This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 07/25/2022 at 06:16:00 (UTC).

Foley v. Sedgwick Claims Management Services Inc et al

Case Summary

On 07/19/2021 Foley filed a Labor - Employee Benefit lawsuit against Sedgwick Claims Management Services Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Arkansas Eastern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Brian S. Miller. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:21-CV-00635

  • Filing Date:

    07/19/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Employee Benefit

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Brian S. Miller

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Jack Foley

Defendants

Sedgwick Claims Management Services Inc

AT&T Inc

AT&T Umbrella Benefit Plan No 3

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Brandon W. Lacy

Attorney at Lacy Law Firm

630 South Main Street

Jonesboro, AR 72401

Defendant Attorneys

Sheldon W. Snipe

One Cnn Center Nw, South Tower - Suite 1432B

Atlanta, GA 30303

Eva C. Madison

Attorney at Littler Mendelson, P.C.

The Fullbright Building - Suite 204, 217 East Dickson Street

Fayetteville, AR 72701

Sheldon Winford Snipe

Attorney at AT&T Services, Inc.

754 Peachtree Street, Ne, Suite C764

Atlanta, GA 30308

Margaret Hobbs Benson

Attorney at Littler Mendelson, P.C.

The Fullbright Building - Suite 204, 217 East Dickson Street

Fayetteville, AR 72701

 

Court Documents

#24

(#24) ORDER staying the remaining deadlines for 60 days from the date of this order, pending the finalization of the release and settlement agreement. Signed by Judge Brian S. Miller on 6/29/2022. (ljb) (Entered: 06/29/2022)

#23

(#23) NOTICE of Settlement and Request to Stay by Jack Foley (Lacy, Brandon) (Entered: 06/28/2022)

#22

(#22) ORDER granting #21 Jack Foley's motion for extension of time. Foley must submit his brief on or before 6/28/2022. Defendants' brief shall be filed within 14 thereafter. Signed by Judge Brian S. Miller on 5/27/2022. (ljb) (Entered: 05/27/2022)

#21

(#21) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Brief by Jack Foley (Lacy, Brandon) (Entered: 05/27/2022)

#20

(#20) ORDER granting #19 Jack Foley's motion for extension of time in which to file brief. Foley must submit his brief on or before 5/29/2022. Defendants' brief shall be filed within 14 days thereafter. Signed by Judge Brian S. Miller on 4/27/2022. (ljb) (Entered: 04/27/2022)

#19

(#19) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Plaintiff's Brief by Jack Foley (Lacy, Brandon) (Entered: 04/26/2022)

