This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 12/24/2021 at 08:34:48 (UTC).

Fonder v. Flemmer et al

Case Summary

On 10/25/2021 Fonder filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against Flemmer. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, South Dakota District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Charles B. Kornmann. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-CV-01032

  • Filing Date:

    10/25/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Charles B. Kornmann

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Darin John Fonder

Sisseton, SD 57262

Defendants

Judge Jon S. Flemmer

Jennifer G. Lurken

Mankato, MN 56002-1268

Judge Tony Portra

David R. Gienapp

Attorney Robert Anderson

Pierre, SD 57501

Gilason & Hunter

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorneys

Robert B. Anderson

Attorney at May, Adam, Gerdes & Thompson LLP

Po Box 160, 503 South Pierre Street

Pierre, SD 57501

Jennifer G. Lurken

Attorney at Gislason & Hunter LLP

Lankamer Building, Suite 200, 124 East Walnut Street

Mankato, MN 56002-1268

 

Court Documents

#11

(#11) ORDER granting #8 Motion to Stay. Signed by U.S. District Judge Charles B. Kornmann on 11/29/21. Mailed to plaintiff. (SLW) (Entered: 11/29/2021)

#10

(#10) NOTICE of Appearance by Jennifer G. Lurken on behalf of Gilason & Hunter, Jennifer G. Lurken. (Lurken, Jennifer) (Entered: 11/24/2021)

#9

(#9) JOINDER by Defendants Gilason & Hunter, Jennifer G. Lurken re #8 MOTION to Stay (Lurken, Jennifer) (Entered: 11/24/2021)

#8

(#8) MOTION to Stay by Robert Anderson, Jon S. Flemmer, Tony Portra. (Anderson, Robert) (Entered: 11/19/2021)

#7

(#7) NOTICE of Appearance by Robert B. Anderson on behalf of Robert Anderson, Jon S. Flemmer, Tony Portra. (Anderson, Robert) (Entered: 11/19/2021)

#6

(#6) Amended Summons Issued as to Tony Portra. Delivered to Pro Se Plaintiff via US Postal Service. (DLC) (Entered: 11/02/2021)

#5

(#5) Summons Reissued as to All Defendants. Sent to Plaintiff via US Postal Service. (DLC) Mailed Summons and seven A085 forms to Plaintiff on 10/28/2021 (DJP). (Entered: 10/28/2021)

3 #2

AO 85

3 #1

Summons

#3

(#3) Summons Issued as to All Defendants. 6 Summons(es), a Rule 73 Memo, a copy of Fed.R.Civ.P.4, and AO 85s for each party delivered to plaintiff via mail. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 AO 85)(SLW) (Entered: 10/26/2021)

#2

(#2) MOTION for Discovery by Darin John Fonder. (SLW) (Entered: 10/26/2021)

1 #7

Cover Letter

1 #6

Exhibit C2 - Roberts County Complaint

1 #5

Exhibit C1- Roberts County Complaint

1 #4

Exhibit B3 - jurisdictional challenge

1 #3

Exhibit B2- jurisdictional challenge

1 #2

Exhibit B1- jurisdictional challenge

1 #1

*Restricted*

9 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) ORDER granting #8 Motion to Stay. Signed by U.S. District Judge Charles B. Kornmann on 11/29/21. Mailed to plaintiff. (SLW) (Entered: 11/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) NOTICE of Appearance by Jennifer G. Lurken on behalf of Gilason & Hunter, Jennifer G. Lurken. (Lurken, Jennifer) (Entered: 11/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) JOINDER by Defendants Gilason & Hunter, Jennifer G. Lurken re #8 MOTION to Stay (Lurken, Jennifer) (Entered: 11/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) MOTION to Stay by Robert Anderson, Jon S. Flemmer, Tony Portra. (Anderson, Robert) (Entered: 11/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE of Appearance by Robert B. Anderson on behalf of Robert Anderson, Jon S. Flemmer, Tony Portra. (Anderson, Robert) (Entered: 11/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Amended Summons Issued as to Tony Portra. Delivered to Pro Se Plaintiff via US Postal Service. (DLC) (Entered: 11/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Summons Reissued as to All Defendants. Sent to Plaintiff via US Postal Service. (DLC) Mailed Summons and seven A085 forms to Plaintiff on 10/28/2021 (DJP). (Entered: 10/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2021
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF: The Clerks Office has received your Complaint together with the filing fee and completed summons(es). A new case has been opened. Your summmons(es) will be issued. You are responsible for arranging service of the summons(es) and complaint on the defendant(s). Copy of docket sheet sent to plaintiff. Pro Se Litigant Registration Form for Electronic Notice also sent to plaintiff. Any further documents or correspondence you send to the Clerks Office concerning your case must include the case number. All documents submitted for filing must also contain an original signature. Submitted documents are electronically scanned for filing and they become the official court record. The quality of the official court record is determined by the quality of the original documents received for filing. Writing should only be on one side of the paper and writing must be dark enough for scanning. All documents must be on 8.5 x 11 inch paper. A request to electronically file documents in your case must be made through the PACER Service Center at www.pacer.uscourts.gov. The plaintiff must keep the Court informed of the plaintiff's address changes, including changes to primary and secondary email addresses. If the Court is not kept informed and multiple items are returned as undelivered, the plaintiff's case may be dismissed without prejudice for failure to prosecute. (SLW) (Entered: 10/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Summons Issued as to All Defendants. 6 Summons(es), a Rule 73 Memo, a copy of Fed.R.Civ.P.4, and AO 85s for each party delivered to plaintiff via mail. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 AO 85)(SLW) (Entered: 10/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) MOTION for Discovery by Darin John Fonder. (SLW) (Entered: 10/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT with Jury Demand, $402 fee paid, receipt# SDX300003926,. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Affidavit of citizenship, #2 Exhibit B1- jurisdictional challenge, #3 Exhibit B2- jurisdictional challenge, #4 Exhibit B3 - jurisdictional challenge, #5 Exhibit C1- Roberts County Complaint, #6 Exhibit C2 - Roberts County Complaint, #7 Cover Letter) (SLW) Modified on 10/26/2021 to restrict access to Exhibit A per Chambers. (CLR) (Entered: 10/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Jennifer Gene Lurken

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Robert B. Anderson