This case was last updated from PACER on 08/24/2021 at 10:06:55 (UTC).

Fogarty v. Aurobindo Pharma USA, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 06/25/2021 Fogarty filed a Personal Injury - Other Product Liability lawsuit against Aurobindo Pharma USA, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New York Western District. The Judge overseeing this case is Lawrence J. Vilardo. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-CV-00772

  • Filing Date:

    06/25/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Product Liability

  • Courthouse:

    New York Western District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Lawrence J. Vilardo

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Thomas Fogarty

Grand Island, NY 14072

Defendants

Mylan Laboratories, Ltd.

Solco Healthcare U.S., LLC

Mylan Pharmaceuticals Inc.

John Does 1-100

Huahai U.S. Inc

Aurobindo Pharma Ltd.

Aurobindo Pharma USA, Inc.

Mylan N.V.

Aurolife Pharma LLC

Prinston Pharmaceuticals Inc.

Sandoz Inc.

Zhejiang Huahai Pharmaceutical Co., Ltd.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Theresa M. Walsh

Attorney at Brown Chiari LLP

2470 Walden Avenue

Buffalo, NY 14225

Defendant Attorney

Ernest F. