This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 06/13/2021 at 14:33:47 (UTC).

Ford Motor Credit Company LLC et al v. Faulkner

Case Summary

On 04/14/2021 Ford Motor Credit Company LLC filed a Bankruptcy - Other Bankruptcy lawsuit against Faulkner. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Northern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Sam R Cummings. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    5:21-CV-00090

  • Filing Date:

    04/14/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Bankruptcy - Other Bankruptcy

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Sam R Cummings

 

Party Details

Appellant

Ford Motor Credit Company LLC

Debtors

Reagor-Dykes III, L.L.C.

Reagor-Dykes Amarillo, LP

Reagor-Dykes Auto Mall I LLC

Reagor-Dykes Motors, L.P.

Reagor-Dykes Imports, LP

Reagor-Dykes Snyder, L.P.

Reagor-Dykes Floydada, L.P.

Reagor-Dykes II, L.L.C.

Reagor-Dykes Auto Company, L.P.

Reagor-Dykes Plainview, L.P.

Reagor Automall, Ltd.

Appellee

Dennis Faulkner

Not Classified By Court

Robert L Jones

Lubbock, TX 79401

Case Admin Sup

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Appellant Attorneys

Jacob Sonner

Attorney at Phillips Lytle LLP

One Canalside, 125 Main Street

Buffalo, NY 14203

Craig A Leslie

Attorney at Phillips Lytle LLP

One Canalside, 125 Main Street

Buffalo, NY 14203

Michael S Goldberg

Attorney at Baker Botts

910 Louisiana Street

Houston, TX 77002

Kevin M Sadler

Attorney at Baker Botts LLP

1001 Page Mill Road, Building One, Suite 200

Palo Alto, CA 94304

Michael W Eady

Attorney at Thompson Coe Cousins & Irons LLP

701 Brazos Suite 1500

Austin, TX 78701

Debtor and Appellee Attorneys

Bradley J Benoit

Attorney at Bracewell & Giuliani

711 Louisiana, Suite 2300

Houston, TX 77002-2770

Bryan Dumesnil

Attorney at Bracewell LLP

711 Louisiana, Suite 2300

Houston, TX 77002-2781

Diane M Crabtree

711 Louisiana St, Suite 2300

Houston, TX 77002

Benoit Bradley

Attorney at Bracewell LLLP

700 Louisiana, Suite 2300

Houston, TX 77002

Samuel Martin Stricklin

Attorney at Stricklin Law Firm PC

2435 N. Central Expwy, Suite 1200

Richardson, TX 75080

Sam M Stricklin

Attorney at Bracewell & Giuliani

1445 Ross Ave, Suite 3800

Dallas, TX 75202-2711

 

Court Documents

#1

1 #1

Service List

1 #2

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #3

Notice of Appeal

1 #4

Appealed Order

1 #5

Adversary Docket Sheet

1 #6

Bankruptcy Docket Sheet

#2

#3

#4

4 #1

Proposed Order

#5

#6

#7

#8

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/03/2021
  • Docket***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:8. Mon May 3 11:03:50 CDT 2021 (crt) (Entered: 05/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ORDER: For the reasons stated in Appellee's Response in Opposition, the Court hereby ORDERS that Appellant's Motion for Leave to Appeal be DENIED. The Court agrees with the bankruptcy court's determination in that the issue of the validity of Appellant's security interest in the transferred funds is best left for trial- or summary judgment. Accordingly, the Clerk of Court is directed to terminate this action. (Ordered by Senior Judge Sam R Cummings on 5/3/2021) (bmh) (Entered: 05/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) REPLY filed by Ford Motor Credit Company LLC re: #5 Brief in Support of Motion, #2 Motion for Leave to Appeal. (Sadler, Kevin) Modified text on 4/30/2021 (bdg). (Entered: 04/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Dennis Faulkner. (Benoit, Bradley) (Entered: 04/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Brief/Memorandum in Support filed by Dennis Faulkner re #4 Response/Objection (Benoit, Bradley) (Entered: 04/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) RESPONSE filed by Dennis Faulkner re: #2 Notice (Other) (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Benoit, Bradley) (Entered: 04/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Michael W Eady on behalf of Ford Motor Credit Company LLC. (Filer confirms contact info in ECF is current.) (Eady, Michael) (Entered: 04/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • DocketNEW CASE NOTES: A filing fee has been paid. (zzm) (Entered: 04/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE of Motion for Leave to Appeal filed by Ford Motor Credit Company LLC. (Longoria - TXNB, Sheree) (Entered: 04/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Pursuant to Fed. R. Bankr. P. 8003(d), the bankruptcy clerk has transmitted the notice of appeal filed in #bankruptcy case number 18-50214 and the notice of appeal has now been docketed in the district court in case 5:21-cv-90. (The filing fee has been paid in the Bankruptcy Court.) Pursuant to #Fed. R. Bankr. P. 8009, before the record on appeal can be assembled and filed in the district court, designations of items to be included in the record on appeal and statements of issues must be filed in the bankruptcy case. If a sealed document is designated, the designating party must file a motion in the district court case for the document to be accepted under seal. See also #District Court Local Bankruptcy Rule 8012.1. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: #Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Service List, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Notice of Appeal, #4 Appealed Order, #5 Adversary Docket Sheet, #6 Bankruptcy Docket Sheet) (Longoria - TXNB, Sheree) (Entered: 04/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where REAGOR DYKES MOTORS LP DOING BUSINESS AS REAGOR AUTO MALL DOING BUS is a litigant

Latest cases where Reagor-Dykes III, L.L.C. is a litigant

Latest cases where Ford Motor Company is a litigant