This case was last updated from PACER on 01/05/2021 at 08:01:50 (UTC).

Foremost Insurance Company Grand Rapids, Michigan v. Salty's Marina, Ltd. et al

Case Summary

On 11/06/2020 Foremost Insurance Company Grand Rapids, Michigan filed a Contract - Marine lawsuit against Salty's Marina, Ltd. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Louisiana Eastern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Janis van Meerveld and Greg Gerard Guidry. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:20-CV-03024

  • Filing Date:

    11/06/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Marine

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Janis van Meerveld

Presiding Judge

Greg Gerard Guidry

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Foremost Insurance Company Grand Rapids, Michigan

Defendants

Salty's Marina, Ltd.

Bent Marine, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Valerie Briggs Bargas

Attorney at Kinchen, Walker, Bienvenu, Bargas, Reed & Helm, LLC

9456 Jefferson Highway, Building Iii, Suite F

Baton Rouge, LA 70809

Randall Jay Poelma, Jr.

Attorney at Doyen Sebesta & Poelma, LLLP

16945 Northchase Dr, Ste 1400

Houston, TX 77060

Defendant Attorneys

Matthew Armin Moeller

Attorney at Moeller Firm, LLC

650 Poydras Street, Suite 1207

New Orleans, LA 70130

Alfred Jackson Rufty, III

Attorney at Harris & Rufty, LLC

650 Poydras St., Suite 2710

New Orleans, LA 70130

Rufus C. Harris, III

Attorney at Harris & Rufty, LLC

650 Poydras St., Suite 2710

New Orleans, LA 70130

Cindy Galpin Martin

Attorney at Harris & Rufty, LLC

650 Poydras St., Suite 2710

New Orleans, LA 70130

 

Court Documents

#20

(#20) NOTICE by Foremost Insurance Company Grand Rapids, Michigan of Interested Parties. (Poelma, Randall) (Entered: 01/04/2021)

#19

(#19) Statement of Corporate Disclosure by Foremost Insurance Company Grand Rapids, Michigan identifying Corporate Parent Farmers Insurance Exchange, Fire Insurance Exchange, Truck Insurance Exchange for Foremost Insurance Company Grand Rapids, Michigan (Poelma, Randall) Modified text/added Corporate Parents on 1/4/2021 (mm). (Entered: 01/04/2021)

#18

(#18) Statement of Corporate Disclosure by Bent Marine, LLC (Harris, Rufus) (Entered: 12/31/2020)

#17

(#17) NOTICE Scheduling Conference set for 1/28/2021 at 10:00 AM before case manager by telephone. By Clerk.(dp) (Entered: 12/30/2020)

#16

(#16) ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Salty's Marina, Ltd. Attorney Matthew Armin Moeller added to party Salty's Marina, Ltd.(pty:dft).(Moeller, Matthew) (Entered: 12/29/2020)

#15

(#15) ORDER Denied as moot #11 Motion to Quash. Oral argument set for 1/6/2021 is CANCELLED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Janis van Meerveld on 12/18/2020. (ajn) (Entered: 12/18/2020)

#11

(#12) Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #11 MOTION to Quash Subpoena Duces Tecum Served on Donald J. Smith and Port City Marine. **Filing attorney should have changed 'N' to 'Y' at the question 'Is this motion to be decided by the Magistrate Judge Y/N?'. This motion will be decided by the Magistrate Judge. Clerk took corrective action.** (mm) (Entered: 12/15/2020)

7 #3

Proposed Order Order on Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice

7 #2

Exhibit - Declaration in Support of Admission

7 #1

Exhibit - Certificate of Good Standing

#6

(#6) SUMMONS Returned Executed; Salty's Marina, Ltd. served on 11/9/2020, answer due 11/30/2020. (Bargas, Valerie) Modified text on 11/10/2020 (mm). (Entered: 11/10/2020)

#5

(#5) DEFICIENT SUMMONS Returned Executed; Salty's Marina, Ltd. served on 11/9/2020, answer due 11/30/2020. (Bargas, Valerie) Modified text on 11/10/2020 (lt). (Entered: 11/09/2020)

4 #1

Summons

#4

(#4) Summons Issued as to Bent Marine, LLC, Salty's Marina, Ltd. (Attachments: #1 Summons)(lt) (Entered: 11/09/2020)

3 #1

Summons Salty's Marina, Ltd.

