This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 10/14/2019 at 08:51:55 (UTC).

FORREST HILL COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION, INC. et al v. PUBLIC SERVICES ELECTRIC & GAS COMPANY et al

Case Summary

On 08/15/2019 FORREST HILL COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION, INC filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against PUBLIC SERVICES ELECTRIC GAS COMPANY. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New Jersey District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Esther Salas and Michael A. Hammer. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:19-CV-16692

  • Filing Date:

    08/15/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Esther Salas

Referral Judge

Michael A. Hammer

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

FORREST HILL COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION, INC.

GAYTHA KRAUSER

Defendants

PUBLIC SERVICES ELECTRIC & GAS COMPANY

CHRISTOPHER WATSON

PHILLIP SCOTT

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

GEORGE R. SOMMERS

Defendant Attorneys

PETER L. AGOSTINI

AARON I. KARP

ANTHONY J. CORINO

STEVEN FRANCIS OLIVO

GARY S. LIPSHUTZ

 

Court Documents

23 #7

Declaration Declaration of Service

23 #6

Text of Proposed Order Order

23 #5

Brief Brief

23 #4

Exhibit Exhibit C

23 #3

Exhibit Exhibit B

23 #2

Exhibit Exhibit A

23 #1

Certification Certification of Counsel

#23

#22

#7

#6

#5

#4

#3

#2

1 #2

Letter Brief

1 #1

Order to Show Cause with Temporary Restraining Order

#1

45 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#23) First MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Complant by PHILLIP SCOTT, CHRISTOPHER WATSON. Responses due by 11/25/2019 (Attachments: #1 Certification Certification of Counsel, #2 Exhibit Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit Exhibit C, #5 Brief Brief, #6 Text of Proposed Order Order, #7 Declaration Declaration of Service)(OLIVO, STEVEN) (Entered: 10/11/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#22) ORDER that Defendants are granted an extension until 10/11/2019 to answer or otherwise move; Plaintiff has until 11/24/2019 to respond; defendants reply is due 12/9/2019; the matter is set down for hearing on 12/16/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer on 10/8/2019. (sm) (Entered: 10/09/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) Letter from Steven F. Olivo. (OLIVO, STEVEN) (Entered: 10/03/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSet Deadlines as to #19 defendant's First MOTION to Dismiss the Complaint. Motion set for 10/21/2019 before Judge Esther Salas. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (jd, ) (Entered: 09/24/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) NOTICE of Appearance by STEVEN FRANCIS OLIVO on behalf of PHILLIP SCOTT, CHRISTOPHER WATSON (OLIVO, STEVEN) (Entered: 09/22/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) First MOTION to Dismiss the Complaint by PUBLIC SERVICES ELECTRIC & GAS COMPANY. Responses due by 10/21/2019 (Attachments: #1 Brief, #2 Exhibit, #3 Certificate of Service, #4 Text of Proposed Order)(CORINO, ANTHONY) (Entered: 09/20/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketClerk`s Text Order - The document #18 submitted by PUBLIC SERVICES ELECTRIC & GAS COMPANY has been GRANTED. The answer due date has been set for 9/20/2019. (sm) (Entered: 09/03/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) Application and Proposed Order for Clerk's Order to extend time to answer Attorney ANTHONY J. CORINO for PUBLIC SERVICES ELECTRIC & GAS COMPANY added. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order, #2 Certificate of Service Certificate of Service)(CORINO, ANTHONY) (Entered: 08/29/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) LETTER ORDER denying Plaintiffs' renewed emergent application #12 . Signed by Judge Esther Salas on 8/19/2019. (sm) (Entered: 08/20/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) Papers in support of the re-filed application for an order to show cause and a TRO: SUMMONS Returned Executed by PHILLIP SCOTT, PUBLIC SERVICES ELECTRIC & GAS COMPANY, CHRISTOPHER WATSON. PHILLIP SCOTT served on 8/19/2019, answer due 9/9/2019; PUBLIC SERVICES ELECTRIC & GAS COMPANY served on 8/19/2019, answer due 9/9/2019; CHRISTOPHER WATSON served on 8/19/2019, answer due 9/9/2019. (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/20/2019: #1 Cover Letter and Certification) (sm) (Entered: 08/20/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
5 More Docket Entries
  • 08/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) ORDER re: latest submissions on prior application for an Order to Show Cause and Temporary Restraining Order. Signed by Judge Esther Salas on 8/16/2019. (jr) (Entered: 08/17/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE of Appearance by PETER L. AGOSTINI on behalf of PUBLIC SERVICES ELECTRIC & GAS COMPANY (AGOSTINI, PETER) (Entered: 08/16/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE of Appearance by AARON I. KARP on behalf of PUBLIC SERVICES ELECTRIC & GAS COMPANY (KARP, AARON) (Entered: 08/16/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Corporate Disclosure Statement by PUBLIC SERVICES ELECTRIC & GAS COMPANY identifying Public Service Enterprise Group Incorporated as Corporate Parent.. (KARP, AARON) (Entered: 08/16/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Letter from Defendant Public Service Electric and Gas Company. (KARP, AARON) (Entered: 08/16/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Certification of Service Re #1 Complaint, letter-brief and proposed OTSC by FORREST HILL COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION, INC., GAYTHA KRAUSER. (jr) (Entered: 08/16/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) VERIFICATION of #1 Complaint by GAYTHA KRAUSER. (jr) (Entered: 08/16/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) LETTER ORDER that the Court DENIES Plaintiffs' TRO Application without prejudice. etc. Signed by Judge Esther Salas on 8/16/2019. (dam, ) (Entered: 08/16/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) SUMMONS ISSUED as to PUBLIC SERVICES ELECTRIC & GAS COMPANY, PHILLIP SCOTT, CHRISTOPHER WATSON. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (jc, ) (Entered: 08/16/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against PUBLIC SERVICES ELECTRIC & GAS COMPANY, PHILLIP SCOTT, CHRISTOPHER WATSON ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number NEW040340), filed by FORREST HILL COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION, INC., GAYTHA KRAUSER. (Attachments: #1 Order to Show Cause with Temporary Restraining Order, #2 Letter Brief) (jc, ) (Entered: 08/16/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less