This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 12/11/2020 at 22:15:51 (UTC).

Ford County, Kansas, Board of Commissioners v. Allergan PLC et al

Case Summary

On 09/29/2020 Ford County, Kansas, Board of Commissioners filed a Personal Injury - Medical/Pharmaceutical Product Liability lawsuit against Allergan PLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Kansas District. The Judges overseeing this case are Kenneth G. Gale and Daniel D. Crabtree. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    6:20-CV-01262

  • Filing Date:

    09/29/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Medical/Pharmaceutical Product Liability

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Kenneth G. Gale

Presiding Judge

Daniel D. Crabtree

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Ford County, Kansas, Board of Commissioners

Defendants

McKesson Corporation

Actavis Pharma, Inc. f/k/a Watson Pharma, Inc.

Dillon Companies, LLC

Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc., n/k/a Actavis, Inc.

McQueary Bros. Drug Company, LLC

Mallinckrodt LLC

Michael Babich

Walgreen Co. dba Walgreens #7817

Mallinckrodt PLC

Mylan Institutional, Inc.

Actavis, Inc.

Cardinal Health 200, LLC

Par Pharmaceuticals, Inc.

Does 1 through 1000

Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.

Wal-Mart Stores East, LP dba Walmart Supercenter #372

Cardinal Health 122, LLC

Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc.

Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc. n/k/a Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.

33 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Gary D. White, Jr.

Attorney at Palmer Law Group, LLC

2348 Sw Topeka Blvd.

Topeka, KS 66611

Dustin L. Van Dyk

Attorney at Palmer Law Group, LLC

2348 Sw Topeka Blvd.

Topeka, KS 66611

Defendant Attorneys

Anthony R. Martinez

Attorney at Shook, Hardy & Bacon LLP - KC/Grand

2555 Grand Boulevard

Kansas City, MO 64108-2613

Thomas A. Dower

Attorney at Gilliland Green, LLC - Hutchinson

One North Main Street, Suite 700

Hutchinson, KS 67501

Torrance R. Parkins

Attorney at Gilliland Green, LLC - Hutchinson

One North Main Street, Suite 700

Hutchinson, KS 67501

Robert M. Thompson

Attorney at Bryan Cave Leighton Paisner, LLP - KCMO

One Kansas City Place, 1200 Main Street, Suite 3800

Kansas City, MO 64105

Mary Anne Mellow

Attorney at Sandberg Phoenix & von Gontard, PC - STL

600 Washington Avenue, 15Th Floor

St. Louis, MO 63101-1313

Julie Fix Meyer

Attorney at Armstrong Teasdale, LLP - St. Louis

7700 Forsyth Blvd., Suite 1800

St. Louis, MO 63105

Tyler J. Scott

Attorney at Husch Blackwell LLP - 4801 Main

4801 Main Street, Suite 1000

Kansas City, MO 64112

Todd A. Nelson

Attorney at Gable Gotwals

1100 Oneok Plaza, 100 West Fifth Street

Tulsa, OK 74103-3318

Sandra J. Wunderlich

Attorney at Tucker Ellis, LLP -- St. Louis

100 South Fourth Street, Suite 600

St. Louis, MO 63102

Other Attorneys

Robert H. Bernstein

Attorney at Greenberg Traurig, LLP - NJ

500 Campus Drive, Suite 400

Florham Park, NJ 07932

Sean D. Walsh

Attorney at Hinkle Law Firm LLC - East Wichita Office

1617 North Waterfront Parkway, Suite 400

Wichita, KS 67206-6639

Sean M. Sturdivan

Attorney at Sanders Warren Russell & Scheer, LLP - OP

9401 Indian Creek Parkway, Suite 1250

Overland Park, KS 66210

Jeff P. DeGraffenreid

Attorney at Foulston Siefkin LLP - Wichita

1551 North Waterfront Parkway, Suite 100

Wichita, KS 67206-4466

Tyler Waugh

Attorney at Sanders Warren Russell & Scheer, LLP - OP

9401 Indian Creek Parkway, Suite 1250

Overland Park, KS 66210

Jason L. Bush

Polsinelli Pc - 48Th Street, 900 West 48Th Place, Suite 900

Kansas City, MO 64112-1895

Kara Trouslot Stubbs

Attorney at Baker, Sterchi, Cowden & Rice, LLC - KC

2400 Pershing Road, Suite 500

Kansas City, MO 64108-2533

 

