This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 08/03/2021 at 07:52:29 (UTC).

Fontanez-Rivera et al v. Suiza Dairy Corporation et al

Case Summary

On 06/04/2021 Fontanez-Rivera filed a Labor - Employee Benefit lawsuit against Suiza Dairy Corporation. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Puerto Rico District. The Judge overseeing this case is Aida M. Delgado-Colon. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:21-CV-01257

  • Filing Date:

    06/04/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Employee Benefit

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Aida M. Delgado-Colon

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Irma Santos-De Jesus

Community Property Partnership Fontanez-Santos

Roberto Fontanez-Rivera

Defendants

Triple-S Salud Inc

Suiza Dairy Corporation

Delta Dental Plan of Puerto Rico, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Andres C. Gorbea-Del Valle

Attorney at Andres Gorbea Law Office

Po Box 195191

San Juan, PR 00919

Defendant Attorneys

Enrique A. Del Cueto-Perez

Attorney at ECIJA SBGB

954 Ponce De Leon Ave, Suite 201, Miramar Plaza Center

San Juan, PR 00907

Jaime Luis Sanabria-Montanez

Attorney at Sanabria Bauermeister Garcia & Berio LLC

Po Box 363068

San Juan, PR 00936-3068

Yldefonso Lopez-Morales

Attorney at O'Neill & Borges

250 Munoz Rivera Ave., Suite 800

San Juan, PR 00918-1813

Natalia Marin-Catala

Attorney at O'Neill & Borges, LLC

250 Munoz Rivera Ave., Suite 800

San Juan, PR 00918

Victor Manuel Rivera-Rios

1420 Fernandez Juncos Ave.

San Juan, PR 00909

 

Court Documents

29 #1

Exhibit COBRA Notice

#29

#28

#27

#26

25 #1

Exhibit Certified Translation - Notice and Transfer Order

#25

24 #1

Exhibit Certified Translation -Complaint

#24

#3

#2

1 #6

Civil Cover Sheet Attachment to Cover Sheet

1 #5

Civil Cover Sheet Cover Sheet

1 #4

Exhibit Motion to be presented in State Court

1 #3

Exhibit Court Notice

1 #2

Exhibit Court Order

1 #1

Exhibit State Court Complaint

#1

38 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#29) MOTION to dismiss claims under COBRA as to Delta Dental Plan of Puerto Rico, Inc., Triple-S Salud Inc, MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Andres C. Gorbea-Del Valle on behalf of All Plaintiffs Responses due by 8/11/2021. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit COBRA Notice)(Gorbea-Del Valle, Andres) (Entered: 07/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#28) ANSWER to Complaint filed by Natalia Marin-Catala on behalf of Defendant Suiza Dairy Corporation.(Marin-Catala, Natalia) (Entered: 07/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#27) ANSWER to Complaint filed by Victor Manuel Rivera-Rios on behalf of Defendant Delta Dental Plan of Puerto Rico, Inc..(Rivera-Rios, Victor) (Entered: 07/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#26) NOTICE of Appearance by Enrique A. Del Cueto-Perez on behalf of Triple-S Salud Inc (Del Cueto-Perez, Enrique) (Entered: 07/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#25) MOTION Submitting Certified Translation of Notice and Transfer Order from State Court filed by Jaime Luis Sanabria-Montanez on behalf of Triple-S Salud Inc Responses due by 7/28/2021. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certified Translation - Notice and Transfer Order)(Sanabria-Montanez, Jaime) (Entered: 07/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#24) MOTION Submitting certified translation of filed Complaint filed by Jaime Luis Sanabria-Montanez on behalf of Triple-S Salud Inc Responses due by 7/27/2021. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certified Translation -Complaint)(Sanabria-Montanez, Jaime) (Entered: 07/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#23) Second MOTION for Extension of Time until July 27, 2021 to File Answer to Complaint or Otherwise Plead re: #1 Notice of Removal, filed by Triple-S Salud Inc filed by Natalia Marin-Catala on behalf of Suiza Dairy Corporation Responses due by 7/26/2021. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Related document(s) #1 ) (Marin-Catala, Natalia) (Entered: 07/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#22) ANSWER to Complaint filed by Jaime Luis Sanabria-Montanez on behalf of Defendant Triple-S Salud Inc.(Sanabria-Montanez, Jaime) (Entered: 07/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) Second MOTION for Extension of Time until July 26, 2021 to File Answer the Complaint or Otherwise Plead re: #1 Notice of Removal, filed by Triple-S Salud Inc filed by Victor Manuel Rivera-Rios on behalf of Delta Dental Plan of Puerto Rico, Inc. Responses due by 7/26/2021. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Related document(s) #1 ) (Rivera-Rios, Victor) (Entered: 07/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) INFORMATIVE Motion regarding Consent to and Joinder in Notice of Removal filed by Victor Manuel Rivera-Rios on behalf of Delta Dental Plan of Puerto Rico, Inc. Responses due by 7/16/2021. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Rivera-Rios, Victor) (Entered: 07/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
9 More Docket Entries
  • 06/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) NOTICE of Appearance by Yldefonso Lopez-Morales on behalf of Suiza Dairy Corporation (Lopez-Morales, Yldefonso) (Entered: 06/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE of Appearance Consent to and Joinder in Notice of Removal, and Motion for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Plead by Natalia Marin-Catala on behalf of Suiza Dairy Corporation (Marin-Catala, Natalia) (Entered: 06/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ORDER: Noting #7 "Notice of Appearance and Request for Notices." Signed by Judge Pedro A. Delgado-Hernandez on 6/9/2021. (ebb) (Entered: 06/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE of Appearance by Andres C. Gorbea-Del Valle on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Gorbea-Del Valle, Andres) (Entered: 06/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2021
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT Case has been assigned to Judge Pedro A. Delgado-Hernandez (arg) (Entered: 06/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE of Filing Exhibits Civil Cover Sheet and Category Sheet (Attachments: #1 Category Sheet Category Sheet) (Sanabria-Montanez, Jaime) (Entered: 06/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) CLERK'S NOTICE OF DEFECTIVE FILING.Category sheet not included electronically pursuant to L.Civ.R. 3(a).Civil Cover Sheet(JS44) is incomplete. Notice of Compliance Deadline due by 6/8/2021. (arg) (Entered: 06/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) MOTION for Leave to File Spanish language documents filed by Jaime Luis Sanabria-Montanez on behalf of Triple-S Salud Inc Responses due by 6/18/2021. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Sanabria-Montanez, Jaime) (Entered: 06/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Corporate Disclosure Statement byTriple-S Salud Inc. (Sanabria-Montanez, Jaime) (Entered: 06/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from First Instance San Juan Superior Court, case number SJ2021CV3138. (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0104-7327087), filed by Triple-S Salud Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit State Court Complaint, #2 Exhibit Court Order, #3 Exhibit Court Notice, #4 Exhibit Motion to be presented in State Court, #5 Civil Cover Sheet Cover Sheet, #6 Civil Cover Sheet Attachment to Cover Sheet)(Sanabria-Montanez, Jaime) (Entered: 06/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where TRIPLE-S SALUD, INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where Suiza Dairy Group, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Natalia Marin-Catala

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Jaime Luis Sanabria-Montanez