This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 09/10/2021 at 08:09:43 (UTC).

FOLLWEILER v. WOLTERS KLUWER HEALTH, INC.

Case Summary

On 07/12/2021 FOLLWEILER filed a Civil Right - Employment Discrimination lawsuit against WOLTERS KLUWER HEALTH, INC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Pennsylvania Eastern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is JEFFREY L. SCHMEHL. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    5:21-CV-03090

  • Filing Date:

    07/12/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Employment Discrimination

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

JEFFREY L. SCHMEHL

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

KEITH FOLLWEILER

Defendant

WOLTERS KLUWER HEALTH, INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ANDREW S. ABRAMSON

Defendant Attorney

JOSEPH WILLIAM CATUZZI

 

Court Documents

#1

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #2

Case Management Track Form

1 #3

Designation Form

#2

#3

#4

#5

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ANSWER to Complaint by WOLTERS KLUWER HEALTH, INC..(CATUZZI, JOSEPH) (Entered: 09/03/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) STIPULATION AND ORDER OF 8/4/21 THAT DEFENDANT SHALL HAVE AN EXTENSION THROUGH TO AND INCLUDING SEPTEMBER 3, 2021 TO ANSWER, MOVE OR OTHERWISE PLEAD TO THE COMPLAINT. ETC. SIGNED BY JUDGE:JEFFREY L. SCHMEHL ON 8/4/21. 8/4/21 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED. (DT) (Entered: 08/04/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) STIPULATION by WOLTERS KLUWER HEALTH, INC.. (CATUZZI, JOSEPH) (Entered: 08/04/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) SUMMONS Returned Executed by KEITH FOLLWEILER re: Marc Jones served Summons and Complaint upon WOLTERS KLUWER HEALTH, INC. by service of corporation - via Registered Agent in Pennsylvania. WOLTERS KLUWER HEALTH, INC. served on 7/14/2021, answer due 8/4/2021. (ABRAMSON, ANDREW) (Entered: 07/15/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/13/2021
  • DocketSummons Issued as to WOLTERS KLUWER HEALTH, INC.. E-MAILED To: COUNSEL on 7/13/21 (bw, ) (Entered: 07/13/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/12/2021
  • DocketDEMAND for Trial by Jury by KEITH FOLLWEILER. (JL ) (Entered: 09/03/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against WOLTERS KLUWER HEALTH, INC. ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0313-15247266.), filed by KEITH FOLLWEILER. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Case Management Track Form, #3 Designation Form)(ABRAMSON, ANDREW) (Entered: 07/12/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less