This case was last updated from PACER on 04/15/2019 at 07:37:56 (UTC).

Forrest et al v. Plano Synergy Holdings Inc et al

Case Summary

On 02/14/2019 Forrest filed a Personal Injury - Other Product Liability lawsuit against Plano Synergy Holdings Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Arkansas Eastern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Billy Roy Wilson. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    5:19-CV-00069

  • Filing Date:

    02/14/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Product Liability

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Arkansas Eastern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Billy Roy Wilson

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Carol Forrest

Tommy Forrest

Defendants

Primal Vantage Co Inc

Plano Synergy Holdings Inc

Evolved Ingenuity LLC

John Does

Dick's Sporting Goods Inc

Ameristep Corporation

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Timothy Ryan Scott

Attorney at Bailey & Oliver Law Firm

3606 West Southern Hills Boulevard

Rogers, AR 72758

Frank H. Bailey

Attorney at Bailey & Oliver Law Firm

3606 West Southern Hills Boulevard

Rogers, AR 72758

Robert G. Bridewell

Attorney at Robert G. Bridewell PLC

Post Office Box 391

Lake Village, AR 71653-0391

Sach D. Oliver

Attorney at Bailey & Oliver Law Firm

3606 West Southern Hills Boulevard

Rogers, AR 72758

Geoff Hamby

Attorney at Bailey & Oliver Law Firm

3606 West Southern Hills Boulevard

Rogers, AR 72758

Defendant Attorneys

Michael G. Smith

Attorney at Dover Dixon Horne PLLC

425 West Capitol Avenue, Suite 3700

Little Rock, AR 72201-3645

Milton Karfis

Attorney at Clark Hill PLC

151 South Old Woodward, Suite 200

Birmingham, MI 48009

Ellisse Thompson

Attorney at Clark Hill PLC

151 South Old Woodward, Suite 200

Birmingham, MI 48009

Stephanie Anderson

Attorney at Clark Hill PLC

151 South Old Woodward, Suite 200

Birmingham, MI 48009

 

Court Documents

#12

(#12) MOTION for Leave to Appear pro hac vice by Stephanie Anderson. Fee $100 receipt number 0860-3423772. Filed by Plano Synergy Holdings Inc, Primal Vantage Co Inc, Evolved Ingenuity LLC, Ameristep Corporation, and Dick's Sporting Goods Inc.(Smith, Michael) (Docket entry modified on 3/18/2019 to correct the party filers.)(thd). (Entered: 03/15/2019)

#11

(#11) MOTION for Leave to Appear pro hac vice by Milton Karfis. Fee $100 receipt number 0860-3423767. Filed by Plano Synergy Holdings Inc, Primal Vantage Co Inc, Evolved Ingenuity LLC, Ameristep Corporation, and Dick's Sporting Goods Inc.(Smith, Michael) (Docket entry modified on 3/18/2019 to correct the party filers.) (thd). (Entered: 03/15/2019)

#10

(#10) MOTION for Leave to Appear pro hac vice by Ellisse Thompson. Fee $100 receipt number 0860-3423756. Filed by Plano Synergy Holdings Inc, Primal Vantage Co Inc, Evolved Ingenuity LLC, Ameristep Corporation, and Dick's Sporting Goods Inc. (Smith, Michael) (Docket entry modified on 3/18/2019 to correct the party filers.)(thd). (Entered: 03/15/2019)

#9

(#9) Corporate Disclosure Statement (Rule 7.1) by Dick's Sporting Goods Inc (Smith, Michael) (Entered: 02/27/2019)

#8

(#8) Corporate Disclosure Statement (Rule 7.1) by Ameristep Corporation (Smith, Michael) (Entered: 02/27/2019)

#7

(#7) Corporate Disclosure Statement (Rule 7.1) by Evolved Ingenuity LLC (Smith, Michael) (Entered: 02/27/2019)

#6

(#6) Corporate Disclosure Statement (Rule 7.1) by Plano Synergy Holdings Inc (Smith, Michael) (Entered: 02/27/2019)

#5

(#5) Corporate Disclosure Statement (Rule 7.1) by Primal Vantage Co Inc (Smith, Michael) (Entered: 02/27/2019)

#4

(#4) Defendants' ANSWER to #2 Complaint with Jury Demand by Ameristep Corporation, Dick's Sporting Goods Inc, Evolved Ingenuity LLC, Plano Synergy Holdings Inc, Primal Vantage Co Inc.(Smith, Michael) (Entered: 02/19/2019)

