This case was last updated from PACER on 10/17/2020 at 10:46:18 (UTC).

Ford v. United States of America et al

Case Summary

On 08/18/2020 Ford filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against United States of America. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Mississippi Southern District. The Judges overseeing this case are John C. Gargiulo and David C. Bramlette, III. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:20-CV-00546

  • Filing Date:

    08/18/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Mississippi Southern District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

John C. Gargiulo

Presiding Judge

David C. Bramlette, III

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Raisa Ford

Defendants

Andrei M. Matthews

United States of America

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Omar Lamont Nelson

Attorney at GIBBS TRAVIS, PLLC

210 E. Capitol Street, Suite 1801

Jackson, MS 39201

Defendant Attorneys

Tabitha Bandi-Federal Gov

Attorney at U. S. ATTORNEY'S OFFICE - Jackson

501 East Court Street, Suite 4.430

Jackson, MS 39201

Mitzi Dease Paige-Federal Gov

Attorney at U. S. ATTORNEY'S OFFICE - Jackson

501 East Court Street, Suite 4.430

Jackson, MS 39201

 

Court Documents

#5

(#5) NOTICE of Appearance by Tabitha Bandi-Federal Gov on behalf of United States of America (Bandi-Federal Gov, Tabitha) (Entered: 10/16/2020)

#4

(#4) ANSWER to #1 Complaint by United States of America.(Paige-Federal Gov, Mitzi) (Entered: 10/16/2020)

#3

(#3) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Raisa Ford. United States of America served on 8/21/2020, answer due 10/20/2020. (Nelson, Omar) (Entered: 09/02/2020)

#2

(#2) Summons Issued as to United States of America, U.S. Attorney. (cwl) (Entered: 08/20/2020)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against Andrei M. Matthews, United States of America ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 05384350281), filed by Raisa Ford. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(MGB) (Entered: 08/18/2020)

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE of Appearance by Tabitha Bandi-Federal Gov on behalf of United States of America (Bandi-Federal Gov, Tabitha) (Entered: 10/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ANSWER to #1 Complaint by United States of America.(Paige-Federal Gov, Mitzi) (Entered: 10/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Raisa Ford. United States of America served on 8/21/2020, answer due 10/20/2020. (Nelson, Omar) (Entered: 09/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Summons Issued as to United States of America, U.S. Attorney. (cwl) (Entered: 08/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Andrei M. Matthews, United States of America ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 05384350281), filed by Raisa Ford. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(MGB) (Entered: 08/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less