This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 04/12/2022 at 08:29:32 (UTC).

Fort Defiance Indian Hospital Board, Inc. v. Becerra et al

Case Summary

On 02/11/2022 Fort Defiance Indian Hospital Board, Inc filed an Other lawsuit against Becerra. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New Mexico District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Carmen E. Garza and James O. Browning. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:22-CV-00098

  • Filing Date:

    02/11/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Carmen E. Garza

Presiding Judge

James O. Browning

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Fort Defiance Indian Hospital Board Inc.

Defendants

Xavier Becerra

Roselyn Tso

Elizabeth A. Fowler

Marquis Yazzie

Navajo Area Indian Health Service

United States of America

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Steven C Boos

Attorney at Law Office of Steven Boos, LLC

Post Office Box 513

Bayfield, CO 81122

David C Mielke

Attorney at Sonosky, Chambers, Sachse, Mielke & Brownell, LLP

500 Marquette Av Nw, Suite 660

Albuquerque, NM 87102

Lloyd B Miller

Attorney at Sonosky, Chambers, Sachse, Miller & Monkman, LLP

725 East Fireweed Lane, Suite 420

Anchorage, AK 99503

Defendant Attorney

Kimberly N Bell

Attorney at DOJ-USAO

201 Third St. Nw, Ste 900

Albuquerque, NM 87102

 

Court Documents

#33

(#33) Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages Exhibits to Declaration of Oscencio Tom by Fort Defiance Indian Hospital Board Inc.. (Miller, Lloyd) (Entered: 04/01/2022)

#32

(#32) Unopposed MOTION to Expedite Consideration of Plaintiff's Motion for Immediate Injunctive Relief by Fort Defiance Indian Hospital Board Inc.. (Miller, Lloyd) (Entered: 04/01/2022)

#31

(#31) DECLARATION of Oscencio Tom by Fort Defiance Indian Hospital Board Inc. (Miller, Lloyd) (Entered: 04/01/2022)

30 #1

Exhibit 1--Standing Committee Resolution

30 #30

Main Document

#29

(#29) MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Fort Defiance Indian Hospital Board Inc.. (Miller, Lloyd) (Entered: 04/01/2022)

#27

(#27) AMENDED COMPLAINT First against All Defendants., filed by Fort Defiance Indian Hospital Board Inc.. (Miller, Lloyd) (Entered: 03/31/2022)

#28

(#28) Clerk's Minutes for proceedings held before District Judge James O. Browning: Motion Hearing held on 3/28/2022 re #13 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Fort Defiance Indian Hospital Board Inc., #17 MOTION to Expedite Consideration of Plaintiff's Motion for Immediate Injunctive Relief filed by Fort Defiance Indian Hospital Board Inc.. (Court Reporter J. Bean) (bap) (Entered: 04/01/2022)

#26

(#26) NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF DOCUMENT as to document #17 Motion to Expedite by Fort Defiance Indian Hospital Board Inc. (Miller, Lloyd) (Entered: 03/28/2022)

#17

(#26) NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF DOCUMENT as to document #17 Motion to Expedite by Fort Defiance Indian Hospital Board Inc. (Miller, Lloyd) (Entered: 03/28/2022)

#16

(#25) NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF DOCUMENT as to document #16 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages by Fort Defiance Indian Hospital Board Inc. (Miller, Lloyd) (Entered: 03/28/2022)

13 #1

Exhibit 2--Proposed Findings of Fact

13 #13

Main Document

#8

(#8) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Fort Defiance Indian Hospital Board Inc.. United States of America served on 2/22/2022, answer due 4/25/2022. (Miller, Lloyd) (Entered: 03/15/2022)

