This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 04/15/2022 at 07:56:16 (UTC).

Fonseca v. Nelson Tree Service, LLC

Case Summary

On 02/14/2022 Fonseca filed a Civil Right - Employment Discrimination lawsuit against Nelson Tree Service, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Florida Middle District. The Judges overseeing this case are Mary S. Scriven and Julie S. Sneed. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    8:22-CV-00368

  • Filing Date:

    02/14/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Employment Discrimination

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Mary S. Scriven

Referral Judge

Julie S. Sneed

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Yoandy Fonseca

Defendant

Nelson Tree Service, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Cristobal Bobadilla-Gamboa

151 Southeast 1St Street, Suite Unit 1003

Miami, FL 32832

Peter Michael Hoogerwoerd

Attorney at Remer & Georges-Pierre

44 West Flagler Street, Suite 2200

Miami, FL 33130

Corey Logan Seldin

Attorney at Remer and Georges-Pierre PLLC

44 W Flagler St., Suite #2200

Miami, FL 33130

Defendant Attorney

Angelique Groza Lyons

Attorney at Constangy, Brooks & Smith, LLP

100 N Tampa St - Ste 3350, Po Box 1840

Tampa, FL 33601-1840

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT and NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Fifth Judicial Circuit, Hernando County, Florida, case number 21-CA-1055 filed in State Court on 12/30/2021. Filing fee $402, receipt number AFLMDC-19231607 filed by Nelson Tree Service, LLC. (Attachments: #1 State Court Complaint, #2 State Court Docket Sheet, #3 State Court Other Documents, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(Lyons, Angelique) Modified on 2/14/2022 to correct docket text (BD). (Entered: 02/14/2022)

1 #1

State Court Complaint

1 #2

State Court Docket Sheet

1 #3

State Court Other Documents

1 #4

Civil Cover Sheet

#2

(#2) ANSWER and affirmative defenses to Complaint by Nelson Tree Service, LLC.(Lyons, Angelique) (Entered: 02/14/2022)

#7

(#7) NOTICE of Filing Civil Cover sheet by Nelson Tree Service, LLC re #1 Notice of Removal. (Lyons, Angelique) Modified text on 2/16/2022 (ABC). (Entered: 02/15/2022)

#8

(#8) NOTICE of Lead Counsel Designation by Angelique Groza Lyons on behalf of Nelson Tree Service, LLC. Lead Counsel: Angelique Groza Lyons. (Lyons, Angelique) (Entered: 02/15/2022)

#9

(#9) CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by Nelson Tree Service, LLC. (Lyons, Angelique) (Entered: 02/21/2022)

#10

(#10) NOTICE of a related action per Local Rule 1.07(c) by Nelson Tree Service, LLC. Related case(s): No (Lyons, Angelique) (Entered: 02/21/2022)

#11

(#11) NOTICE of Lead Counsel Designation by Corey Logan Seldin on behalf of Yoandy Fonseca. Lead Counsel: Peter M. Hoogerwoerd, Esq. (Seldin, Corey) Modified text on 2/22/2022 (ABC). (Entered: 02/21/2022)

#12

(#12) NOTICE of a related action per Local Rule 1.07(c) by Yoandy Fonseca. Related case(s): No (Seldin, Corey) (Entered: 02/21/2022)

#13

(#13) CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by Yoandy Fonseca. (Seldin, Corey) (Entered: 02/21/2022)

#14

(#14) CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT. (Lyons, Angelique) (Entered: 03/25/2022)

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT. (Lyons, Angelique) (Entered: 03/25/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by Yoandy Fonseca. (Seldin, Corey) (Entered: 02/21/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) NOTICE of a related action per Local Rule 1.07(c) by Yoandy Fonseca. Related case(s): No (Seldin, Corey) (Entered: 02/21/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) NOTICE of Lead Counsel Designation by Corey Logan Seldin on behalf of Yoandy Fonseca. Lead Counsel: Peter M. Hoogerwoerd, Esq. (Seldin, Corey) Modified text on 2/22/2022 (ABC). (Entered: 02/21/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) NOTICE of a related action per Local Rule 1.07(c) by Nelson Tree Service, LLC. Related case(s): No (Lyons, Angelique) (Entered: 02/21/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by Nelson Tree Service, LLC. (Lyons, Angelique) (Entered: 02/21/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE of Lead Counsel Designation by Angelique Groza Lyons on behalf of Nelson Tree Service, LLC. Lead Counsel: Angelique Groza Lyons. (Lyons, Angelique) (Entered: 02/15/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE of Filing Civil Cover sheet by Nelson Tree Service, LLC re #1 Notice of Removal. (Lyons, Angelique) Modified text on 2/16/2022 (ABC). (Entered: 02/15/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2022
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE to counsel of Local Rule 3.02(a)(2), which requires the parties in every civil proceeding, except those described in subsection (d), to file a case management report (CMR) using the uniform form at www.flmd.uscourts.gov. The CMR must be filed (1) within forty days after any defendant appears in an action originating in this court, (2) within forty days after the docketing of an action removed or transferred to this court, or (3) within seventy days after service on the United States attorney in an action against the United States, its agencies or employees. Judges may have a special CMR form for certain types of cases. These forms can be found at www.flmd.uscourts.gov under the Forms tab for each judge. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (CRB) (Entered: 02/15/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2022
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE of Local Rule 2.02(a), which requires designation of one lead counsel who - unless the party changes the designation - remains lead counsel throughout the action. File a Notice of Lead Counsel Designation to identify lead counsel. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (BD) (Entered: 02/14/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2022
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE to counsel Angelique Groza Lyons that a signed Form JS 44 Civil Cover Sheet is required for the Clerk of Court to initiate a civil docket sheet. File the Civil Cover Sheet in this action using the Notice (Other) event. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (BD) (Entered: 02/14/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2022
  • Docket(#3) NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Mary S. Scriven and Magistrate Judge Julie S. Sneed. New case number: 8:22-cv-0368-MSS-JSS. (SJB) (Entered: 02/14/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) ANSWER and affirmative defenses to Complaint by Nelson Tree Service, LLC.(Lyons, Angelique) (Entered: 02/14/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT and NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Fifth Judicial Circuit, Hernando County, Florida, case number 21-CA-1055 filed in State Court on 12/30/2021. Filing fee $402, receipt number AFLMDC-19231607 filed by Nelson Tree Service, LLC. (Attachments: #1 State Court Complaint, #2 State Court Docket Sheet, #3 State Court Other Documents, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(Lyons, Angelique) Modified on 2/14/2022 to correct docket text (BD). (Entered: 02/14/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where NELSON TREE SERVICE LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Angelique Groza Lyons