This case was last updated from PACER on 10/05/2020 at 09:51:02 (UTC).

Foote v. State Farm Fire and Casualty Company

Case Summary

On 08/06/2020 Foote filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against State Farm Fire and Casualty Company. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Colorado District. The Judges overseeing this case are Raymond P. Moore and Michael E. Hegarty. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-02342

  • Filing Date:

    08/06/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Colorado District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Raymond P. Moore

Referral Judge

Michael E. Hegarty

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Claimant

Gary Foote

Defendant

State Farm Fire and Casualty Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Claimant Attorney

Christopher Patrick Peirce

Attorney at Hossley & Embry LLP-Tyler

515 South Vine Avenue

Tyler, TX 75702

Defendant Attorney

Evan Bennett Stephenson

Attorney at Wheeler Trigg O'Donnell LLP-Denver

370 17Th Street, Suite 4500

Denver, CO 80202-5647

 

Court Documents

#16

(#16) MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 24 September 2020. The Scheduling Conference currently set on October 1, 2020 is vacated and rescheduled to October 28, 2020, at 1:45 p.m. in Courtroom A-501, on the fifth floor of the Alfred A. Arraj United States Courthouse located at 901 19th Street, Denver, Colorado. Proposed Scheduling Order due 10/21/2020. (cmadr, ) (Entered: 09/25/2020)

#15

(#15) Minute ORDER by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 21 September 2020. For good cause shown, Defendant's "Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint and Jury Demand" #12 is granted. Defendant shall file an answer or other response to the operative complaint on or before October 14, 2020.(cmadr, ) (Entered: 09/21/2020)

#12

(#12) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond re #1 Complaint, by Defendant State Farm Fire and Casualty Company. (Stephenson, Evan) (Entered: 09/18/2020)

#11

(#11) Minute ORDER by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 2 September 2020. For good cause shown, Defendant's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Answeror Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint #9 is granted. Defendant shall file an answer or other response to the operative pleading on or before September 30, 2020.(cmadr, ) (Entered: 09/02/2020)

#9

(#9) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond re #1 Complaint, by Defendant State Farm Fire and Casualty Company. (Stephenson, Evan) (Entered: 09/02/2020)

#8

(#8) MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 10 August 2020. This Court will hold the Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b) Scheduling Conference on October 1, 2020, at 10:15 a.m. in Courtroom A-501, on the fifth floor of the Alfred A. Arraj United States Courthouse located at 901 19th Street, Denver, Colorado. Proposed Scheduling Order due 9/25/2020. (cmadr, ) (Entered: 08/10/2020)

#5

(#5) SUMMONS issued by Clerk. (rvill, ) (Entered: 08/10/2020)

#4

(#4) SUMMONS REQUEST as to State Farm Fire and Casualty Company by Plaintiff Gary Foote. (Peirce, Christopher) (Entered: 08/07/2020)

#3

(#3) Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c). NO SUMMONS ISSUED. (jtorr, ) (Entered: 08/07/2020)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against State Farm Fire and Casualty Company (Filing fee $ 400,Receipt Number 1082-7424587)Attorney Christopher Patrick Peirce added to party Gary Foote(pty:clm), filed by Gary Foote. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Peirce, Christopher) (Entered: 08/06/2020)

