This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 07/04/2019 at 11:15:53 (UTC).

Jesus Fonseca v. Wal Mart Associates, Inc., et al

Case Summary

On 05/01/2019 Jesus Fonseca filed a Civil Right - Employment Discrimination lawsuit against Wal Mart Associates, Inc . This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Central District. The Judges overseeing this case are Jesus G. Bernal and Kenly Kiya Kato. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    5:19-CV-00821

  • Filing Date:

    05/01/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Employment Discrimination

  • Courthouse:

    California Central District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Jesus G. Bernal

Referral Judge

Kenly Kiya Kato

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Jesus Fonseca

Defendants

Wal-Mart Associates, Inc., a corporation

Walmart Inc., a corporation

Walmart Inc.

DOES 1 through 25, inclusive

Wal Mart Associates, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Maria Esther Garcia

Attorney at Eldessouky Law APC

17139 Bellflower Boulevard Suite 202

Bellflower, CA 90706

Mohamed Ahmed Eldessouky

Attorney at Eldessouky Law APC

17139 Bellflower Boulevard Suite 202

Bellflower, CA 90706

Defendant Attorneys

Stefan Hocker Black

Attorney at Ford and Harrison LLP

350 South Grand Avenue Suite 2300

Los Angeles, CA 90071

Shannen T Garrett

Attorney at Ford and Harrison LLP

350 South Grand Avenue Suite 2300

Los Angeles, CA 90071

Shanda Yasmin Lowe

Attorney at Ford and Harrison LLP

350 South Grand Avenue Suite 2300

Los Angeles, CA 90071

 

Court Documents

20 #1

Proposed Order RE STIPULATION TO CONTINUE SCHEDULING CONFERENCE

#20

(#20) STIPULATION to Continue SCHEDULING CONFERENCE from 07/15/2019 to 08/12/2019 filed by Plaintiff Jesus Fonseca. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order RE STIPULATION TO CONTINUE SCHEDULING CONFERENCE)(Eldessouky, Mohamed) (Entered: 07/01/2019)

#19

(#19) REPLY Support NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to AMEND Complaint #14 filed by Plaintiff Jesus Fonseca. (Garcia, Maria) (Entered: 06/24/2019)

#18

(#18) OPPOSITION to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to San Bernardino Superior Court #15 filed by Defendants Wal Mart Associates, Inc., Walmart Inc.. (Black, Stefan) (Entered: 06/17/2019)

15 #2

Proposed Order

15 #1

Declaration of Mohamed Eldessouky

14 #2

Proposed Order

14 #1

Declaration of Mohamed Eldessouky

#14

(#14) NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to AMEND Complaint filed by Plaintiff Jesus Fonseca. Motion set for hearing on 7/8/2019 at 09:00 AM before Judge Jesus G. Bernal. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Mohamed Eldessouky, #2 Proposed Order) (Eldessouky, Mohamed) (Entered: 05/28/2019)

#5

(#5) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (jtil) (Entered: 05/03/2019)

#4

(#4) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Jesus G. Bernal and Magistrate Judge Kenly Kiya Kato. (jtil) (Entered: 05/03/2019)

#3

(#3) CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Defendants Wal-Mart Associates, Inc., a corporation, Walmart Inc., a corporation, (Black, Stefan) (Entered: 05/01/2019)

#2

(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendants Wal-Mart Associates, Inc., a corporation, Walmart Inc., a corporation. (Black, Stefan) (Entered: 05/01/2019)

1 #4

Exhibit C to Stefan H. Black Declaration

1 #3

Exhibit B to Stefan H. Black Declaratrion

1 #2

Exhibit A to Stefan H. Black Declaration

1 #1

Declaration of Stefan H. Black

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from San Bernardino County Superior Court, case number CIVDS1909501 Receipt No: 0973-23656234 - Fee: $400, filed by Defendants Walmart Inc., a corporation, Wal-Mart Associates, Inc., a corporation. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Stefan H. Black, #2 Exhibit A to Stefan H. Black Declaration, #3 Exhibit B to Stefan H. Black Declaratrion, #4 Exhibit C to Stefan H. Black Declaration) (Attorney Stefan Hocker Black added to party Wal-Mart Associates, Inc., a corporation(pty:dft), Attorney Stefan Hocker Black added to party Walmart Inc., a corporation(pty:dft))(Black, Stefan) (Entered: 05/01/2019)

