This case was last updated from PACER on 11/29/2020 at 10:43:54 (UTC).

Foremost Farms USA, Cooperative v. Dairy Farmers of America, Inc.

Case Summary

On 09/30/2020 Foremost Farms USA, Cooperative filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Dairy Farmers of America, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Wisconsin Western District. The Judges overseeing this case are William M. Conley and Stephen L. Crocker. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:20-CV-00911

  • Filing Date:

    09/30/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Wisconsin Western District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

William M. Conley

Referral Judge

Stephen L. Crocker

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

FOREMOST FARMS USA, COOPERATIVE

Defendant

Dairy Farmers Of America, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Thomas Anthony Agnello

Attorney at Michael Best & Friedrich, LLP

790 N. Water Street, Ste. 2500

Milwaukee, WI 53202

Ted A. Wisnefski

Attorney at Michael Best & Friedrich, LLP

790 N. Water Street, Ste. 2500

Milwaukee, WI 53202

Defendant Attorney

Christian Mark Poland

Attorney at Bryan Cave LLP

161 N. Clark Street

Chicago, IL 60601

 

Court Documents

#16

(#16) Pretrial Conference Order - # Preliminary Pretrial Packet in cases assigned to District Judge William M. Conley attached. Dispositive Motions due 10/8/2021. Settlement Letters due 1/21/2022. Motions in Limine due 1/28/2022. Response to Motion due 2/11/2022. Final Pretrial Conference set for 2/22/2022 at 04:00 PM. Jury Selection and Trial set for 3/7/2022 at 09:00 AM. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker on 11/23/2020. (voc) (Entered: 11/23/2020)

#15

(#15) Declaration of Joseph Brinker filed by Defendant Dairy Farmers of America, Inc. with its Reply Brief in Support of Its re: #8 Motion to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction, (Poland, Christian) (Entered: 11/20/2020)

#14

(#14) Brief in Reply by Defendant Dairy Farmers of America, Inc. in Support of #8 Motion to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction. (Poland, Christian) Modified on 11/20/2020. (lak) (Entered: 11/20/2020)

#13

(#13) Joint Preliminary Pretrial Conference Report by Plaintiff Foremost Farms USA, Cooperative (Agnello, Thomas) (Entered: 11/13/2020)

12 #1

Exhibit A - DFA's Annual Registration Report - 2016

#12

(#12) Declaration of Ted A. Wisnefski filed by Plaintiff Foremost Farms USA, Cooperative re: #8 Motion to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - DFA's Annual Registration Report - 2016) (Agnello, Thomas) (Entered: 11/10/2020)

11 #3

Exhibit C - Greenville Contract

11 #2

Exhibit B - Marshfield Contract

11 #1

Exhibit A - Reedsburg Contract

#2

(#2) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Plaintiff Foremost Farms USA, Cooperative. (Agnello, Thomas) Modified on 10/1/2020. (lak) (Entered: 09/30/2020)

1 #7

Summons Summons

1 #6

JS-44 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet

1 #5

Exhibit Exhibit E

1 #4

Exhibit Exhibit D

1 #3

Exhibit Exhibit C

1 #2

Exhibit Exhibit B

1 #1

Exhibit Exhibit A

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against Dairy Farmers of America, Inc., ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0758-2758124.), filed by Foremost Farms USA, Cooperative, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Letter dated April 4, 2020, #2 Exhibit B - Letter dated August 14, 2020, #3 Exhibit C - Letter dated May 1, 2019, #4 Exhibit D - Letter dated October 14, 2019, #5 Exhibit E - Milk Supply Agreement, #6 JS-44 Civil Cover Sheet, #7 Summons) (Agnello, Thomas) Modified on 10/1/2020: Corrected parties, deleted addresses, deleted duplicate text, added exhibit descriptions. E-mail sent to counsel. (lak) (Entered: 09/30/2020)

