This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 01/21/2022 at 07:26:01 (UTC).

Forrest v. Equifax Information Services, LLC et al

Case Summary

On 11/22/2021 Forrest filed a Finance - Consumer Credit lawsuit against Equifax Information Services, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Kansas District. The Judges overseeing this case are John W. Broomes and James P. O'Hara. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:21-CV-02544

  • Filing Date:

    11/22/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Finance - Consumer Credit

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

John W. Broomes

Referral Judge

James P. O'Hara

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Timothy Forrest

Defendants

Equifax Information Services, LLC

Experian Information Solutions, Inc.

Trans Union, LLC

Ally Financial, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Andrew M. Esselman

Attorney at Credit Law Center

4041 Lakewood Way, Suite 140

Lee'S Summit, MO 64064

Defendant Attorneys

Guillermo Gabriel Zorogastua

Attorney at Polsinelli PC - 48th Place

900 West 48Th Place, Suite 900

Kansas City, MO 64112-1895

Chelsea A. Bunge-Bollman

Attorney at Jones Day - Minneapolis

90 South Seventh Street, Suite 4950

Minneapolis, MN 55402

Andrea S. McMurtry

Attorney at Horn, Aylward & Bandy, LLC

2600 Grand Boulevard, Suite 1100

Kansas City, MO 64108

Danne Wayne Webb

Attorney at Horn, Aylward & Bandy, LLC

2600 Grand Boulevard, Suite 1100

Kansas City, MO 64108

Lauren Michelle Wood

Attorney at Quilling, Selander, Lownds, Winslett & Moser, PC - Plano

6900 N. Dallas Parkway, Suite 800

Plano, TX 75024

Ethan G. Ostroff

Attorney at Troutman Pepper Hamilton Sanders LLP - VA Beach

222 Central Park Avenue, Suite 2000

Virginia Beach, VA 23462

Nelson L. Mitten

Attorney at Riezman Berger, PC - St. Louis

7700 Bonhomme Avenue, 7Th Floor

St. Louis, MO 63105

 

Court Documents

#28

(#28) ANSWER to Complaint and Affirmative Defenses by Ally Financial, Inc..(Mitten, Nelson) (Entered: 01/20/2022)

#27

(#27) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Equifax Information Services, LLC identifying Equifax Inc. as corporate parent (Zorogastua, Guillermo) (Entered: 01/19/2022)

#26

(#26) ANSWER to Complaint by Equifax Information Services, LLC.(Zorogastua, Guillermo) (Entered: 01/19/2022)

24 #2

ECF Registration Form Pro Hac Vice Electronic Filing

24 #1

Affidavit Declaration in Support of Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice

24 #24

Main Document

#22

(#22) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint (attorney) by Defendant Trans Union, LLC (referred to Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara) (Wood, Lauren) (Entered: 12/30/2021)

#20

(#20) AFFIDAVIT of Ethan Geoffrey Ostroff re #19 MOTION for attorney Ethan Geoffrey Ostroff to appear pro hac vice ( Pro hac vice fee $50, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-5670348.) by Defendant Ally Financial, Inc. (Mitten, Nelson) (Entered: 12/23/2021)

#19

(#19) MOTION for attorney Ethan Geoffrey Ostroff to appear pro hac vice ( Pro hac vice fee $50, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-5670348.) by Defendant Ally Financial, Inc. (referred to Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara) (Mitten, Nelson) (Entered: 12/23/2021)

#18

No Description Available

17 #1

Affidavit In Support of Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice

17 #17

Main Document

#16

No Description Available

#14

No Description Available

#13

No Description Available

#12

No Description Available

16 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#28) ANSWER to Complaint and Affirmative Defenses by Ally Financial, Inc..(Mitten, Nelson) (Entered: 01/20/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#27) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Equifax Information Services, LLC identifying Equifax Inc. as corporate parent (Zorogastua, Guillermo) (Entered: 01/19/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#26) ANSWER to Complaint by Equifax Information Services, LLC.(Zorogastua, Guillermo) (Entered: 01/19/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#25) ORDER granting #24 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Chelsea A. Bunge-Bollman for Experian Information Solutions, Inc. pursuant to D. Kan. Rule 83.5.4 for purposes of this case only. Signed by Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara on 1/5/2022. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (kas) (Entered: 01/05/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#24) MOTION for attorney Chelsea A. Bunge-Bollman to appear pro hac vice Experian Information Solutions ( Pro hac vice fee $50, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-5675975.) by Defendant Experian Information Solutions, Inc. (referred to Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara) (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration in Support of Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice, #2 ECF Registration Form Pro Hac Vice Electronic Filing)(Webb, Danne) (Entered: 01/05/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#23) ORDER granting #22 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time. Defendant Trans Union, LLC must file its response to plaintiff's complaint by 2/2/2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara on 12/31/21. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (O'Hara, James) (Entered: 12/31/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#22) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint (attorney) by Defendant Trans Union, LLC (referred to Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara) (Wood, Lauren) (Entered: 12/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) ORDER granting #17 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Ethan G. Ostroff for Ally Financial, Inc., pursuant to D. Kan. Rule 83.5.4 for purposes of this case only; and finding as moot #19 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara on 12/23/2021. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (kas) (Entered: 12/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) AFFIDAVIT of Ethan Geoffrey Ostroff re #19 MOTION for attorney Ethan Geoffrey Ostroff to appear pro hac vice ( Pro hac vice fee $50, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-5670348.) by Defendant Ally Financial, Inc. (Mitten, Nelson) (Entered: 12/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) MOTION for attorney Ethan Geoffrey Ostroff to appear pro hac vice ( Pro hac vice fee $50, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-5670348.) by Defendant Ally Financial, Inc. (referred to Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara) (Mitten, Nelson) (Entered: 12/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
10 More Docket Entries
  • 12/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ORDER granting #7 unopposed motion for extension of time until January 20, 2022, for defendant Ally Financial, Inc. to answer or otherwise respond to the complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara on 12/15/2021. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (srj) (Entered: 12/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint (attorney) by Defendant Ally Financial, Inc. (referred to Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara) (Mitten, Nelson) (Entered: 12/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ENTRY OF APPEARANCE by Nelson L. Mitten on behalf of Ally Financial, Inc.. (Mitten, Nelson) (Entered: 12/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ENTRY OF APPEARANCE by Andrea S. McMurtry on behalf of Experian Information Solutions, Inc. (McMurtry, Andrea) (Entered: 12/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ENTRY OF APPEARANCE by Danne Wayne Webb on behalf of Experian Information Solutions, Inc. (Webb, Danne) (Entered: 12/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2021
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED as to Ally Financial, Inc., Equifax Information Services, LLC, Experian Information Solutions, Inc., Trans Union, LLC. (issued to Attorney for service) (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry) (lb) (Entered: 11/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT: Case assigned to District Judge John W. Broomes and Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara for all proceedings. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (lb) (Entered: 11/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) DESIGNATION OF PLACE OF TRIAL filed by Plaintiff Timothy Forrest - trial to be held in Kansas City. (Esselman, Andrew) (Entered: 11/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET by Plaintiff Timothy Forrest. (Esselman, Andrew) (Entered: 11/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT with trial location of Kansas City ( Filing fee $402, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-5641978.), filed by Timothy Forrest.(Esselman, Andrew) (Entered: 11/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Experian Information Solutions, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where Ally Financial Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where Equifax Information Services LLC is a litigant