7 #1

Exhibit 1--USPS Tracking

7 #7

Main Document

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #1

Main Document

24 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#34) NOTICE of Motion Hearing on Motion for Immediate Injunctive Relief or in the Alternative a Preliminary Injunction with Supporting Memorandum #29 scheduled for 4/26/2022 at 10:00 AM in Albuquerque - 460 Vermejo Courtroom before District Judge James O. Browning. Should a party wish to appear remotely for this hearing they shall notify the Court by filing a written notice no later than 4/22/2022 indicating the preferred method of attendance (via telephone, via Zoom or any other desired method). Upon receipt of notification that one or more of the party(ies) wishes to appear remotely via Zoom the Court will schedule the Zoom session and provide connectivity details to the parties through separate notice/communication. Absent notification as indicated above, the Court will presume an in-person appearance is intended and plan accordingly. (lr)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (Entered: 04/05/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#33) Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages Exhibits to Declaration of Oscencio Tom by Fort Defiance Indian Hospital Board Inc.. (Miller, Lloyd) (Entered: 04/01/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#32) Unopposed MOTION to Expedite Consideration of Plaintiff's Motion for Immediate Injunctive Relief by Fort Defiance Indian Hospital Board Inc.. (Miller, Lloyd) (Entered: 04/01/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#31) DECLARATION of Oscencio Tom by Fort Defiance Indian Hospital Board Inc. (Miller, Lloyd) (Entered: 04/01/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#30) DECLARATION of Dr. Sandra Adkins by Fort Defiance Indian Hospital Board Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1--Standing Committee Resolution) (Miller, Lloyd) (Entered: 04/01/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#29) MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Fort Defiance Indian Hospital Board Inc.. (Miller, Lloyd) (Entered: 04/01/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/31/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#27) AMENDED COMPLAINT First against All Defendants., filed by Fort Defiance Indian Hospital Board Inc.. (Miller, Lloyd) (Entered: 03/31/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#28) Clerk's Minutes for proceedings held before District Judge James O. Browning: Motion Hearing held on 3/28/2022 re #13 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Fort Defiance Indian Hospital Board Inc., #17 MOTION to Expedite Consideration of Plaintiff's Motion for Immediate Injunctive Relief filed by Fort Defiance Indian Hospital Board Inc.. (Court Reporter J. Bean) (bap) (Entered: 04/01/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#26) NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF DOCUMENT as to document #17 Motion to Expedite by Fort Defiance Indian Hospital Board Inc. (Miller, Lloyd) (Entered: 03/28/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#25) NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF DOCUMENT as to document #16 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages by Fort Defiance Indian Hospital Board Inc. (Miller, Lloyd) (Entered: 03/28/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
16 More Docket Entries
  • 03/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Fort Defiance Indian Hospital Board Inc.. United States of America served on 2/22/2022, answer due 4/25/2022. (Miller, Lloyd) (Entered: 03/15/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Fort Defiance Indian Hospital Board Inc.. Elizabeth A. Fowler served on 2/22/2022, answer due 3/15/2022. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1--USPS Tracking)(Miller, Lloyd) (Entered: 03/15/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/17/2022
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE REGARDING DOCUMENT ENTRIES: Because this case has been reassigned to a district judge, please be advised that any documents filed by the parties under Rule 73(b) have been permanently removed from the docket. Document(s) removed: No. 3. [THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (kg) (Entered: 02/17/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/16/2022
  • Docket(#5) PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been reassigned to District Judge James O. Browning as the trial judge. Under D.N.M.LR-Civ. 10.1, the first page of each document must have the case file number and initials of the assigned judges.Accordingly, further documents filed in this matter must bear the case number and the judges' initials shown in the case caption and the NEF for this document. Kindly reflect this change in your filings. District Judge Judith C. Herrera no longer assigned to this case.[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (dr) (Entered: 02/16/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/15/2022
  • Docket(#4) PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been reassigned to United States District Judge Judith C. Herrera as the trial judge. Under D.N.M.LR-Civ. 10.1, the first page of each document must have the case file number and initials of the assigned judges.Accordingly, further documents filed in this matter must bear the case number and the judges' initials shown in the case caption and the NEF for this document. Kindly reflect this change in your filings. United States Magistrate Judge Kevin R. Sweazea no longer assigned to this case.[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (jg) (Entered: 02/15/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/14/2022
  • DocketSummons Issued as to Xavier Becerra, Elizabeth A. Fowler, Roselyn Tso, United States of America, Marquis Yazzie, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (jg) (Entered: 02/14/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/11/2022
  • Docket(#2) PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been randomly assigned to United States Magistrate Judge Kevin R. Sweazea to conduct dispositive proceedings in this matter, including motions and trial. Appeal from a judgment entered by a Magistrate Judge will be to the United States Court of Appeals for the Tenth Circuit. It is the responsibility of the case filer to serve a copy of this Notice upon all parties with the summons and complaint. Consent is strictly voluntary, and a party is free to withhold consent without adverse consequences. Should a party choose to consent, notice should be made no later than 21 days after entry of the Order setting the Rule 16 Initial Scheduling Conference. For e-filers, visit our Web site at www.nmd.uscourts.gov for more information and instructions.[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (jg) (Entered: 02/11/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/11/2022
  • DocketUnited States Magistrate Judge Kevin R. Sweazea and United States Magistrate Judge Carmen E. Garza assigned. (jg) (Entered: 02/11/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFiling and Administrative Fees Received: $ 402 receipt number ANMDC-8117850 re #1 Complaint filed by Fort Defiance Indian Hospital Board Inc. (Payment made via Pay.gov)(Miller, Lloyd) (Entered: 02/11/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Xavier Becerra, Elizabeth A. Fowler, Roselyn Tso, Marquis Yazzie ( Filing Fee - Online Payment), filed by Fort Defiance Indian Hospital Board Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Miller, Lloyd) (Entered: 02/11/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less