26 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) Pretrial Conference Order - # Preliminary Pretrial Packet in cases assigned to District Judge William M. Conley attached. Dispositive Motions due 10/8/2021. Settlement Letters due 1/21/2022. Motions in Limine due 1/28/2022. Response to Motion due 2/11/2022. Final Pretrial Conference set for 2/22/2022 at 04:00 PM. Jury Selection and Trial set for 3/7/2022 at 09:00 AM. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker on 11/23/2020. (voc) (Entered: 11/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2020
  • DocketMinute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker: Telephone Preliminary Pretrial Conference held on 11/20/2020 [:10] (cak) (Entered: 11/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) Declaration of Joseph Brinker filed by Defendant Dairy Farmers of America, Inc. with its Reply Brief in Support of Its re: #8 Motion to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction, (Poland, Christian) (Entered: 11/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) Brief in Reply by Defendant Dairy Farmers of America, Inc. in Support of #8 Motion to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction. (Poland, Christian) Modified on 11/20/2020. (lak) (Entered: 11/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2020
  • DocketSet Telephone Pretrial or Status Conference: Telephone Pretrial Conference set for 11/18/2020 at 01:30 PM rescheduled to 11/20/2020 at 03:00 PM to accommodate the court's calendar. Counsel for the Plaintiff remains responsible for setting up the call to chambers at (608) 264-5153. (cak) (Entered: 11/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) Joint Preliminary Pretrial Conference Report by Plaintiff Foremost Farms USA, Cooperative (Agnello, Thomas) (Entered: 11/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) Declaration of Ted A. Wisnefski filed by Plaintiff Foremost Farms USA, Cooperative re: #8 Motion to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - DFA's Annual Registration Report - 2016) (Agnello, Thomas) (Entered: 11/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) Declaration of Darin K. Hanson filed by Plaintiff Foremost Farms USA, Cooperative re: #8 Motion to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Reedsburg Contract, #2 Exhibit B - Marshfield Contract, #3 Exhibit C - Greenville Contract) (Agnello, Thomas) (Entered: 11/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Brief in Opposition by Plaintiff Foremost Farms USA, Cooperative re: #8 Motion to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction, filed by Dairy Farmers of America, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. A - DFA's Complaint in the Kansas Action, #2 Exhibit Ex. B - Proof of Service in the Kansas Action, #3 Exhibit Ex. C - Foremost's Motion to Stay, Dismiss, or Transfer the Kansas Action, #4 Exhibit Ex. D - Foremost's Memorandum in Support of Motion to Stay, Dismiss, or Transfer the Kansas Action, #5 Exhibit Ex. E - National Judicial Caseload Profile) (Agnello, Thomas) (Entered: 11/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2020
  • DocketSet Telephone Pretrial Conference: Telephone Pretrial Conference set for 11/18/2020 at 01:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. Counsel for Plaintiff responsible for setting up the call to chambers at (608) 264-5153. [#Standing Order Governing Preliminary Pretrial Conference attached] (voc) (Entered: 10/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 10/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) MOTION TO DISMISS for Lack of Jurisdiction by Defendant Dairy Farmers of America, Inc.. Brief in Opposition due 11/10/2020. Brief in Reply due 11/20/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Declaration of Timothy J. Davis) (Poland, Christian) (Entered: 10/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Defendant Dairy Farmers of America, Inc.. (Poland, Christian) (Entered: 10/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Notice of Appearance filed by Christian Mark Poland for Defendant Dairy Farmers of America, Inc.. (Poland, Christian) (Entered: 10/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Summons Returned Executed. Dairy Farmers of America, Inc. served on 10/1/2020, answer due 10/22/2020. (Agnello, Thomas) (Entered: 10/05/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Summons Issued as to Dairy Farmers of America, Inc. (voc) (Entered: 10/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2020
  • DocketStandard attachments for Judge William M. Conley required to be served on all parties with summons or waiver of service: # NORTC, #Corporate Disclosure Statement. (voc) (Entered: 10/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2020
  • DocketCase randomly assigned to District Judge William M. Conley and Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. (voc) (Entered: 10/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Notice of Appearance filed by Ted A. Wisnefski for Plaintiff Foremost Farms USA, Cooperative. (Wisnefski, Ted) (Entered: 10/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Plaintiff Foremost Farms USA, Cooperative. (Agnello, Thomas) Modified on 10/1/2020. (lak) (Entered: 09/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Dairy Farmers of America, Inc., ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0758-2758124.), filed by Foremost Farms USA, Cooperative, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Letter dated April 4, 2020, #2 Exhibit B - Letter dated August 14, 2020, #3 Exhibit C - Letter dated May 1, 2019, #4 Exhibit D - Letter dated October 14, 2019, #5 Exhibit E - Milk Supply Agreement, #6 JS-44 Civil Cover Sheet, #7 Summons) (Agnello, Thomas) Modified on 10/1/2020: Corrected parties, deleted addresses, deleted duplicate text, added exhibit descriptions. E-mail sent to counsel. (lak) (Entered: 09/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less