18 #5

Exhibit 5 - Plan Doc - UBP#3 ATT 1-51

18 #3

Exhibit 3 - STD File Part 1 of 2 AR 311-668

18 #2

Exhibit 2 - LTD File Part 2 of 2 AR 226-310

#8

#7

#6

#5

#4

#3

#2

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

18 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#24) ORDER staying the remaining deadlines for 60 days from the date of this order, pending the finalization of the release and settlement agreement. Signed by Judge Brian S. Miller on 6/29/2022. (ljb) (Entered: 06/29/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#23) NOTICE of Settlement and Request to Stay by Jack Foley (Lacy, Brandon) (Entered: 06/28/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#22) ORDER granting #21 Jack Foley's motion for extension of time. Foley must submit his brief on or before 6/28/2022. Defendants' brief shall be filed within 14 thereafter. Signed by Judge Brian S. Miller on 5/27/2022. (ljb) (Entered: 05/27/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Brief by Jack Foley (Lacy, Brandon) (Entered: 05/27/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) ORDER granting #19 Jack Foley's motion for extension of time in which to file brief. Foley must submit his brief on or before 5/29/2022. Defendants' brief shall be filed within 14 days thereafter. Signed by Judge Brian S. Miller on 4/27/2022. (ljb) (Entered: 04/27/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Plaintiff's Brief by Jack Foley (Lacy, Brandon) (Entered: 04/26/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) NOTICE by AT&T Umbrella Benefit Plan No 3 of Filing Stipulated Administrative Record (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - LTD File Part 1 of 2 AR 1-225, #2 Exhibit 2 - LTD File Part 2 of 2 AR 226-310, #3 Exhibit 3 - STD File Part 1 of 2 AR 311-668, #4 Exhibit 4 - STD File Part 2 of 2 AR 669-894, #5 Exhibit 5 - Plan Doc - UBP#3 ATT 1-51, #6 Exhibit 6 - Plan Doc - SPD ATT 52-100, #7 Exhibit 7 - Job Desc - Prem Tech)(Snipe, Sheldon) (Entered: 04/15/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) ORDER granting #16 Jack Foley's motion for extension of time to file the administrative record. The case will proceed on the following schedule: stipulated record shall be filed no later than 4/18/2022; plaintiff's brief shall be filed within 14 days thereafter; defendants' brief shall be filed within 14 days thereafter. Signed by Judge Brian S. Miller on 4/4/2022. (ljb) (Entered: 04/04/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) MOTION for Extension of Time to File Administrative Record by Jack Foley (Lacy, Brandon) (Entered: 04/01/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) ERISA SCHEDULING ORDER: The stipulated record shall be filed no later than 4/4/2022; plaintiff's brief shall be filed within 14 days thereafter; defendants' brief shall be filed within 14 days thereafter. No reply briefs will be allowed unless leave has been granted. Signed at the Direction of the Court on 2/3/2022. (ljb) (Entered: 02/03/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
5 More Docket Entries
  • 08/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE of Appearance by Margaret Hobbs Benson on behalf of AT&T Umbrella Benefit Plan No 3 (Benson, Margaret) (Entered: 08/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) MOTION for Leave to Appear pro hac vice by Sheldon W. Snipe. Fee $100 receipt number AAREDC-4083817. Filed by AT&T Umbrella Benefit Plan No 3 (Madison, Eva) (Entered: 08/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE of Appearance by Eva C. Madison on behalf of AT&T Umbrella Benefit Plan No 3 (Madison, Eva) (Entered: 08/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ORDER: Pursuant to #4 Jack Foley's stipulation of voluntary dismissal, defendant Sedgwick Claims Management Services Inc., is dismissed without prejudice. Signed by Judge Brian S. Miller on 8/12/2021. (kdr) (Entered: 08/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF DOCKET CORRECTION re #5 Amended Complaint. CORRECTION: The docket text was modified to correct the party name as "AT&T Umbrella Benefit Plan No 3" as indicated by the document. (cmn) (Entered: 08/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) AMENDED COMPLAINT against AT&T Umbrella Benefit Plan No 3, Sedgwick Claims Management Services Inc, filed by Jack Foley (Lacy, Brandon) (Docket text modified on 8/12/2021 to correct party name.)(cmn) (Entered: 08/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) STIPULATION of Dismissal of Sedgwick Claims Management Services, Inc. by Jack Foley. (Lacy, Brandon) (Entered: 08/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) AFFIDAVIT of Service of Complaint and Summons , filed by Jack Foley. AT&T Inc served on 7/23/2021. (Lacy, Brandon) (Entered: 08/06/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) AFFIDAVIT of Service of Complaint and Summons , filed by Jack Foley. Sedgwick Claims Management Services Inc served on 7/28/2021. (Lacy, Brandon) (Entered: 08/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Jack Foley. (Fee of $402. Receipt Number LIT082967. Summons issued and returned to Plaintiff's counsel for service) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(jak) (Entered: 07/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where AT&T Umbrella Benefit Plan No. 1 is a litigant

Latest cases where SEDGWICK CLAIMS MANAGEMENT SERVICES INC. THIRD-PARTY ADMINISTRATOR INSURED BY is a litigant

Latest cases where AT&T Corp. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Sheldon W. Snipe