26 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#20) STIPULATION to Continue SCHEDULING CONFERENCE from 07/15/2019 to 08/12/2019 filed by Plaintiff Jesus Fonseca. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order RE STIPULATION TO CONTINUE SCHEDULING CONFERENCE)(Eldessouky, Mohamed) (Entered: 07/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#19) REPLY Support NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to AMEND Complaint #14 filed by Plaintiff Jesus Fonseca. (Garcia, Maria) (Entered: 06/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#18) OPPOSITION to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to San Bernardino Superior Court #15 filed by Defendants Wal Mart Associates, Inc., Walmart Inc.. (Black, Stefan) (Entered: 06/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#17) OPPOSITION to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to AMEND Complaint #14 filed by Defendants Wal Mart Associates, Inc., Walmart Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of Tisha Snyder in support of Opposition to Motion for Leave, #2 Declaration of Aderoju "Aisha" Ogunlana in support of Opposition to Motion for Leave)(Black, Stefan) (Entered: 06/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#16) SCHEDULING NOTICE by Judge Jesus G. Bernal. On the Court's own motion, Defendants' Motion to Dismiss #8 set for hearing on June 10, 2019, is hereby continued to July 8, 2019, at 9:00 a.m. IT IS SO ORDERED. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (iva) TEXT ONLY ENTRY (Entered: 06/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#15) NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to San Bernardino Superior Court filed by Plaintiff Jesus Fonseca. Motion set for hearing on 7/8/2019 at 09:00 AM before Judge Jesus G. Bernal. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Mohamed Eldessouky, #2 Proposed Order) (Eldessouky, Mohamed) (Entered: 05/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to AMEND Complaint filed by Plaintiff Jesus Fonseca. Motion set for hearing on 7/8/2019 at 09:00 AM before Judge Jesus G. Bernal. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Mohamed Eldessouky, #2 Proposed Order) (Eldessouky, Mohamed) (Entered: 05/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) REPLY in support of a motion to Dismiss Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12(B)(6) filed by Defendants Wal Mart Associates, Inc., Walmart Inc.. (Black, Stefan) (Entered: 05/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) MEMORANDUM in Opposition to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case puruant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure12(b)(6) #8 filed by Plaintiff Jesus Fonseca. (Garcia, Maria) (Entered: 05/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) Plaintiff's CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Jesus Fonseca, (Eldessouky, Mohamed) (Entered: 05/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 05/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case puruant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure12(b)(6) filed by Defendants Wal Mart Associates, Inc., Walmart Inc.. Motion set for hearing on 6/10/2019 at 09:00 AM before Judge Jesus G. Bernal. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support of Motion to Dismiss, #2 Proposed Order) (Black, Stefan) (Entered: 05/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) NOTICE to Adverse Parties of Removal from State Court filed by Defendants Wal Mart Associates, Inc., Walmart Inc.. (Black, Stefan) (Entered: 05/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) NOTICE OF CLERICAL ERROR: The non conformed answer to the complaint was docketed by the clerk in error. Please disregard entry. (jtil) (Entered: 05/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (jtil) (Entered: 05/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Jesus G. Bernal and Magistrate Judge Kenly Kiya Kato. (jtil) (Entered: 05/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2019
  • NON CONFORMED ANSWER to Complaint filed by Defendants Wal Mart Associates, Inc., and Walmart Inc., attached as Exhibit C. (jtil) (Entered: 05/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2019
  • CONFORMED COPY OF COMPLAINT filed by Plaintiff Jesus Fonseca in San Bernardino Superior Court on 3/28/2019, attached as Exhibit A. (jtil) (Entered: 05/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Defendants Wal-Mart Associates, Inc., a corporation, Walmart Inc., a corporation, (Black, Stefan) (Entered: 05/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendants Wal-Mart Associates, Inc., a corporation, Walmart Inc., a corporation. (Black, Stefan) (Entered: 05/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from San Bernardino County Superior Court, case number CIVDS1909501 Receipt No: 0973-23656234 - Fee: $400, filed by Defendants Walmart Inc., a corporation, Wal-Mart Associates, Inc., a corporation. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Stefan H. Black, #2 Exhibit A to Stefan H. Black Declaration, #3 Exhibit B to Stefan H. Black Declaratrion, #4 Exhibit C to Stefan H. Black Declaration) (Attorney Stefan Hocker Black added to party Wal-Mart Associates, Inc., a corporation(pty:dft), Attorney Stefan Hocker Black added to party Walmart Inc., a corporation(pty:dft))(Black, Stefan) (Entered: 05/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Wal-Mart Associates, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where WALMART is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Mohamed Ahmed Eldessouky