This case was last updated from PACER on 10/22/2019 at 05:41:24 (UTC).

FOOTE v. UNITED STATES OF AMERICA

Case Summary

On 08/22/2019 a Prisoner - Vacate Sentence case was filed by FOOTE against UNITED STATES OF AMERICA in the jurisdiction of U.S. District Courts, New Jersey District.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:19-CV-17222

  • Filing Date:

    08/22/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Vacate Sentence

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    New Jersey District

Judge Details

Stanley R. Chesler

 

Party Details

Petitioner

STANLEY FOOTE

Respondent

UNITED STATES OF AMERICA

 

Court Documents

#2

(#2) ORDER that Respondent shall file a full and complete answer to Petitioner's motion to vacate sentence within 45 days of the entry of this order; Petitioner may file and serve a reply in support of his motion within 30 days after the answer is filed; the Clerk of the Court shall serve a copy of this order upon the Government electronically and upon Petitioner by regular mail, etc. Signed by Judge Stanley R. Chesler on 10/3/2019. (sm) (Entered: 10/04/2019)

1 #1

Order

#1

(#1) MOTION to Vacate, Set Aside or Correct Sentence (2255) pursuant to the Johnson Ruling. In Re to Criminal Case file 2:07-cr-00631-SRC-2, filed by STANLEY FOOTE. "Forwarded to FPD'S Office". (Attachments: #1 Order)(bt, ) (Entered: 08/27/2019)

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) ORDER that Respondent shall file a full and complete answer to Petitioner's motion to vacate sentence within 45 days of the entry of this order; Petitioner may file and serve a reply in support of his motion within 30 days after the answer is filed; the Clerk of the Court shall serve a copy of this order upon the Government electronically and upon Petitioner by regular mail, etc. Signed by Judge Stanley R. Chesler on 10/3/2019. (sm) (Entered: 10/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) MOTION to Vacate, Set Aside or Correct Sentence (2255) pursuant to the Johnson Ruling. In Re to Criminal Case file 2:07-cr-00631-SRC-2, filed by STANLEY FOOTE. "Forwarded to FPD'S Office". (Attachments: #1 Order)(bt, ) (Entered: 08/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.