This case was last updated from PACER on 10/05/2020 at 09:28:00 (UTC).

FOOD & WATER WATCH v. DEPARTMENT OF ENERGY

Case Summary

On 08/06/2020 FOOD WATER WATCH filed a Civil Right - Freedom Of Information Act lawsuit against DEPARTMENT OF ENERGY. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, District Of Columbia District. The Judge overseeing this case is Colleen Kollar-Kotelly. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-02143

  • Filing Date:

    08/06/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Freedom Of Information Act

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    District Of Columbia District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Colleen Kollar-Kotelly

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

FOOD & WATER WATCH

Defendant

DEPARTMENT OF ENERGY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Adam Scott Carlesco

Attorney at FOOD & WATER WATCH

1616 P Street, Nw, Suite 300

Washington, DC 20036

Defendant Attorney

Paul A. Mussenden

Attorney at U.S. ATTORNEY'S OFFICE FOR THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA

555 Fourth Street, Nw

Washington, DC 20530

 

Court Documents

#7

(#7) ORDER for meet and confer and status report. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on 9-17-2020. (lcckk3) (Entered: 09/17/2020)

#6

(#6) ANSWER to Complaint by DEPARTMENT OF ENERGY.(Mussenden, Paul) (Entered: 09/17/2020)

#5

(#5) NOTICE of Appearance by Paul A. Mussenden on behalf of DEPARTMENT OF ENERGY (Mussenden, Paul) (Entered: 09/17/2020)

#4

(#4) ORDER ESTABLISHING PROCEDURES FOR CASES ASSIGHNED TO JUDGE COLLEEN KOLLAR-KOTELLY. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on 08/10/2020. (DM) (Entered: 08/10/2020)

3 #1

Notice and Consent

#3

(#3) SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to DEPARTMENT OF ENERGY, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: #1 Notice and Consent)(adh, ) (Entered: 08/06/2020)

#2

(#2) LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by FOOD & WATER WATCH (adh, ) (Entered: 08/06/2020)

1 #5

Summons

1 #4

Summons

1 #3

Summons

1 #2

Declaration Corporate Disclosure Statement

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against DEPARTMENT OF ENERGY ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ADCDC-7431048) filed by FOOD & WATER WATCH. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Declaration Corporate Disclosure Statement, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons)(Carlesco, Adam) (Entered: 08/06/2020)

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/17/2020
  • DocketSet/Reset Deadlines: Joint Meet & Confer Statement due by 11/6/2020. (dot) (Entered: 09/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ORDER for meet and confer and status report. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on 9-17-2020. (lcckk3) (Entered: 09/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ANSWER to Complaint by DEPARTMENT OF ENERGY.(Mussenden, Paul) (Entered: 09/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE of Appearance by Paul A. Mussenden on behalf of DEPARTMENT OF ENERGY (Mussenden, Paul) (Entered: 09/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ORDER ESTABLISHING PROCEDURES FOR CASES ASSIGHNED TO JUDGE COLLEEN KOLLAR-KOTELLY. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on 08/10/2020. (DM) (Entered: 08/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to DEPARTMENT OF ENERGY, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: #1 Notice and Consent)(adh, ) (Entered: 08/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2020
  • DocketCase Assigned to Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly. (adh, ) (Entered: 08/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by FOOD & WATER WATCH (adh, ) (Entered: 08/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against DEPARTMENT OF ENERGY ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ADCDC-7431048) filed by FOOD & WATER WATCH. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Declaration Corporate Disclosure Statement, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons)(Carlesco, Adam) (Entered: 08/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less