This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 02/11/2023 at 07:35:12 (UTC).

Forgetta v. JUUL Labs, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 12/13/2022 Forgetta filed a Personal Injury - Other Product Liability lawsuit against JUUL Labs, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Northern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is William H. Orrick. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:22-CV-08306

  • Filing Date:

    12/13/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Product Liability

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

William H. Orrick

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Brooke Forgetta

Defendants

JUUL Labs, Inc. formerly doing business as PAX Labs, Inc. formerly doing business as PLOOM Inc.

Altria Group, Inc.

Philip Morris USA, Inc.

Altria Client Services LLC

Altria Group Distribution Company

Altria Enterprises LLC

James Monsees

Adam Bowen

Nicholas Pritzker

Hoyoung Huh

Riaz Valani

Mother Murphy's Lab, Inc.

Alternative Ingredients, Inc.

Tobacco Technology, Inc.

eLiquitech, Inc.

McLane Company, Inc.

Eby-Brown Company, LLC

Core-Mark Holding Company, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Russell D. Paul

Attorney at Berger Montague, P.C.

1818 Market Street, Suite 3600

Philadelphia, PA 19103

 

Court Documents

1 #1

Main Document

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

3 #3

Main Document

3 #1

Proposed Summons Attachment

#4

(#4) Summons Issued as to Alternative Ingredients, Inc., Altria Client Services LLC, Altria Enterprises LLC, Altria Group Distribution Company, Altria Group, Inc., Adam Bowen, Core-Mark Holding Company, Inc., Eby-Brown Company, LLC, Hoyoung Huh, Juul Labs, Inc., McLane Company, Inc., James Monsees, Mother Murphy's Lab, Inc., Philip Morris USA, Inc., Nicholas Pritzker, Tobacco Technology, Inc., Riaz Valani, eLiquitech, Inc.. (far, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/25/2023) (Entered: 01/25/2023)

5 #5

Main Document

5 #1

Certificate/Proof of Service

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/10/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Brooke Forgetta. All Defendants. All Defendants served on 1/30/23 by email. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Paul, Russell) (Filed on 2/10/2023) (Entered: 02/10/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/25/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Summons Issued as to Alternative Ingredients, Inc., Altria Client Services LLC, Altria Enterprises LLC, Altria Group Distribution Company, Altria Group, Inc., Adam Bowen, Core-Mark Holding Company, Inc., Eby-Brown Company, LLC, Hoyoung Huh, Juul Labs, Inc., McLane Company, Inc., James Monsees, Mother Murphy's Lab, Inc., Philip Morris USA, Inc., Nicholas Pritzker, Tobacco Technology, Inc., Riaz Valani, eLiquitech, Inc.. (far, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/25/2023) (Entered: 01/25/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/25/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Proposed Summons. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Summons Attachment)(Paul, Russell) (Filed on 1/25/2023) (Entered: 01/25/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/13/2022
  • DocketMEMBER CASE OPENED:,, Forgetta v. JUUL Labs, Inc. et al, Opened in California Northern District as 3:22-cv-08306-WHO cc: JPMDL (far, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/13/2022) (Entered: 12/13/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/13/2022
  • Docket(#2) Case assigned to Judge William H. Orrick. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. (as, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/13/2022) (Entered: 12/13/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ACANDC-17811296.). Filed byBrooke Forgetta. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Paul, Russell) (Filed on 12/13/2022) (Entered: 12/13/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less