Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from PACER on 04/19/2020 at 08:50:11 (UTC).

Ford v. Kelley et al

Case Summary

On 02/19/2020 Ford filed a Prisoner - Prison Condition lawsuit against Kelley. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Arkansas Eastern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Jerome T. Kearney and Kristine G. Baker. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:20-CV-00163

  • Filing Date:

    02/19/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Prison Condition

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Arkansas Eastern District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Jerome T. Kearney

Presiding Judge

Kristine G. Baker

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Damien Ford

Tucker, AR 72168-8713

Defendants

Dexter Payne

Shipman

Gibson

Wendy Kelley

Butler

Christopher

Scott

Correct Care Solutions

Bailey

Chapman

Lupor

Carrol

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

Vincent P. France

Attorney at Arkansas Attorney General's Office

Catlett-Prien Tower Building, 323 Center Street, Suite 200

Little Rock, AR 72201-2610

 

Court Documents

#10

(#10) ANSWER to #2 Complaint with Jury Demand by Butler.(France, Vincent) (Entered: 04/13/2020)

#9

(#9) NOTICE of Appearance by Vincent P. France on behalf of Butler (France, Vincent) (Entered: 04/13/2020)

#8

(#8) OBJECTION to #5 Report and Recommendations by Damien Ford. (kdr) (Entered: 03/30/2020)

#7

(#7) ORDER granting #4 Plaintiff's Motion to Proceed In Forma Pauperis; directing monthly payments be made from Plaintiff's prison trust account for the $350 filing fee; directing the Clerk of the Court to prepare summons for the Defendants Chapman, Bailey, and Butler; directing the United States Marshal to serve a copy of #2 Complaint and summons on Defendants, without prepayment of fees and costs or security therefore; and directing the Clerk to forward a copy of this Order to the ADC Compliance Office, the ADC Trust Fund Centralized Banking Office, and the Warden of the Maximum Security Unit. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 03/19/2020. (ajt) (Entered: 03/19/2020)

#6

(#6) INITIAL ORDER FOR PRO SE PRISONERS. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 03/19/2020. (lmc) (Entered: 03/19/2020)

#5

(#5) PROPOSED FINDING AND RECOMMENDATIONS recommending #2 that Defendants Kelley, Payne, Gibson, Shipman, Carrol, Christopher, Scott, Correct Care Solutions, and Lupor be DISMISSED without prejudice for failure to state a claim. Objections are due no later than 14 days from the date of the findings and recommendations and findings. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 03/19/2020. (lmc) Docket text modified on 3/20/2020 to correct typographical error. (kbc) (Entered: 03/19/2020)

#4

(#4) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Damien Ford. (llg) (Entered: 03/16/2020)

#3

(#3) ORDER denying without prejudice #1 Motion to proceed in forma pauperis. Plaintiff shall submit either the $400 statutory filing fee or a completed IFP application within 30 days of the entry date of this Order. The Clerk shall send to Plaintiff an in forma pauperis application and calculation sheet. The Clerk also shall forward a copy of this Order to the Warden and Financial Officer at the Maximum Security Unit. Service is not appropriate at this time. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 2/21/2020. (jak) (Entered: 02/22/2020)

#2

(#2) COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against All Defendants filed by Damien Ford. (ljb) (Entered: 02/19/2020)

#1

(#1) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Damien Ford. (ljb) (Entered: 02/19/2020)

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) ANSWER to #2 Complaint with Jury Demand by Butler.(France, Vincent) (Entered: 04/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE of Appearance by Vincent P. France on behalf of Butler (France, Vincent) (Entered: 04/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) OBJECTION to #5 Report and Recommendations by Damien Ford. (kdr) (Entered: 03/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2020
  • DocketSummons Issued as to Bailey, Butler, Chapman and forwarded to USMS for service. (ajt) (Entered: 03/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ORDER granting #4 Plaintiff's Motion to Proceed In Forma Pauperis; directing monthly payments be made from Plaintiff's prison trust account for the $350 filing fee; directing the Clerk of the Court to prepare summons for the Defendants Chapman, Bailey, and Butler; directing the United States Marshal to serve a copy of #2 Complaint and summons on Defendants, without prepayment of fees and costs or security therefore; and directing the Clerk to forward a copy of this Order to the ADC Compliance Office, the ADC Trust Fund Centralized Banking Office, and the Warden of the Maximum Security Unit. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 03/19/2020. (ajt) (Entered: 03/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) INITIAL ORDER FOR PRO SE PRISONERS. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 03/19/2020. (lmc) (Entered: 03/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) PROPOSED FINDING AND RECOMMENDATIONS recommending #2 that Defendants Kelley, Payne, Gibson, Shipman, Carrol, Christopher, Scott, Correct Care Solutions, and Lupor be DISMISSED without prejudice for failure to state a claim. Objections are due no later than 14 days from the date of the findings and recommendations and findings. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 03/19/2020. (lmc) Docket text modified on 3/20/2020 to correct typographical error. (kbc) (Entered: 03/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Damien Ford. (llg) (Entered: 03/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ORDER denying without prejudice #1 Motion to proceed in forma pauperis. Plaintiff shall submit either the $400 statutory filing fee or a completed IFP application within 30 days of the entry date of this Order. The Clerk shall send to Plaintiff an in forma pauperis application and calculation sheet. The Clerk also shall forward a copy of this Order to the Warden and Financial Officer at the Maximum Security Unit. Service is not appropriate at this time. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 2/21/2020. (jak) (Entered: 02/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against All Defendants filed by Damien Ford. (ljb) (Entered: 02/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Damien Ford. (ljb) (Entered: 02/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Christopher is a litigant

Latest cases where Chapman is a litigant

Latest cases where Shipman is a litigant

Latest cases where Butler AKA Bryce Chandler Butler, Bryce C is a litigant