

One Manhattan West

New York, NY 10001

Rachel R. Blitzer

Attorney at Skadden Arps Slate Meagher & Flom LLP

One Manhattan West

New York, NY 10001

Leslie Ann Demers

Attorney at Skadden Arps Slate Meagher & Flom LLP

One Manhattan West

New York, NY 10001

Defendant Attorneys

Kimball Richard Anderson

Attorney at Winston & Strawn LLP

35 W. Wacker Drive

Chicago, IL 60601

Hyun Min Han

Attorney at Winston & Strawn LLP

800 Capital Street, Suite 2400

Houston, TX 77002

Matthew R. McCullough

Attorney at Winston & Strawn LLP

275 Middlefield Road, Suitre 205

Menlo Park, CA 94025

Katherine Vidal

Attorney at Winston & Strawn LLP

275 Middlefield Road, Suite 205

Menlo Park, CA 94025

 

Court Documents

24 #1

Proposed Order

#24

(#24) MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P.12(b)(6) filed by Forescout Technologies, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 9/10/2020 01:30 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom 05, 17th Floor before Judge Edward M. Chen. Responses due by 7/27/2020. Replies due by 8/3/2020. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Anderson, Kimball) (Filed on 7/13/2020) (Entered: 07/13/2020)

#23

(#23) Order by Judge Edward M. Chen granting #18 Motion for Pro Hac Vice.(afmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/24/2020) (Entered: 06/24/2020)

#22

(#22) Order by Judge Edward M. Chen granting #17 Motion for Pro Hac Vice.(afmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/24/2020) (Entered: 06/24/2020)

#21

(#21) Order by Judge Edward M. Chen granting #16 Motion for Pro Hac Vice.(afmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/24/2020) (Entered: 06/24/2020)

#20

(#20) Order by Judge Edward M. Chen granting #15 Motion for Pro Hac Vice.(afmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/24/2020) (Entered: 06/24/2020)

#18

(#18) MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice, (Filing Fee: $310.00, receipt number 0971-14613798) filed by Fortinet, Inc.. (Demers, Leslie) (Filed on 6/23/2020) (Entered: 06/23/2020)

#17

(#17) MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice, (Filing Fee: $310.00, receipt number 0971-14613773) filed by Fortinet, Inc.. (Blitzer, Rachel) (Filed on 6/23/2020) (Entered: 06/23/2020)

#16

(#16) MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice, (Filing Fee: $310.00, receipt number 0971-14613687) filed by Fortinet, Inc.. (Nemec, Douglas) (Filed on 6/23/2020) (Entered: 06/23/2020)

#6

(#6) Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Joint Case Management Statement due by 8/6/2020. Initial Case Management Conference set for 8/13/2020 at 9:30 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 05, 17th Floor. (tnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/18/2020) (Entered: 05/18/2020)

#4

(#4) Certificate of Interested Entities or Persons Pursuant to F.R.C.P. 7.1 and Civil L.R. 3-15 filed by Fortinet, Inc.. (Neukom, John) (Filed on 5/15/2020) (Entered: 05/15/2020)

#3

(#3) REPORT on the filing of an action regarding U.S. Patent 8,458,314, U.S. Patent 9,369,299, U.S. Patent 9,948,662 (cc: form mailed to register). (Neukom, John) (Filed on 5/15/2020) (Entered: 05/15/2020)

#2

(#2) Proposed Summons. (Neukom, John) (Filed on 5/15/2020) (Entered: 05/15/2020)

1 #4

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #3

Exhibit C

1 #2

Exhibit B

1 #1

Exhibit A

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT for Patent Infringement; Jury Trial Demanded against Forescout Technologies, Inc., (Filing Fee: $400.00, receipt number 0971-14477544). Filed by Fortinet, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(Neukom, John) (Filed on 5/15/2020) Modified on 5/18/2020 (tnS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 05/15/2020)

22 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#24) MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P.12(b)(6) filed by Forescout Technologies, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 9/10/2020 01:30 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom 05, 17th Floor before Judge Edward M. Chen. Responses due by 7/27/2020. Replies due by 8/3/2020. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Anderson, Kimball) (Filed on 7/13/2020) (Entered: 07/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#23) Order by Judge Edward M. Chen granting #18 Motion for Pro Hac Vice.(afmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/24/2020) (Entered: 06/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#22) Order by Judge Edward M. Chen granting #17 Motion for Pro Hac Vice.(afmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/24/2020) (Entered: 06/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) Order by Judge Edward M. Chen granting #16 Motion for Pro Hac Vice.(afmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/24/2020) (Entered: 06/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) Order by Judge Edward M. Chen granting #15 Motion for Pro Hac Vice.(afmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/24/2020) (Entered: 06/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) Order by Judge Edward M. Chen granting #14 Motion for Pro Hac Vice.(afmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/24/2020) (Entered: 06/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice, (Filing Fee: $310.00, receipt number 0971-14613798) filed by Fortinet, Inc.. (Demers, Leslie) (Filed on 6/23/2020) (Entered: 06/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice, (Filing Fee: $310.00, receipt number 0971-14613773) filed by Fortinet, Inc.. (Blitzer, Rachel) (Filed on 6/23/2020) (Entered: 06/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice, (Filing Fee: $310.00, receipt number 0971-14613687) filed by Fortinet, Inc.. (Nemec, Douglas) (Filed on 6/23/2020) (Entered: 06/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice, (Filing Fee: $310.00, receipt number 0971-14612645) filed by Forescout Technologies, Inc.. (Attachments: #(1) Exhibit Texas Bar Certificate of Good Standing)(Han, Hyun Min) (Filed on 6/23/2020) (Entered: 06/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 06/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew R. McCullough (McCullough, Matthew) (Filed on 6/8/2020) (Entered: 06/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE of Appearance by Katherine Vidal (Vidal, Katherine) (Filed on 6/8/2020) (Entered: 06/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Fortinet, Inc.. Forescout Technologies, Inc. served on 5/21/2020, answer due 6/11/2020. (Neukom, John) (Filed on 6/3/2020) (Entered: 06/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Summons Issued as to Defendant Forescout Technologies, Inc.. (tnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/18/2020) (Entered: 05/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Joint Case Management Statement due by 8/6/2020. Initial Case Management Conference set for 8/13/2020 at 9:30 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 05, 17th Floor. (tnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/18/2020) (Entered: 05/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2020
  • Docket(#5) Case assigned to Judge Edward M. Chen. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. (bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/15/2020) (Entered: 05/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Certificate of Interested Entities or Persons Pursuant to F.R.C.P. 7.1 and Civil L.R. 3-15 filed by Fortinet, Inc.. (Neukom, John) (Filed on 5/15/2020) (Entered: 05/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) REPORT on the filing of an action regarding U.S. Patent 8,458,314, U.S. Patent 9,369,299, U.S. Patent 9,948,662 (cc: form mailed to register). (Neukom, John) (Filed on 5/15/2020) (Entered: 05/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Proposed Summons. (Neukom, John) (Filed on 5/15/2020) (Entered: 05/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT for Patent Infringement; Jury Trial Demanded against Forescout Technologies, Inc., (Filing Fee: $400.00, receipt number 0971-14477544). Filed by Fortinet, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(Neukom, John) (Filed on 5/15/2020) Modified on 5/18/2020 (tnS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 05/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Forescout Technologies, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where Fortinet, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Rachel R. Blitzer

Latest cases represented by Lawyer James Y. Pak