This case was last updated from PACER on 01/10/2021 at 08:10:24 (UTC).

Ford, Alexander v. Financial Recovery Services Inc

Case Summary

On 11/11/2020 Ford, Alexander filed a Finance - Consumer Credit lawsuit against Financial Recovery Services Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Wisconsin Western District. The Judge overseeing this case is Stephen L. Crocker. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:20-CV-01023

  • Filing Date:

    11/11/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Finance - Consumer Credit

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Wisconsin Western District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Stephen L. Crocker

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Alexander Ford

Defendant

Financial Recovery Services Inc

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Nathan Edward DeLadurantey

Attorney at DeLadurantey Law Office, LLC

330 S. Executive Drive, Suite 109

Brookfield, WI 53005

Defendant Attorney

Michael S. Poncin

Attorney at Moss & Barnett

150 South Fifth Street, Ste. 1200

Minneapolis, MN 55402

 

Court Documents

#8

(#8) ANSWER by Defendant Financial Recovery Services Inc. (Poncin, Michael) (Entered: 12/18/2020)

6 #1

Text of Proposed Order

#6

(#6) Stipulation for Extension to Respond to Complaint by Defendant Financial Recovery Services Inc. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Poncin, Michael) (Entered: 12/04/2020)

#5

(#5) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Defendant Financial Recovery Services Inc. (Poncin, Michael) (Entered: 12/04/2020)

#4

(#4) Notice of Appearance filed by Michael S. Poncin for Defendant Financial Recovery Services Inc. (Poncin, Michael) (Entered: 12/04/2020)

#3

(#3) Summons Issued as to Financial Recovery Services Inc. (jls) (Entered: 11/12/2020)

#2

(#2) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Plaintiff Alexander Ford. (DeLadurantey, Nathan) (Entered: 11/11/2020)

1 #2

Summons

1 #1

JS-44 Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against Financial Recovery Services Inc. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0758-2781570.), filed by Alexander Ford. (Attachments: #1 JS-44 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons) (DeLadurantey, Nathan) (Entered: 11/11/2020)

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/30/2020
  • DocketAction Requested: If you have not already provided your #Consent to Magistrate/Request for Reassignment form, please do so by 1/12/2021. (lak) (Entered: 12/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2020
  • DocketSet Telephone Pretrials Conference: Telephone Pretrial Conference set for 1/26/2021 at 01:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. Counsel for Plaintiff responsible for setting up the call to chambers at (608) 264-5153. [#Standing Order Governing Preliminary Pretrial Conference attached] (voc) (Entered: 12/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ANSWER by Defendant Financial Recovery Services Inc. (Poncin, Michael) (Entered: 12/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ** TEXT ONLY ORDER **ORDER accepting #6 Stipulation for Extension to Respond to Complaint. Financial Recovery Services Inc answer due 12/18/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker on 12/4/2020. (jls) (Entered: 12/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Stipulation for Extension to Respond to Complaint by Defendant Financial Recovery Services Inc. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Poncin, Michael) (Entered: 12/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Defendant Financial Recovery Services Inc. (Poncin, Michael) (Entered: 12/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Notice of Appearance filed by Michael S. Poncin for Defendant Financial Recovery Services Inc. (Poncin, Michael) (Entered: 12/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Summons Issued as to Financial Recovery Services Inc. (jls) (Entered: 11/12/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2020
  • DocketStandard attachments for Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker required to be served on all parties with summons or waiver of service: #Corporate Disclosure Statement, #Order Regarding Assignment of Cases, #Notice of Assignment to a Magistrate Judge and Consent/Request for Reassignment, #Order on Dispositive Motions. (jls) (Entered: 11/12/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2020
  • DocketCase randomly assigned to Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. (jls) (Entered: 11/12/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Plaintiff Alexander Ford. (DeLadurantey, Nathan) (Entered: 11/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Financial Recovery Services Inc. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0758-2781570.), filed by Alexander Ford. (Attachments: #1 JS-44 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons) (DeLadurantey, Nathan) (Entered: 11/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Financial Recovery Services, Inc. is a litigant