This case was last updated from PACER on 09/13/2021 at 09:49:25 (UTC).

Fontaine v. CR Bard Inc, et al

Case Summary

On 07/15/2021 Fontaine filed a Personal Injury - Medical/Pharmaceutical Product Liability lawsuit against CR Bard Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Wisconsin Eastern District. The Judge overseeing this case is William C Griesbach. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-CV-00846

  • Filing Date:

    07/15/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Medical/Pharmaceutical Product Liability

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

William C Griesbach

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Lori Fontaine

Defendants

CR Bard Inc

Bard Peripheral Vascular Inc

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Ben C Martin

Attorney at Martin Baughman PLLC

3141 Hood St - Ste 600

Dallas, TX 75219

Defendant Attorney

Catherine Faught

Attorney at Mallery & Zimmerman SC

731 N Jackson St - Ste 900

Milwaukee, WI 53202

 

Court Documents

#7

(#7) DISCLOSURE Statement by All Defendants. (Faught, Catherine)

#6

(#6) NOTICE of Hearing: Rule 16 Telephone Scheduling Conference set for 10/14/2021 10:00 AM before Judge William C Griesbach. Rule 26(f) Report due 10/7/2021. Counsel are to provide the telephone number at which they can be reached (direct dial preferred) at least two days prior to the telephone conference. In the event counsel are unavailable at the scheduled time of the telephone conference, the conference may be rescheduled and counsel may be required to appear in person. Please provide your telephone number to the Office of the Clerk at wied_clerks_gb@wied.uscourts.gov. (cc: all counsel)(Griesbach, William)

#5

(#5) Defendant's ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand by All Defendants.(Faught, Catherine)

#4

(#4) NOTICE of Appearance by Catherine Faught on behalf of All Defendants. Attorney(s) appearing: Catherine Faught (Faught, Catherine)

#3

(#3) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Bard Peripheral Vascular Inc - Waiver sent on 8/9/2021. (Martin, Ben)

#2

(#2) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by CR Bard Inc - Waiver sent on 8/9/2021. (Martin, Ben)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT Lori Fontaine with Jury Demand; against Bard Peripheral Vascular Inc, CR Bard Inc by Lori Fontaine. ( Filing Fee PAID $402 receipt number AWIEDC-3870797)(Martin, Ben) (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/16/2021: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (jcl).

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) DISCLOSURE Statement by All Defendants. (Faught, Catherine)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE of Hearing: Rule 16 Telephone Scheduling Conference set for 10/14/2021 10:00 AM before Judge William C Griesbach. Rule 26(f) Report due 10/7/2021. Counsel are to provide the telephone number at which they can be reached (direct dial preferred) at least two days prior to the telephone conference. In the event counsel are unavailable at the scheduled time of the telephone conference, the conference may be rescheduled and counsel may be required to appear in person. Please provide your telephone number to the Office of the Clerk at wied_clerks_gb@wied.uscourts.gov. (cc: all counsel)(Griesbach, William)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Defendant's ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand by All Defendants.(Faught, Catherine)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE of Appearance by Catherine Faught on behalf of All Defendants. Attorney(s) appearing: Catherine Faught (Faught, Catherine)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Bard Peripheral Vascular Inc - Waiver sent on 8/9/2021. (Martin, Ben)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by CR Bard Inc - Waiver sent on 8/9/2021. (Martin, Ben)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2021
  • DocketNOTICE Regarding assignment of this matter to Judge William C Griesbach; Consent/refusal forms for Magistrate Judge Duffin to be filed within 21 days; the consent/refusal form is available #here. Pursuant to Civil Local Rule 7.1 a disclosure statement is to be filed upon the first filing of any paper and should be filed now if not already filed. (jcl)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT Lori Fontaine with Jury Demand; against Bard Peripheral Vascular Inc, CR Bard Inc by Lori Fontaine. ( Filing Fee PAID $402 receipt number AWIEDC-3870797)(Martin, Ben) (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/16/2021: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (jcl).

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where BARD PERIPHERAL VASCULAR, INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where C.R. Bard, Inc. is a litigant