Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from PACER on 10/21/2019 at 07:17:39 (UTC).

Fore Stars, Ltd. et al v. City of Las Vegas et al

Case Summary

On 08/22/2019 Fore Stars, Ltd filed a Property - Eminent Domain lawsuit against City of Las Vegas. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Nevada District. The Judges overseeing this case are Nancy J. Koppe and Jennifer A. Dorsey. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:19-CV-01469

  • Filing Date:

    08/22/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Eminent Domain

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Nevada District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Nancy J. Koppe

Presiding Judge

Jennifer A. Dorsey

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Fore Stars, Ltd.

Seventy Acres, LLC

Defendants

Jim Crockett

The Eighth Judicial District Court

City of Las Vegas

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Michael Schneider

Attorney at Law Offices of Kermitt L. Waters

704 S 9Th Street

Las Vegas, NV 89101

Kermitt L Waters

Attorney at Kermitt L Waters, Law Office Of

704 S 9Th Street

Las Vegas, NV 89101

Autumn Waters

Attorney at Law Offices of Kermitt L. Waters

704 S 9Th Street

Las Vegas, NV 89101

James Jack Leavitt

Attorney at Law Offices of Kermitt L. Waters

704 South Ninth Street

Las Vegas, NV 89101

Defendant Attorneys

Steven Shevorski

Attorney at Nevada Office of the Attorney General

555 E. Washington Avenue, Suite 3900

Las Vegas, NV 89101

John C Molina

Attorney at McDonald Carano, LLP

2300 West Sahara Avenue, Suite 1200

Las Vegas, NV 89102

Debbie Leonard

Attorney at Leonard Law

955 S. Virginia Street, Suite 220

Reno, NV 89502

Seth T. Floyd

Attorney at City of Las Vegas - City Attorney's Office

495 S. Main Street, 6Th Floor

Las Vegas, NV 89101

George F. Ogilvie, III

Attorney at McDonald Carano Wilson LLP

2300 W Sahara Avenue, Suite 1200

Las Vegas, NV 89102

Bradford R. Jerbic

Attorney at Las Vegas City Attorney's Office

495 South Main Street, 6Th Floor

Las Vegas, NV 89101

Amanda C Yen

Attorney at McDonald Carano Wilson

2300 W. Sahara, Suite 1200

Las Vegas, NV 89102

Philip R. Byrnes

Attorney at City Atty's Office- Civil Division

495 South Main Street, 6Th Floor

Las Vegas, NV 89101

Lauren Tarpey

Attorney at Shute Mihaly & Weinberger LLP

396 Hayes St

San Francisco, CA 94102

Andrew W. Schwartz

Attorney at Shute Mihaly & Weinberger LLP

396 Hayes St

San Francisco, CA 94102

 

Court Documents

#16

(#16) ORDER Granting #14 Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Lauren Tarpey and approving Attorney George F. Ogilvie, III as Designation of Local Counsel for City of Las Vegas. Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 10/10/2019. Any Attorney not yet registered with the Court's CM/ECF System shall submit a Registration Form on the Court's website #www.nvd.uscourts.gov(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD) (Entered: 10/10/2019)

#15

(#15) ORDER Granting #13 Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Andrew W. Schwartz and approving Attorney George F. Ogilvie, III as Designation of Local Counsel for City of Las Vegas. Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 10/10/2019. Any Attorney not yet registered with the Court's CM/ECF System shall submit a Registration Form on the Court's website #www.nvd.uscourts.gov(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD) (Entered: 10/10/2019)

#14

(#14) MOTION/VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by Lauren Tarpey and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel George F. Ogilvie III (Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0978-5734324) by Defendant City of Las Vegas. (Ogilvie, George) (Entered: 10/10/2019)

#13

(#13) MOTION/VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by Andrew W. Schwartz and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel George F. Ogilvie III (Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0978-5734234) by Defendant City of Las Vegas. (Ogilvie, George) (Entered: 10/10/2019)

12 #2

Exhibit Defendant Michaels Stores, Inc.'s Notice of Removal of Action Under

12 #1

Exhibit 1.7.2019 Email from City to EHB

#12

(#12) REPLY to Response to #8 Motion to Remand to State Court,,,,,,,, by Plaintiffs Fore Stars, Ltd., Seventy Acres, LLC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1.7.2019 Email from City to EHB, #2 Exhibit Defendant Michaels Stores, Inc.'s Notice of Removal of Action Under 28 U.S.C. 1332(A), 1441, 1446 and 1453 filed 4.27.12)(Schneider, Michael) (Entered: 10/07/2019)

