This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 07/29/2021 at 18:11:18 (UTC).

Fort Marcy Compound Condominium Association v. State Farm Fire and Casualty Company

Case Summary

On 05/27/2021 Fort Marcy Compound Condominium Association filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against State Farm Fire and Casualty Company. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New Mexico District. The Judges overseeing this case are John F. Robbenhaar and Steven C. Yarbrough. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-CV-00489

  • Filing Date:

    05/27/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

John F. Robbenhaar

Referral Judge

Steven C. Yarbrough

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Fort Marcy Compound Condominium Association

Defendant

State Farm Fire and Casualty Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Brian K. Branch

Attorney at The Law Office of Brian K. Branch

715 Marquette Ave., Nw

Albuquerque, NM 87102

William Truman Jones, Jr

Attorney at Green, Klein & Wood

440 Louisiana, Ste 1900

Houston, TX 77002

Delaram Falsafi

Attorney at Green Klein & Wood

440 Louisiana Street, Suite 1900

Houston, TX 77002

Robert Green

Attorney at Green Klein & Wood

440 Louisiana Street, Suite 1900

Houston, TX 77002

Defendant Attorneys

Todd Schwarz

Attorney at Miller Stratvert PA

Po Box 25687

Albuquerque, NM 87125-0687

Samantha E Kelly

Attorney at Miller Stratvert

500 Marquette N.W. Suite 1100

Albuquerque, NM 87102

 

Court Documents

#3

#5

#6

#7

#10

#11

#12

#13

#14

#15

#16

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/27/2021
  • Docket(#17) ORDER by Magistrate Judge Steven C. Yarbrough setting a Telephonic Status Conference for 11/04/2021 at 9:30 AM. The purpose of this conference check the status of discovery. The parties shall call the AT&T Conference line at (888) 398-2342 [Access Code: 2418431] to connect to the proceedings. [THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (cm) (Entered: 07/27/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) ORDER ADOPTING JOINT STATUS REPORT by Magistrate Judge Steven C. Yarbrough. (cm) (Entered: 07/27/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) SCHEDULING ORDER by Magistrate Judge Steven C. Yarbrough. Discovery due by 02/23/2022. Discovery Motions due by 03/17/2022. Pretrial Motions due by 03/28/2022. Proposed Pretrial Order due by 07/12/2022. (cm) (Entered: 07/27/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) Clerk's Minutes for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Steven C. Yarbrough: Scheduling Conference held on 07/27/2021. (cm) (Entered: 07/27/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) Joint Status Report and Provisional Discovery Plan by State Farm Fire and Casualty Company (Schwarz, Todd) (Entered: 07/16/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by State Farm Fire and Casualty Company Initial Disclosures (Schwarz, Todd) (Entered: 07/14/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) NOTICE of Appearance by Delaram Falsafi on behalf of Fort Marcy Compound Condominium Association (Falsafi, Delaram) (Entered: 07/08/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) NOTICE of Appearance by Robert Green on behalf of Fort Marcy Compound Condominium Association (Green, Robert) (Entered: 07/08/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/15/2021
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE OF RULE 73 CONSENT Received by All Parties. Related documents: 4 Consent to Proceed Before a U.S. Magistrate Judge, filed by State Farm Fire and Casualty Company, 8 Consent to Proceed Before a U.S. Magistrate Judge, filed by Fort Marcy Compound Condominium Association. [THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (khs) (Entered: 06/15/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/15/2021
  • Docket(#8) CONSENT TO PROCEED Before a U.S. Magistrate Judge. Under 28 U.S.C. 636(c) and Fed.R.Civ.P. 73(b), Fort Marcy Compound Condominium Association voluntarily consent(s) to have United States Magistrate Judge John F. Robbenhaar conduct dispositive proceedings in this matter, including motions and trial, and order the entry of final judgment. (Branch, Brian)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (Entered: 06/15/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER by Magistrate Judge Steven C. Yarbrough. Telephonic Scheduling Conference set for 07/27/2021 at 10:30 AM. Joint Status Report due by 07/16/2021. Unless otherwise notified by the Clerk or the Court a notice of consent or non-consent for this case to proceed before the trial Magistrate Judge should be submitted by each party no later than 06/29/2021. (cm) (Entered: 06/08/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) State Farm's ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by State Farm Fire and Casualty Company. (Schwarz, Todd) (Entered: 06/07/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Fort Marcy Compound Condominium Association (Jones, William) (Entered: 06/04/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/28/2021
  • Docket(#4) CONSENT TO PROCEED Before a U.S. Magistrate Judge. Under 28 U.S.C. 636(c) and Fed.R.Civ.P. 73(b), State Farm Fire and Casualty Company voluntarily consent(s) to have United States Magistrate Judge John F. Robbenhaar conduct dispositive proceedings in this matter, including motions and trial, and order the entry of final judgment. (Schwarz, Todd)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (Entered: 05/28/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Corporate Disclosure Statement by State Farm Fire and Casualty Company (Schwarz, Todd) (Entered: 05/28/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/27/2021
  • Docket(#2) PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been randomly assigned to United States Magistrate Judge John F. Robbenhaar to conduct dispositive proceedings in this matter, including motions and trial. Appeal from a judgment entered by a Magistrate Judge will be to the United States Court of Appeals for the Tenth Circuit. It is the responsibility of the case filer to serve a copy of this Notice upon all parties with the summons and complaint. Consent is strictly voluntary, and a party is free to withhold consent without adverse consequences. Should a party choose to consent, notice should be made no later than 21 days after entry of the Order setting the Rule 16 Initial Scheduling Conference. For e-filers, visit our Web site at www.nmd.uscourts.gov for more information and instructions.[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (jg) (Entered: 05/27/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/27/2021
  • DocketUnited States Magistrate Judge John F. Robbenhaar and United States Magistrate Judge Steven C. Yarbrough assigned. (jg) (Entered: 05/27/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFiling and Administrative Fees Received: $ 402 receipt number ANMDC-7714125 re #1 Notice of Removal, filed by State Farm Fire and Casualty Company (Payment made via Pay.gov)(Schwarz, Todd) (Entered: 05/27/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by State Farm Fire and Casualty Company from First Judicial District Court, case number D-101-CV-2021-00876. ( Filing Fee - Online Payment), filed by State Farm Fire and Casualty Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Schwarz, Todd) (Entered: 05/27/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where State Farm Fire & Casualty Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Todd Schwarz

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Samantha E Kelly