This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 09/29/2020 at 09:00:43 (UTC).

Foresyth v. McCarthy

Case Summary

On 07/31/2020 Foresyth filed a Civil Right - Employment Discrimination lawsuit against McCarthy. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Virginia Eastern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Ivan D. Davis and Leonie M. Brinkema. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-00877

  • Filing Date:

    07/31/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Employment Discrimination

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Ivan D. Davis

Presiding Judge

Leonie M. Brinkema

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Bridgette L. Foresyth

Defendant

Ryan D. McCarthy

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Tameka Andrea West

Attorney at Tameka Andrea West, Esq.

7179 Jonesboro Rd., Suite 202

Morrow, GA 30260

Robert Stone Porter, IV

Attorney at The Spiggle Law Firm PLLC

4830 31St Street South, Suite A

Arlington, VA 22206

Defendant Attorneys

Lauren A. Wetzler

Attorney at United States Attorney Office

2100 Jamieson Ave

Alexandria, VA 22314

Trishanda L. Treadwell

Attorney at Department of Justice - EOUSA

Richard Russell Federal Building, 75 Ted Turner Drive, Sw, Suite 600

Atlanta, GA 30303

Yuri Fuchs

Attorney at US Attorney's Office (Alexandria)

2100 Jamieson Avenue

Alexandria, VA 22314

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#30) Order Rule 16(b) Scheduling Order. Because the parties' Proposed Joint Discovery Plan #29 adequately addresses the matters that would be discussed during the initial pretrial conference and counsel consent to waiving their appearances at the initial pretrial conference, the initial pretrial conference scheduled for September 16, 2020, pursuant to Rule 16(b) and this Court's August 26, 2020, Order, is cancelled. Upon consideration of the representations made by the parties in their Proposed Joint Discovery Plan, the Court makes the following rulings: The parties' Joint Discovery Plan is approved and shall control discovery to the extent of its application unless further modified by the Court. See order for further details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Ivan D. Davis on 9/10/2020. (lgue, ) (Entered: 09/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#29) Joint Proposed Discovery Plan by Ryan D. McCarthy.(Fuchs, Yuri) (Entered: 09/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#28) ORDER granting #27 Motion for Pro hac vice. Signed by District Judge Leonie M. Brinkema on 8/28/2020. (rban, ) (Entered: 08/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#27) Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Kristen Farr and Certification of Local Counsel Robert Porter Filing fee $ 75, receipt number 0422-7373665. by Bridgette L. Foresyth. (Porter, Robert) (Entered: 08/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#26) NOTICE of Appearance by Robert Stone Porter, IV on behalf of Bridgette L. Foresyth (Porter, Robert) (Entered: 08/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#25) SCHEDULING ORDER: Initial Pretrial Conference set for 9/16/2020 at 11:00 AM in Alexandria Courtroom 301 before Magistrate Judge Ivan D. Davis. Discovery due by 1/15/2021. Final Pretrial Conference set for 1/21/2021 at 10:00 AM in Alexandria Courtroom 700 before District Judge Leonie M. Brinkema. Signed by District Judge Leonie M. Brinkema on 8/26/20. (Attachments: #1 Mag.Consent, #2 Pretrial Notice)(yguy) (Entered: 08/26/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#24) ANSWER to Complaint by Ryan D. McCarthy.(Fuchs, Yuri) (Entered: 08/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#23) ORDERED that for reasons, defendant's Motion to Dismiss [Dkt. 6] is GRANTED, and it is hereby ORDERED that plaintiffs religious discrimination claim (part of Count 1) and disability discrimination claim (Count 4) be and are DISMISSED; and it is further ORDERED that defendant file its answer by August 24, 2020. Signed by District Judge Leonie M. Brinkema on 08/10/2020. (jlan) (Entered: 08/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2020
  • DocketNotification of transfer from the Northern District of Georgia Case No. 1:19cv2015 to the Eastern District of Virginia Case No. 1:20cv877. (ldab, ) (Entered: 07/31/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#22) Case transferred in from District of Georgia Northern; Case Number 1:19-cv-02015. Original file and docket sheet received. (Entered: 07/31/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
19 More Docket Entries
  • 10/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) REPLY to Response to Motion re #6 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM and for Improper Venue MOTION to Transfer Case filed by Mark T. Esper. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Regarding Venue)(Treadwell, Trishanda) [Transferred from Georgia Northern on 7/31/2020.] (Entered: 10/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotification of Docket Correction re #6 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM and for Improper Venue MOTION to Transfer Case. Two part motion docketed as one. Added Motion to Transfer. (jpa) [Transferred from Georgia Northern on 7/31/2020.] (Entered: 09/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM or, in the alternative, MOTION to Transfer with Brief In Support by Mark T. Esper. (Treadwell, Trishanda) . Added MOTION to Transfer Case on 9/25/2019 to add Motion to Transfer (jpa). [Transferred from Georgia Northern on 7/31/2020.] (Entered: 09/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2019
  • DocketCase Reassigned to Judge Steven D. Grimberg. Judge Michael L. Brown no longer assigned to case. NOTICE TO ALL COUNSEL OF RECORD: The Judge designation in the civil action number assigned to this case has been changed to 1:19-cv-2015-SDG-JKL. Please make note of this change in order to facilitate the docketing of pleadings in this case. (jta) [Transferred from Georgia Northern on 7/31/2020.] (Entered: 09/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER by docket entry only granting #5 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Defendant shall have until 9/24/2019 to answer or otherwise respond to the complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge John K. Larkins, III on 9/5/2019. (smw) [Transferred from Georgia Northern on 7/31/2020.] (Entered: 09/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to Plaintiffs Verified Complaint for Damages with Brief In Support by Mark T. Esper. (Attachments: #1 Brief, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Treadwell, Trishanda) [Transferred from Georgia Northern on 7/31/2020.] (Entered: 09/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) AFFIDAVIT of Service for Complaint , as to US Attorney Office c/o Dr. Mark T. Esper, Secretary, Department of Army. (West, Tameka) [Transferred from Georgia Northern on 7/31/2020.] (Entered: 07/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Summons Issued as to Mark T. Esper. (jta) [Transferred from Georgia Northern on 7/31/2020.] (Entered: 07/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) PROPOSED SUMMONS filed by Bridgette L. Foresyth (West, Tameka) [Transferred from Georgia Northern on 7/31/2020.] (Entered: 07/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by Bridgette L. Foresyth. (Filing fee $400, receipt number AGANDC-8637857) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(tcc) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form. [Transferred from Georgia Northern on 7/31/2020.] (Entered: 05/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Tameka Andrea West(Designation Retained)

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Robert Stone Porter