8 #15

City of Las Vegas Motion to Dismiss, Eighth Judicial District Court Case No. A-

8 #10

Order Staying Proceedings for Eighth Judicial District Court Case No. A-18-7732

8 #9

Court Minutes for Eighth Judicial District Court Case No. A-18-775804-J dated 2

8 #8

Nevada Supreme Court Order Denying Rehearing, case no. 78792, filed 7.24.19

8 #7

Nevada Supreme Court Order Denying Petition for Writ of Mandamus of Prohibition

8 #6

City of Las Vegas Petition for En Banc Reconsideration filed with the Nevada Su

8 #5

City of Las Vegas Petition for Rehearing filed with the Nevada Supreme Court, c

8 #4

City of Las Vegas Petition for Writ of Mandamus, Or in the Alternative, Writ of

8 #3

City of Las Vegas Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings on Developers Inverse Co

8 #2

City of Las Vegas Opposition to Plaintiff Landowners Request for Rehearing/Reco

#8

(#8) MOTION to Remand to State Court by Plaintiffs Fore Stars, Ltd., Seventy Acres, LLC. Responses due by 9/30/2019. (Attachments: #1 City of Las Vegas Motion to Dismiss Or, In the Alternative, Motion to Strike for Eighth Judicial District Court Case No. A-17-758528-J filed 10.30.17, #2 City of Las Vegas Opposition to Plaintiff Landowners Request for Rehearing/Reconsideration of Order/Judgment Dismissing Inverse Condemnation Claims for Eighth Judicial District Court Case No. A-17-758528-J filed 1.7.19, #3 City of Las Vegas Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings on Developers Inverse Condemnation Claims for Eighth Judicial District Court Case No. A-17-758528-J filed 2.13.19, #4 City of Las Vegas Petition for Writ of Mandamus, Or in the Alternative, Writ of Prohibition, for Eighth Judicial District Court Case No. A-17-758528-J filed with the Nevada Supreme Court, case no. 78792, 5.17.19, #5 City of Las Vegas Petition for Rehearing filed with the Nevada Supreme Court, case no. 78792, 6.10.19, #6 City of Las Vegas Petition for En Banc Reconsideration filed with the Nevada Supreme Court, case no. 78792, 8.6.19, #7 Nevada Supreme Court Order Denying Petition for Writ of Mandamus of Prohibition, case no. 78792, filed 5.24.19, #8 Nevada Supreme Court Order Denying Rehearing, case no. 78792, filed 7.24.19, #9 Court Minutes for Eighth Judicial District Court Case No. A-18-775804-J dated 2.15.19, #10 Order Staying Proceedings for Eighth Judicial District Court Case No. A-18-773268-C dated 2.28.19, #11 Court Minutes for Eighth Judicial District Court Case No. A-18-780184-C dated 5.1.19, #12 State of Nevada Motion to Dismiss, Eighth Judicial District Court Case No. A-18-773268-C, dated 8.23.18, #13 Nevada Supreme Court Order Denying En Banc Reconsideration, case no. 78792, filed 9.6.19, #14 Proof of Service Eighth Judicial District Court Case No. A-18-773268-C, dated 5.29.18, #15 City of Las Vegas Motion to Dismiss, Eighth Judicial District Court Case No. A-18-773268-C, dated 7.2.18) (Waters, Kermitt) (Entered: 09/16/2019)