#3

(#3) Summons Submitted for Issuance (Attachments: #1 Summons Salty's Marina, Ltd.)(Bargas, Valerie) (Entered: 11/06/2020)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#16) ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Salty's Marina, Ltd. Attorney Matthew Armin Moeller added to party Salty's Marina, Ltd.(pty:dft).(Moeller, Matthew) (Entered: 12/29/2020)

28 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #19 Statement of Corporate Disclosure. **Filing attorney did not enter Farmers Insurance Exchange, Fire Insurance Exchange, and Truck Insurance Exchange as corporate parents at the prompt 'Search for a corporate parent or other affiliate'. Clerk took corrective action.** (mm) (Entered: 01/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) NOTICE by Foremost Insurance Company Grand Rapids, Michigan of Interested Parties. (Poelma, Randall) (Entered: 01/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) Statement of Corporate Disclosure by Foremost Insurance Company Grand Rapids, Michigan identifying Corporate Parent Farmers Insurance Exchange, Fire Insurance Exchange, Truck Insurance Exchange for Foremost Insurance Company Grand Rapids, Michigan (Poelma, Randall) Modified text/added Corporate Parents on 1/4/2021 (mm). (Entered: 01/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) Statement of Corporate Disclosure by Bent Marine, LLC (Harris, Rufus) (Entered: 12/31/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) NOTICE Scheduling Conference set for 1/28/2021 at 10:00 AM before case manager by telephone. By Clerk.(dp) (Entered: 12/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Salty's Marina, Ltd. Attorney Matthew Armin Moeller added to party Salty's Marina, Ltd.(pty:dft).(Moeller, Matthew) (Entered: 12/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) ORDER Denied as moot #11 Motion to Quash. Oral argument set for 1/6/2021 is CANCELLED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Janis van Meerveld on 12/18/2020. (ajn) (Entered: 12/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE as to Plaintiff: ORDERED that, absent an appearance by defendant, Salty's Marina, LTD, plaintiff moves for entry of default on or before January 6, 2021, or show cause by written motion or memorandum, as is appropriate, why this defendant should not be dismissed for plaintiff's failure to prosecute. Failure to comply with this order may result in dismissal without further notice. Signed by Judge Greg Gerard Guidry on 12/16/2020.(ko) (Entered: 12/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) ORDER SETTING ORAL ARGUMENT: IT IS ORDERED that Oral Argument on #11 MOTION to Quash will be held via VIDEO CONFERENCE on Wednesday, 1/6/2021 at 11:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Janis van Meerveld. A link to join the conference will be circulated to counsel of record via email. Signed by Magistrate Judge Janis van Meerveld on 12/16/2020.(ajn) (Entered: 12/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #11 MOTION to Quash Subpoena Duces Tecum Served on Donald J. Smith and Port City Marine. **Filing attorney should have changed 'N' to 'Y' at the question 'Is this motion to be decided by the Magistrate Judge Y/N?'. This motion will be decided by the Magistrate Judge. Clerk took corrective action.** (mm) (Entered: 12/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 12/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) ORDER granting #8 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Randall Jay Poelma, Jr. Signed by Judge Greg Gerard Guidry on 12/07/2020. (Attachments: #1 Notice) (ko) (Entered: 12/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Bent Marine, LLC.Attorney Rufus C. Harris, III added to party Bent Marine, LLC(pty:dft).(Harris, Rufus) (Entered: 12/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice Randall Jay Poelma, Jr> (Fee previously paid) by Foremost Insurance Company Grand Rapids, Michigan. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit - Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Exhibit - Declaration in Support of Admission, #3 Consent to Electronic Filing, #4 Proposed Order Order on Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice)(Bargas, Valerie) Modified text on 12/7/2020 (pp). (Entered: 12/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) **DEFICIENT**EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $ 100 receipt number ALAEDC-8628385) by Foremost Insurance Company Grand Rapids, Michigan. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit - Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Exhibit - Declaration in Support of Admission, #3 Proposed Order Order on Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice)(Bargas, Valerie) Modified on 12/7/2020 (pp). (Entered: 12/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) SUMMONS Returned Executed; Salty's Marina, Ltd. served on 11/9/2020, answer due 11/30/2020. (Bargas, Valerie) Modified text on 11/10/2020 (mm). (Entered: 11/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) DEFICIENT SUMMONS Returned Executed; Salty's Marina, Ltd. served on 11/9/2020, answer due 11/30/2020. (Bargas, Valerie) Modified text on 11/10/2020 (lt). (Entered: 11/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Summons Issued as to Bent Marine, LLC, Salty's Marina, Ltd. (Attachments: #1 Summons)(lt) (Entered: 11/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Summons Submitted for Issuance (Attachments: #1 Summons Salty's Marina, Ltd.)(Bargas, Valerie) (Entered: 11/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2020
  • Docket(#2) Initial Case Assignment to Judge Greg Gerard Guidry and Magistrate Judge Janis van Meerveld. (go) (Entered: 11/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT with jury demand against Bent Marine, LLC, Salty's Marina, Ltd. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ALAEDC-8585058) filed by Foremost Insurance Company Grand Rapids, Michigan. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)Attorney Valerie Briggs Bargas added to party Foremost Insurance Company Grand Rapids, Michigan(pty:pla).(Bargas, Valerie) (Entered: 11/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Foremost Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Randall J. Poelma, Jr.

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Valerie Briggs Bargas