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 24 September 2020. The Scheduling Conference currently set on October 1, 2020 is vacated and rescheduled to October 28, 2020, at 1:45 p.m. in Courtroom A-501, on the fifth floor of the Alfred A. Arraj United States Courthouse located at 901 19th Street, Denver, Colorado. Proposed Scheduling Order due 10/21/2020. (cmadr, ) (Entered: 09/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) Minute ORDER by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 21 September 2020. For good cause shown, Defendant's "Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint and Jury Demand" #12 is granted. Defendant shall file an answer or other response to the operative complaint on or before October 14, 2020.(cmadr, ) (Entered: 09/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • Docket(#14) MINUTE ORDER Due to continued concerns regarding the potential transmission of COVID-19, during the week of September 28, 2020, the Court will permit litigants (counsel and parties) and the public to appear at all scheduled conferences before Magistrate Judge Hegarty either in person or by telephone (unless otherwise ordered). Anyone appearing in person must comply with General Order 2020-14 governing Court Operations During the COVID-19 Pandemic, which may be accessed at www.cod.uscourts.gov. Anyone appearing by telephone shall call the following conference line at the appointed time: Number:888-278-0296 Access code:8212991#. Please remember that, when you call in, you may be entering a proceeding already in progress for a different case; therefore, as you would if you were present in the courtroom, please ensure silence until your case is called. Any questions regarding this procedure may be directed to my chambers at 303-844-4507 or at hegarty_chambers@cod.uscourts.gov. By Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 09/21/2020. Text Only Entry (mehlc1, ) (Entered: 09/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) MEMORANDUM regarding #12 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond re #1 Complaint, filed by State Farm Fire and Casualty Company. Motion referred to Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty. By Judge Raymond P. Moore on 9/18/2020. (Text Only Entry) (rmsec ) (Entered: 09/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond re #1 Complaint, by Defendant State Farm Fire and Casualty Company. (Stephenson, Evan) (Entered: 09/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) Minute ORDER by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 2 September 2020. For good cause shown, Defendant's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Answeror Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint #9 is granted. Defendant shall file an answer or other response to the operative pleading on or before September 30, 2020.(cmadr, ) (Entered: 09/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) MEMORANDUM regarding #9 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond re #1 Complaint, filed by State Farm Fire and Casualty Company. Motion referred to Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty. By Judge Raymond P. Moore on 9/2/2020. (Text Only Entry) (rmsec ) (Entered: 09/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond re #1 Complaint, by Defendant State Farm Fire and Casualty Company. (Stephenson, Evan) (Entered: 09/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 10 August 2020. This Court will hold the Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b) Scheduling Conference on October 1, 2020, at 10:15 a.m. in Courtroom A-501, on the fifth floor of the Alfred A. Arraj United States Courthouse located at 901 19th Street, Denver, Colorado. Proposed Scheduling Order due 9/25/2020. (cmadr, ) (Entered: 08/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2020
  • Docket(#7) MINUTE ORDER: With the assignment of this matter, the parties are advised that throughout this case they are expected to be familiar and comply with not only the Local Rules of this District, but also Judge Raymond P. Moore's Civil Practice Standards, which may be found at: http://www.cod.uscourts.gov/JudicialOfficers/ActiveArticleIIIJudges/HonRaymondPMoore.aspx. SO ORDERED by Judge Raymond P. Moore on 8/10/2020. (Text Only Entry) (rmsec ) (Entered: 08/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2020
  • Docket(#6) ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A) and (B) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 72(a) and (b), this case is referred to the assigned United States Magistrate Judge to (1) convene a scheduling conference under Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b) and enter a scheduling order meeting the requirements of D.C.COLO.LCivR 16.2, (2) conduct such status conferences and issue such orders necessary for compliance with the scheduling order, including amendments or modifications of the scheduling order upon a showing of good cause, (3) hear and determine pretrial matters, including discovery and other non-dispositive motions, (4) conduct a pretrial conference and enter a pretrial order, and (5) conduct hearings, including evidentiary hearings, and submit proposed findings of fact and recommendations for rulings on dispositive motions. Court sponsored alternative dispute resolution is governed by D.C.COLO.LCivR 16.6. On the recommendation or informal request of the magistrate judge or on the request of the parties by motion, this court may direct the parties to engage in an early neutral evaluation, a settlement conference, or another alternative dispute resolution proceeding. Entered by Judge Raymond P. Moore on 8/10/2020. (Text Only Entry) (rmsec ) (Entered: 08/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) SUMMONS issued by Clerk. (rvill, ) (Entered: 08/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) SUMMONS REQUEST as to State Farm Fire and Casualty Company by Plaintiff Gary Foote. (Peirce, Christopher) (Entered: 08/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c). NO SUMMONS ISSUED. (jtorr, ) (Entered: 08/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2020
  • Docket(#2) Case assigned to Judge Raymond P. Moore and drawn to Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty. Text Only Entry. (jtorr, ) (Entered: 08/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against State Farm Fire and Casualty Company (Filing fee $ 400,Receipt Number 1082-7424587)Attorney Christopher Patrick Peirce added to party Gary Foote(pty:clm), filed by Gary Foote. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Peirce, Christopher) (Entered: 08/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less