This case was last updated from PACER on 01/07/2020 at 07:48:56 (UTC).

Ford v. Inc.

Case Summary

On 11/08/2019 Ford filed a Property - Land lawsuit against Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Southern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Andrew S Hanen. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:19-CV-04422

  • Filing Date:

    11/08/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Land

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Texas Southern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Andrew S Hanen

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Larry D. Ford

Humble, TX 77338

Defendant

Blackstone Group Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

Christopher Patton

Attorney at Lynn Pinker Cox & Hurst, LLP

2100 Ross Ave, Ste 2700

Dallas, TX 75201

 

Court Documents

#11

(#11) MOTION for Approval for electronic case filing by Larry D. Ford, filed. Motion Docket Date 12/30/2019. (rhawkins) (Entered: 12/09/2019)

#10

(#10) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Blackstone Group Inc., filed.(Patton, Christopher) (Entered: 11/27/2019)

#9

(#9) PROPOSED ORDER re: #7 MOTION to Dismiss , filed.(Patton, Christopher) (Entered: 11/26/2019)

#8

(#8) APPENDIX re: #7 MOTION to Dismiss by Blackstone Group Inc., filed.(Patton, Christopher) (Entered: 11/25/2019)

#7

(#7) MOTION to Dismiss by Blackstone Group Inc., filed. Motion Docket Date 12/16/2019. (Patton, Christopher) (Entered: 11/25/2019)

#6

(#6) ORDER granting #2 Motion for Extension of Time. Defendant's deadline to file a responsive pleading to the Complaint is extended through November 25, 2019..(Signed by Judge Andrew S Hanen) Parties notified.(jdav, 4) (Entered: 11/14/2019)

#5

(#5) CERTIFICATE of Conference re: #2 First MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint by Blackstone Group Inc., filed.(Patton, Christopher) (Entered: 11/14/2019)

#4

(#4) ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 4/6/2020 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 704 before Magistrate Judge Frances H Stacy. (Signed by Judge Andrew S Hanen) Parties notified.(ClaudiaGutierrezadi, 4) (Entered: 11/14/2019)

#3

(#3) Civil Cover Sheet by Blackstone Group Inc., filed.(Patton, Christopher) (Entered: 11/13/2019)

2 #1

Proposed Order

#2

(#2) First MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint by Blackstone Group Inc., filed. Motion Docket Date 12/3/2019. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Patton, Christopher) (Entered: 11/12/2019)

1 #2

Appendix Documents attached toIndex of Matters Being Filed

1 #1

Appendix Index of Matters Being Filed

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 125th Judicial District Court of Harris County Texas, case number 42019-66545 (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0541-23534095) filed by Blackstone Group Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Appendix Index of Matters Being Filed, #2 Appendix Documents attached toIndex of Matters Being Filed)(Patton, Christopher) (Entered: 11/08/2019)

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) MOTION for Approval for electronic case filing by Larry D. Ford, filed. Motion Docket Date 12/30/2019. (rhawkins) (Entered: 12/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Blackstone Group Inc., filed.(Patton, Christopher) (Entered: 11/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) PROPOSED ORDER re: #7 MOTION to Dismiss , filed.(Patton, Christopher) (Entered: 11/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) APPENDIX re: #7 MOTION to Dismiss by Blackstone Group Inc., filed.(Patton, Christopher) (Entered: 11/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) MOTION to Dismiss by Blackstone Group Inc., filed. Motion Docket Date 12/16/2019. (Patton, Christopher) (Entered: 11/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) ORDER granting #2 Motion for Extension of Time. Defendant's deadline to file a responsive pleading to the Complaint is extended through November 25, 2019..(Signed by Judge Andrew S Hanen) Parties notified.(jdav, 4) (Entered: 11/14/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) CERTIFICATE of Conference re: #2 First MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint by Blackstone Group Inc., filed.(Patton, Christopher) (Entered: 11/14/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 4/6/2020 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 704 before Magistrate Judge Frances H Stacy. (Signed by Judge Andrew S Hanen) Parties notified.(ClaudiaGutierrezadi, 4) (Entered: 11/14/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Civil Cover Sheet by Blackstone Group Inc., filed.(Patton, Christopher) (Entered: 11/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) First MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint by Blackstone Group Inc., filed. Motion Docket Date 12/3/2019. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Patton, Christopher) (Entered: 11/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 125th Judicial District Court of Harris County Texas, case number 42019-66545 (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0541-23534095) filed by Blackstone Group Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Appendix Index of Matters Being Filed, #2 Appendix Documents attached toIndex of Matters Being Filed)(Patton, Christopher) (Entered: 11/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less