Court Documents

#78

#77

#76

#75

#74

#73

#72

#71

#70

#69

#68

#67

#66

#65

#64

#63

#62

#61

79 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/22/2020
  • Docket(#79) DOCKET ANNOTATION: CASE: 6:20-cv-01262DETAILS: Case transferred from Kansas has been opened in Northern District of Ohio as case 1:20-op-45263, filed 10/20/2020. (sz) (Entered: 10/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2020
  • DocketCase transferred to Northern District of Ohio.(sz) (Entered: 10/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2020
  • Docket***Civil Case Terminated.(sz) (Entered: 10/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#78) CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO 176). Signed by John W. Nichols, Clerk of the Panel on 10/13/2020. (sz) (Entered: 10/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#77) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Dillon Companies, LLC identifying The Kroger Co. as corporate parent . (Dower, Thomas) (Entered: 10/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#76) ENTRY OF APPEARANCE by Thomas A. Dower on behalf of Dillon Companies, LLC. (Dower, Thomas) (Entered: 10/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#75) SUGGESTION OF BANKRUPTCY as to Mallinckrodt plc, Mallinckrodt LLC, SpecGX LLC. (Thompson, Robert) (Entered: 10/12/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#74) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Mallinckrodt LLC, SpecGx LLC identifying Mallinckrodt plc as corporate parent . (Thompson, Robert) (Entered: 10/12/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#73) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation identifying Novartis AG as corporate parent . (Bernstein, Robert) (Entered: 10/12/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#72) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Actavis LLC, Actavis Pharma, Inc., Watson Laboratories, Inc. identifying Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd as corporate parent (Nelson, Todd) (Entered: 10/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
62 More Docket Entries
  • 09/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED -- Actavis Pharma, Inc. served by certified mail. (Originally filed in the Ford County District Court on 9/21/2020.) (mam) (Entered: 10/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED -- Actavis LLC served by certified mail. (Originally filed in the Ford County District Court on 9/21/2020.) (mam) (Entered: 10/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED -- Allergan USA, Inc. served by certified mail. (Originally filed in the Ford County District Court on 9/21/2020.) (mam) (Entered: 10/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Janssen Pharmaceutica, Inc. n/k/a Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc. n/k/a Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc. identifying Johnson & Johnson as corporate parent . (Wunderlich, Sandra) (Entered: 09/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Johnson & Johnson identifying None as corporate parent . (Wunderlich, Sandra) (Entered: 09/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) STATE COURT RECORDS from 16th Judicial District, Ford County, Kansas. (Wunderlich, Sandra) (Entered: 09/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) DESIGNATION OF PLACE OF TRIAL filed by Defendants Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Johnson & Johnson - trial to be held in Wichita. (Wunderlich, Sandra) (Entered: 09/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) CIVIL COVER SHEET by Defendants Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Johnson & Johnson. (Wunderlich, Sandra) (Entered: 09/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) ENTRY OF APPEARANCE by Sandra J. Wunderlich on behalf of Janssen Pharmaceutica, Inc. n/k/a Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc. n/k/a Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc. (Wunderlich, Sandra) (Entered: 09/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 16th Judicial District, Ford County, Kansas, case number 2020-cv-000090 Trial location of Wichita ( Filing fee $400, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-5272443.), filed by Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Johnson & Johnson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Wunderlich, Sandra) (Entered: 09/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Ford County, Kansas, Board of Commissioners is a litigant

Latest cases where Dillon is a litigant

Latest cases where Mylan Institutional Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where Par Pharmaceutical Incorporated is a litigant