#3

(#3) INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Rule 26(f) Conference to occur by 4/29/2019. Rule 26(f) Report due by 5/13/2019. Jury Trial set for 2/25/2020 at 9:30 AM in Little Rock Courtroom # A401 before Judge Billy Roy Wilson. Entered at the direction of the Court on 2/19/19. (mmb) (Entered: 02/19/2019)

#2

(#2) COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against All Defendants filed by Tommy Forrest, Carol Forrest. (ljb) (Entered: 02/14/2019)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Ameristep Corporation, Dick's Sporting Goods Inc, Evolved Ingenuity LLC, Plano Synergy Holdings Inc, Primal Vantage Co Inc from Drew County Circuit Court, Case Number CV-2019-5-3. Fee of $400 paid, Receipt #LIT070868. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (ljb) (Entered: 02/14/2019)

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF DOCKET CORRECTION re: #10 , #11 , and #12 Motions for Leave to Appear pro hac vice. CORRECTION: Each docket entry was modified to correct the party filers as Defendants Plano Synergy Holdings Inc, Primal Vantage Co Inc, Evolved Ingenuity LLC, Ameristep Corporation, and Dick's Sporting Goods Inc. Attorney Michael G. Smith terminated and removed from the docket as counsel for Defendant John Does.(thd) (Entered: 03/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) ORDER granting #10 , #11 and #12 Motions to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Accordingly, Ellisse Thompson, Milton Karfis and Stephanie M. Anderson are admitted Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge Billy Roy Wilson on 3/18/19. (mmb) (Entered: 03/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) MOTION for Leave to Appear pro hac vice by Stephanie Anderson. Fee $100 receipt number 0860-3423772. Filed by Plano Synergy Holdings Inc, Primal Vantage Co Inc, Evolved Ingenuity LLC, Ameristep Corporation, and Dick's Sporting Goods Inc.(Smith, Michael) (Docket entry modified on 3/18/2019 to correct the party filers.)(thd). (Entered: 03/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) MOTION for Leave to Appear pro hac vice by Milton Karfis. Fee $100 receipt number 0860-3423767. Filed by Plano Synergy Holdings Inc, Primal Vantage Co Inc, Evolved Ingenuity LLC, Ameristep Corporation, and Dick's Sporting Goods Inc.(Smith, Michael) (Docket entry modified on 3/18/2019 to correct the party filers.) (thd). (Entered: 03/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) MOTION for Leave to Appear pro hac vice by Ellisse Thompson. Fee $100 receipt number 0860-3423756. Filed by Plano Synergy Holdings Inc, Primal Vantage Co Inc, Evolved Ingenuity LLC, Ameristep Corporation, and Dick's Sporting Goods Inc. (Smith, Michael) (Docket entry modified on 3/18/2019 to correct the party filers.)(thd). (Entered: 03/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) Corporate Disclosure Statement (Rule 7.1) by Dick's Sporting Goods Inc (Smith, Michael) (Entered: 02/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) Corporate Disclosure Statement (Rule 7.1) by Ameristep Corporation (Smith, Michael) (Entered: 02/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) Corporate Disclosure Statement (Rule 7.1) by Evolved Ingenuity LLC (Smith, Michael) (Entered: 02/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) Corporate Disclosure Statement (Rule 7.1) by Plano Synergy Holdings Inc (Smith, Michael) (Entered: 02/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Corporate Disclosure Statement (Rule 7.1) by Primal Vantage Co Inc (Smith, Michael) (Entered: 02/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Defendants' ANSWER to #2 Complaint with Jury Demand by Ameristep Corporation, Dick's Sporting Goods Inc, Evolved Ingenuity LLC, Plano Synergy Holdings Inc, Primal Vantage Co Inc.(Smith, Michael) (Entered: 02/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Rule 26(f) Conference to occur by 4/29/2019. Rule 26(f) Report due by 5/13/2019. Jury Trial set for 2/25/2020 at 9:30 AM in Little Rock Courtroom # A401 before Judge Billy Roy Wilson. Entered at the direction of the Court on 2/19/19. (mmb) (Entered: 02/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against All Defendants filed by Tommy Forrest, Carol Forrest. (ljb) (Entered: 02/14/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Ameristep Corporation, Dick's Sporting Goods Inc, Evolved Ingenuity LLC, Plano Synergy Holdings Inc, Primal Vantage Co Inc from Drew County Circuit Court, Case Number CV-2019-5-3. Fee of $400 paid, Receipt #LIT070868. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (ljb) (Entered: 02/14/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less