This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 10/25/2022 at 08:22:08 (UTC).

FORD et al v. CR ENGLAND INC. et al

Case Summary

On 08/26/2022 FORD filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against CR ENGLAND INC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New Jersey District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Renee Marie Bumb and Sharon A. King. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:22-CV-05266

  • Filing Date:

    08/26/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Renee Marie Bumb

Referral Judge

Sharon A. King

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

WILLIAM FORD

CHARICE LILLY

Defendants and Cross Claimants

CR ENGLAND INC.

BRENDA LILLY

CHRISTOPHER MCADAMS

Defendant and Cross Defendant

BRENDA LILLY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SERGEI OREL

Defendant and Cross Claimant Attorney

JEFFREY A. SEGAL

 

Court Documents

1 #1

Main Document

1 #1

Exhibit

1 #2

*Restricted*

#2

(#2) Exhibit to #1 Notice of Removal, CIS by CR ENGLAND INC., CHRISTOPHER MCADAMS. (SEGAL, JEFFREY) (Entered: 08/26/2022)

#3

(#3) Corporate Disclosure Statement by CR ENGLAND INC.. (SEGAL, JEFFREY) (Entered: 08/29/2022)

#4

(#4) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by CR ENGLAND INC., BRENDA LILLY re QC - Document contains an Electronic Signature of a Non-Attorney, #1 Notice of Removal, (SEGAL, JEFFREY) (Entered: 08/29/2022)

#5

(#5) ANSWER to Complaint , CROSSCLAIM against BRENDA LILLY by CR ENGLAND INC.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(SEGAL, JEFFREY) (Entered: 08/31/2022)

5 #1

Certificate of Service

#6

(#6) Order Initial Conference set for 9/27/2022 at 11:00 AM in Teleconference before Magistrate Judge Sharon A. King. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sharon A. King on 9/1/2022. (dmr) (Entered: 09/01/2022)

#8

(#8) Joint Discovery Plan by CR ENGLAND INC., CHRISTOPHER MCADAMS.(SEGAL, JEFFREY) (Entered: 09/20/2022)

#9

(#9) SCHEDULING ORDER: Telephone Status Conference set for 1/4/2023 at 11:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Sharon A. King. Amended Pleadings due by 1/18/2023. Pretrial Factual Discovery due by 3/31/2023. Dispositive Motions due by 8/21/2023 if expert discovery will be served. If no expert discovery will be served, Dispositive Motions shall be filed by 5/15/2023. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sharon A. King on 9/27/2022. (dmr) (Entered: 09/28/2022)

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) SCHEDULING ORDER: Telephone Status Conference set for 1/4/2023 at 11:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Sharon A. King. Amended Pleadings due by 1/18/2023. Pretrial Factual Discovery due by 3/31/2023. Dispositive Motions due by 8/21/2023 if expert discovery will be served. If no expert discovery will be served, Dispositive Motions shall be filed by 5/15/2023. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sharon A. King on 9/27/2022. (dmr) (Entered: 09/28/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/27/2022
  • DocketMinute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Sharon A. King: Initial Pretrial Conference held on 9/27/2022 by telephone. Scheduling Order to be entered (mb, ) (Entered: 09/27/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Joint Discovery Plan by CR ENGLAND INC., CHRISTOPHER MCADAMS.(SEGAL, JEFFREY) (Entered: 09/20/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/07/2022
  • Docket(#7) TEXT ORDER: The initial scheduling conference on September 27, 2022 at 11:00 am shall be held VIA TELEPHONE. Counsel shall utilize the following dial-in instructions for the conference 1-888-278-0296 Access code 2961061#. Additionally, the joint discovery plan shall be filed on the docket. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Sharon A. King on 9/7/22. (mb, ) (Entered: 09/07/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Order Initial Conference set for 9/27/2022 at 11:00 AM in Teleconference before Magistrate Judge Sharon A. King. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sharon A. King on 9/1/2022. (dmr) (Entered: 09/01/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/31/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ANSWER to Complaint , CROSSCLAIM against BRENDA LILLY by CR ENGLAND INC.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(SEGAL, JEFFREY) (Entered: 08/31/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/29/2022
  • DocketCLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - Please be advised the Exhibit [1-2] filed by Jefferey Segal on 8/26/2022 was placed under seal by the Clerk's office to protect personal identifiers. Please resubmit the Exhibit using the event "Redacted Document" found under the "Other Documents" menu (jab) (Entered: 08/29/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by CR ENGLAND INC., BRENDA LILLY re QC - Document contains an Electronic Signature of a Non-Attorney, #1 Notice of Removal, (SEGAL, JEFFREY) (Entered: 08/29/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/29/2022
  • DocketNotice of Judicial Preferences. #Click here for the Judge's Individual Procedure Requirements. (jab) (Entered: 08/29/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE #1 submitted by JEFFREY A. SEGAL on 08/26/2022 contains an improper signature. Only Registered Users are permitted to sign electronically filed documents with an s/. PLEASE RESUBMIT THE CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE WITH A PROPER ELECTRONIC OR SCANNED SIGNATURE. This submission will remain on the docket unless otherwise ordered by the court. (jab) (Entered: 08/29/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Corporate Disclosure Statement by CR ENGLAND INC.. (SEGAL, JEFFREY) (Entered: 08/29/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/26/2022
  • DocketJudge Renee Marie Bumb and Magistrate Judge Sharon A. King added. (dmw) (Entered: 08/29/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Exhibit to #1 Notice of Removal, CIS by CR ENGLAND INC., CHRISTOPHER MCADAMS. (SEGAL, JEFFREY) (Entered: 08/26/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/26/2022
  • DocketCLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The case you electronically filed did not include a Civil Cover Sheet (JS-44), which is required to be submitted along with the initial pleading, as indicated in the Attorney Case Opening Guide. Please complete and file a #Civil Cover Sheet using the event Exhibit (to Document) found under Civil/Other Filings/Other Documents. Please refer to the Attorney Case Opening Guide for processing electronically filed cases. (dmw, ) (Entered: 08/26/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by CR ENGLAND INC., CHRISTOPHER MCADAMS from Burlington County Superior Court, case number BUR-L-001511-22. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 402 receipt number ANJDC-13655005), filed by CR ENGLAND INC., CHRISTOPHER MCADAMS. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit)(SEGAL, JEFFREY) (Entered: 08/26/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less