38 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#16) ORDER Granting #14 Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Lauren Tarpey and approving Attorney George F. Ogilvie, III as Designation of Local Counsel for City of Las Vegas. Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 10/10/2019. Any Attorney not yet registered with the Court's CM/ECF System shall submit a Registration Form on the Court's website #www.nvd.uscourts.gov(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD) (Entered: 10/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#15) ORDER Granting #13 Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Andrew W. Schwartz and approving Attorney George F. Ogilvie, III as Designation of Local Counsel for City of Las Vegas. Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 10/10/2019. Any Attorney not yet registered with the Court's CM/ECF System shall submit a Registration Form on the Court's website #www.nvd.uscourts.gov(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD) (Entered: 10/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) MOTION/VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by Lauren Tarpey and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel George F. Ogilvie III (Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0978-5734324) by Defendant City of Las Vegas. (Ogilvie, George) (Entered: 10/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) MOTION/VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by Andrew W. Schwartz and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel George F. Ogilvie III (Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0978-5734234) by Defendant City of Las Vegas. (Ogilvie, George) (Entered: 10/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) REPLY to Response to #8 Motion to Remand to State Court,,,,,,,, by Plaintiffs Fore Stars, Ltd., Seventy Acres, LLC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1.7.2019 Email from City to EHB, #2 Exhibit Defendant Michaels Stores, Inc.'s Notice of Removal of Action Under 28 U.S.C. 1332(A), 1441, 1446 and 1453 filed 4.27.12)(Schneider, Michael) (Entered: 10/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) JOINDER to #10 Response,,,, by Defendants Jim Crockett, The Eighth Judicial District Court. (Shevorski, Steven) (Entered: 09/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) RESPONSE to #8 Motion to Remand to State Court,,,,,,,, by Defendant City of Las Vegas. Replies due by 10/7/2019. (Attachments: #1 Appendix of Exhibits to Opposition to Motion to Remand, #2 Exhibit Appendix Exhibit 1 - Portion of Minutes of April 4, 1990 Las Vegas City Council Meeting, #3 Exhibit Appendix Exhibit 2 - Peccole Ranch Master Plan, Phase Two, February 6, 1990, #4 Exhibit Appendix Exhibit 3 - Notice of Appeal, Eighth Judicial Case No. A-17-752344-J, March 23, 2018, #5 Exhibit Appendix Exhibit 4 - Docket Sheet Nevada Supreme Court Case No. 75481, #6 Exhibit Appendix Exhibit 5 - Plaintiffs' August 1, 2018 Opp. to City of Las Vegas Motion to Dismiss, #7 Exhibit Appendix Exhibit 6 - Plaintiffs October 3, 2018 Opp. to State of Nevadas Motion to Dismiss, #8 Exhibit Appendix Exhibit 7 - Las Vegas Review Journal Article, June 27, 2019, #9 Exhibit Appendix Exhibit 8 - Plaintiffs November 28, 2018 Reply in Support of Countermotion to Stay) (Leonard, Debbie) (Entered: 09/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) Joint STATUS REPORT by Defendant City of Las Vegas. (Ogilvie, George) (Entered: 09/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) MOTION to Remand to State Court by Plaintiffs Fore Stars, Ltd., Seventy Acres, LLC. Responses due by 9/30/2019. (Attachments: #1 City of Las Vegas Motion to Dismiss Or, In the Alternative, Motion to Strike for Eighth Judicial District Court Case No. A-17-758528-J filed 10.30.17, #2 City of Las Vegas Opposition to Plaintiff Landowners Request for Rehearing/Reconsideration of Order/Judgment Dismissing Inverse Condemnation Claims for Eighth Judicial District Court Case No. A-17-758528-J filed 1.7.19, #3 City of Las Vegas Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings on Developers Inverse Condemnation Claims for Eighth Judicial District Court Case No. A-17-758528-J filed 2.13.19, #4 City of Las Vegas Petition for Writ of Mandamus, Or in the Alternative, Writ of Prohibition, for Eighth Judicial District Court Case No. A-17-758528-J filed with the Nevada Supreme Court, case no. 78792, 5.17.19, #5 City of Las Vegas Petition for Rehearing filed with the Nevada Supreme Court, case no. 78792, 6.10.19, #6 City of Las Vegas Petition for En Banc Reconsideration filed with the Nevada Supreme Court, case no. 78792, 8.6.19, #7 Nevada Supreme Court Order Denying Petition for Writ of Mandamus of Prohibition, case no. 78792, filed 5.24.19, #8 Nevada Supreme Court Order Denying Rehearing, case no. 78792, filed 7.24.19, #9 Court Minutes for Eighth Judicial District Court Case No. A-18-775804-J dated 2.15.19, #10 Order Staying Proceedings for Eighth Judicial District Court Case No. A-18-773268-C dated 2.28.19, #11 Court Minutes for Eighth Judicial District Court Case No. A-18-780184-C dated 5.1.19, #12 State of Nevada Motion to Dismiss, Eighth Judicial District Court Case No. A-18-773268-C, dated 8.23.18, #13 Nevada Supreme Court Order Denying En Banc Reconsideration, case no. 78792, filed 9.6.19, #14 Proof of Service Eighth Judicial District Court Case No. A-18-773268-C, dated 5.29.18, #15 City of Las Vegas Motion to Dismiss, Eighth Judicial District Court Case No. A-18-773268-C, dated 7.2.18) (Waters, Kermitt) (Entered: 09/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) STATEMENT REGARDING REMOVAL by Defendant City of Las Vegas. (Ogilvie, George) (Entered: 09/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) NOTICE OF RELATED CASES 2:19-cv-01467-KJD-DJA, 2:19-cv-01470-RFB-BNW and 2:19-cv-01471-JCM-EJY by Defendant City of Las Vegas. (Ogilvie, George) (Entered: 08/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE for #3 Minute Order Removal Case, by Defendant City of Las Vegas. (Ogilvie, George) (Entered: 08/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) JOINDER to #1 Petition for Removal,, by Defendant The Eighth Judicial District Court. (Shevorski, Steven) (Entered: 08/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 8/22/2019. Statement regarding removed action is due by 9/6/2019. Joint Status Report regarding removed action is due by 9/21/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD) (Entered: 08/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2019
  • Case randomly assigned to Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey and Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe. (SLD) (Entered: 08/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by City of Las Vegas. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Ogilvie, George) (Entered: 08/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) PETITION FOR REMOVAL from Clark County District Court, Case Number A-18-773268-C, (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0978-5675695) by City of Las Vegas. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Complaint for Declaratory Relief and Injunctive Relief and in Inverse, #2 Exhibit B - State Court Action Prior Pleadings, Process and Orders, #3 Exhibit C - United States Supreme Court Case No. 17-647 Docket and Notice of, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(Ogilvie, George) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court. (Entered: 08/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Fore Stars, Ltd. is a litigant

Latest cases where The Eighth Judicial District Court is a litigant