This case was last updated from PACER on 04/30/2019 at 07:22:42 (UTC).

Ford v. Chervon North America Inc

Case Summary

On 03/01/2019 Ford filed a Property - Other Personal Property lawsuit against Chervon North America Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, South Carolina District. The Judge overseeing this case is Henry M Herlong, Jr. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    6:19-CV-00601

  • Filing Date:

    03/01/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Personal Property

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    South Carolina District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Henry M Herlong, Jr

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Travis Ford

Defendant

Chervon North America Inc

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Albert S Nalibotsky

Attorney at Saltz Matkov PC

One Morrocroft Centre, 6805 Morrison Boulevard, Suite 470

Charlotte, NC 28211

 

Court Documents

#3

(#3) Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Travis Ford.(sfla) (Entered: 03/01/2019)

#4

(#4) Summons Issued as to Chervon North America Inc. (sfla) (Entered: 03/01/2019)

5 #1

Exhibit A - green card

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against Chervon North America Inc ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-8297351) filed by Travis Ford. Service due by 5/30/2019(sfla) (Entered: 03/01/2019)

#5

(#5) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Travis Ford. Chervon North America Inc served on 3/11/2019, answer due 4/1/2019. (Nalibotsky, Albert) (Main Document 5 replaced and Additional attachment added on 3/18/2019: #1 Exhibit A - green card - documents provided by filing user) (sfla). (Entered: 03/15/2019)

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Travis Ford. Chervon North America Inc served on 3/11/2019, answer due 4/1/2019. (Nalibotsky, Albert) (Main Document 5 replaced and Additional attachment added on 3/18/2019: #1 Exhibit A - green card - documents provided by filing user) (sfla). (Entered: 03/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Summons Issued as to Chervon North America Inc. (sfla) (Entered: 03/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Travis Ford.(sfla) (Entered: 03/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against Chervon North America Inc ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-8297351) filed by Travis Ford. Service due by 5/30/2019(sfla) (Entered: 03/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.