This case was last updated from PACER on 02/03/2020 at 08:23:41 (UTC).

Fortin v. AT&T Services, Inc.

Case Summary

On 12/05/2019 Fortin filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against AT T Services, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Georgia Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Leigh Martin May. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-CV-05501

  • Filing Date:

    12/05/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Georgia Northern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Leigh Martin May

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Mary Jo Fortin

Defendant

AT&T Services, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Jacqueline K. Taylor

Attorney at J. Taylor and Associates, LLC

Suite 200, 1870 The Exchange

Atlanta, GA 30339

Defendant Attorneys

Sheldon W. Snipe

Attorney at AT&T Services, Inc.

One Cnn Center, Suite Sw1432B

Atlanta, GA 30303

Suzanne W. Ockleberry

Attorney at AT&T Communications of the Southern States, Inc.

1200 Peachtree Street, N.E., Ste Sw1435G

Atlanta, GA 30309

 

Court Documents

#7

(#7) Initial Disclosures by AT&T Services, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Attachment A, #2 Attachment C)(Ockleberry, Suzanne) (Entered: 01/06/2020)

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL with COMPLAINT filed by AT&T Services, Inc. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number AGANDC-9154939). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - State Court Summons and Complaint, #2 Exhibit B - Affidavit of Deirdre L. Scott, #3 Exhibit C - Notice of Filing Notice of Removal, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(ah) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form. Modified to correct date on 12/6/2019 (ah). (Entered: 12/06/2019)

#4

(#4) ANSWER to #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by AT&T Services, Inc.. Discovery ends on 5/11/2020.(Ockleberry, Suzanne) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions. (Entered: 12/12/2019)

#9

(#9) Initial Disclosures by Mary Jo Fortin.(Taylor, Jacqueline) (Entered: 01/06/2020)

#6

(#6) Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement by AT&T Services, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent AT&T Inc. for AT&T Services, Inc.. (Ockleberry, Suzanne) (Entered: 01/06/2020)

7 #2

Attachment C

1 #1

Exhibit A - State Court Summons and Complaint

#10

(#10) SCHEDULING ORDER: re: #5 Joint Preliminary Report and Discovery Plan. Signed by Judge Leigh Martin May on 1/7/20. (jpa) (Entered: 01/07/2020)

#8

(#8) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Mary Jo Fortin by Mary Jo Fortin.(Taylor, Jacqueline) (Entered: 01/06/2020)

1 #2

Exhibit B - Affidavit of Deirdre L. Scott

1 #4

Civil Cover Sheet

#12

(#12) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE (Amended) for Defendant's Interrogatories to Plaintiff and Request for Production of Documents and Things by AT&T Services, Inc..(Ockleberry, Suzanne) (Entered: 01/08/2020)

#5

(#5) JOINT PRELIMINARY REPORT AND DISCOVERY PLAN filed by Mary Jo Fortin. (Taylor, Jacqueline) (Entered: 01/06/2020)

#14

(#14) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Plaintiff's Requests for Production of Documents to the Defendant by Mary Jo Fortin.(Taylor, Jacqueline) (Entered: 01/23/2020)

#11

(#11) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE for Defendant's Interrogatories to Plaintiff and Request for Production of Documents and Things by AT&T Services, Inc..(Ockleberry, Suzanne) (Entered: 01/07/2020)

1 #3

Exhibit C - Notice of Filing Notice of Removal

7 #1

Attachment A

#13

(#13) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Plaintiff's First Set of Interrogatories to the Defendant by Mary Jo Fortin.(Taylor, Jacqueline) (Entered: 01/23/2020)

10 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Plaintiff's Requests for Production of Documents to the Defendant by Mary Jo Fortin.(Taylor, Jacqueline) (Entered: 01/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Plaintiff's First Set of Interrogatories to the Defendant by Mary Jo Fortin.(Taylor, Jacqueline) (Entered: 01/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE (Amended) for Defendant's Interrogatories to Plaintiff and Request for Production of Documents and Things by AT&T Services, Inc..(Ockleberry, Suzanne) (Entered: 01/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE for Defendant's Interrogatories to Plaintiff and Request for Production of Documents and Things by AT&T Services, Inc..(Ockleberry, Suzanne) (Entered: 01/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) SCHEDULING ORDER: re: #5 Joint Preliminary Report and Discovery Plan. Signed by Judge Leigh Martin May on 1/7/20. (jpa) (Entered: 01/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Clerks Notation re #6 Certificate of Interested Persons, #8 Corporate Disclosure Statement, reviewed and approved by LMM. (rvb) (Entered: 01/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) Initial Disclosures by Mary Jo Fortin.(Taylor, Jacqueline) (Entered: 01/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Mary Jo Fortin by Mary Jo Fortin.(Taylor, Jacqueline) (Entered: 01/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) Initial Disclosures by AT&T Services, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Attachment A, #2 Attachment C)(Ockleberry, Suzanne) (Entered: 01/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement by AT&T Services, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent AT&T Inc. for AT&T Services, Inc.. (Ockleberry, Suzanne) (Entered: 01/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) JOINT PRELIMINARY REPORT AND DISCOVERY PLAN filed by Mary Jo Fortin. (Taylor, Jacqueline) (Entered: 01/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) ANSWER to #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by AT&T Services, Inc.. Discovery ends on 5/11/2020.(Ockleberry, Suzanne) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions. (Entered: 12/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) NOTICE of Appearance by Suzanne W. Ockleberry on behalf of AT&T Services, Inc. (Ockleberry, Suzanne) (Entered: 12/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) STANDING ORDER REGARDING CIVIL LITIGATION Signed by Judge Leigh Martin May on 12/10/2019. (tmf) (Entered: 12/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL with COMPLAINT filed by AT&T Services, Inc. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number AGANDC-9154939). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - State Court Summons and Complaint, #2 Exhibit B - Affidavit of Deirdre L. Scott, #3 Exhibit C - Notice of Filing Notice of Removal, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(ah) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form. Modified to correct date on 12/6/2019 (ah). (Entered: 12/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.