This case was last updated from PACER on 02/09/2020 at 08:01:06 (UTC).

Forest v. Genesis Lighthouse Ministries, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 12/11/2019 Forest filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against Genesis Lighthouse Ministries, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Georgia Northern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Michael L. Brown and Walter E. Johnson. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-CV-05565

  • Filing Date:

    12/11/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Georgia Northern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Michael L. Brown

Referral Judge

Walter E. Johnson

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Counter Defendant

James Cleveland Forest, Jr.

Petitioner and Counter Claimant

Marcellous Jackson

Fayetteville, GA 30214

Defendants and Counter Claimants

Genesis Lighthouse Ministries, Inc.

JJJ Family LLLP

Fulton County, Georgia

City of Atlanta

Marcellous Jackson

Fayetteville, GA 30214

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Counter Defendant Attorneys

John C. Clark

Attorney at Clark Law Group, LLC

Suite 480, 17 Executive Park Drive

Atlanta, GA 30329

Tahra Porterfield

Attorney at Clark Law Group, LLC

Suite 480, 17 Executive Park Drive

Atlanta, GA 30329

 

Court Documents

1 #1

Certificate of Service

#5

(#5) ORDER for Service of #4 Final Report and Recommendation, by Magistrate Judge Walter E. Johnson. Each party may file written objections to the Report & Recommendation within 14 days of service. If no objections are filed, the Report & Recommendation may be adopted as the opinion and order of the District Court. Signed by Magistrate Judge Walter E. Johnson on 1/6/20. (klb) (Entered: 01/06/2020)

#9

(#9) RESPONSE re Submission to District Judge, #7 Notice (Other) filed by James Cleveland Forest, Jr. (Clark, John) (Entered: 01/29/2020)

#2

(#2) ANSWER to #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with Jury Demand; and COUNTERCLAIM against James Cleveland Forest, Jr. with Jury Demand by Genesis Lighthouse Ministries, Inc. and Marcellous Jackson.( Discovery ends on 5/11/2020.)(eop) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions. (Entered: 12/12/2019)

#8

(#8) AMENDED ANSWER to #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL, COUNTERCLAIM against James Cleveland Forest, Jr. by Genesis Lighthouse Ministries, Inc., Marcellous Jackson.(jta) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions. (Entered: 01/22/2020)

#4

(#4) FINAL REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re #1 Notice of Removal, filed by Genesis Lighthouse Ministries, Inc., Marcellous Jackson. The undersigned REPORTS that this Court does not have subject matter jurisdiction over this case and RECOMMENDS that it be remanded to the Superior Court of Fulton County, Georgia. Signed by Magistrate Judge Walter E. Johnson on 1/6/20. (klb) (Entered: 01/06/2020)

#6

(#6) MOTION for the Entry of Dismissal of the Plaintiffs' Complaint and an Entry of Final Judgment in favor of the Genesis Lighthouse Ministries, Inc.,by Genesis Lighthouse Ministries, Inc.. (jta) (Entered: 01/07/2020)

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL with COMPLAINT filed by Marcellous Jackson and Genesis Lighthouse Ministeries, Inc.. (Filing fee $ 400.00 receipt number GAN100117898) (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(eop) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form. Modified on 12/12/2019 to add filer (eop). (Entered: 12/12/2019)

#7

(#7) NOTICE of Objection to the Actions of the Office of the Clerk of Court... by Genesis Lighthouse Ministries, Inc. (jta) (Entered: 01/22/2020)

1 #2

Civil Cover Sheet

#3

(#3) MOTION to Dismiss by Genesis Lighthouse Ministries, Inc. and Marcellous Jackson. (eop) (Entered: 12/12/2019)

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) RESPONSE re Submission to District Judge, #7 Notice (Other) filed by James Cleveland Forest, Jr. (Clark, John) (Entered: 01/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSubmission of #6 MOTION to Dismiss, to District Judge Michael L. Brown. (jta) (Entered: 01/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSubmission of #4 FINAL REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION, to District Judge Michael L. Brown. (jta) (Entered: 01/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) AMENDED ANSWER to #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL, COUNTERCLAIM against James Cleveland Forest, Jr. by Genesis Lighthouse Ministries, Inc., Marcellous Jackson.(jta) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions. (Entered: 01/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE of Objection to the Actions of the Office of the Clerk of Court... by Genesis Lighthouse Ministries, Inc. (jta) (Entered: 01/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketClerk updated address for Movant Marcellous Jackson, Nominee for the defendant re #6 MOTION to Dismiss. (jta) (Entered: 01/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) MOTION for the Entry of Dismissal of the Plaintiffs' Complaint and an Entry of Final Judgment in favor of the Genesis Lighthouse Ministries, Inc.,by Genesis Lighthouse Ministries, Inc.. (jta) (Entered: 01/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketClerk's Certificate of Mailing as to James Cleveland Forest, Jr. re #5 Order for Service of Final Report and Recommendation and #4 FINAL REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION. (klb) (Entered: 01/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ORDER for Service of #4 Final Report and Recommendation, by Magistrate Judge Walter E. Johnson. Each party may file written objections to the Report & Recommendation within 14 days of service. If no objections are filed, the Report & Recommendation may be adopted as the opinion and order of the District Court. Signed by Magistrate Judge Walter E. Johnson on 1/6/20. (klb) (Entered: 01/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) FINAL REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re #1 Notice of Removal, filed by Genesis Lighthouse Ministries, Inc., Marcellous Jackson. The undersigned REPORTS that this Court does not have subject matter jurisdiction over this case and RECOMMENDS that it be remanded to the Superior Court of Fulton County, Georgia. Signed by Magistrate Judge Walter E. Johnson on 1/6/20. (klb) (Entered: 01/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSubmission of #3 MOTION to Dismiss, to Magistrate Judge Walter E. Johnson. (jta) (Entered: 12/31/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) MOTION to Dismiss by Genesis Lighthouse Ministries, Inc. and Marcellous Jackson. (eop) (Entered: 12/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) ANSWER to #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with Jury Demand; and COUNTERCLAIM against James Cleveland Forest, Jr. with Jury Demand by Genesis Lighthouse Ministries, Inc. and Marcellous Jackson.( Discovery ends on 5/11/2020.)(eop) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions. (Entered: 12/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL with COMPLAINT filed by Marcellous Jackson and Genesis Lighthouse Ministeries, Inc.. (Filing fee $ 400.00 receipt number GAN100117898) (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(eop) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form. Modified on 12/12/2019 to add filer (eop). (Entered: 12/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.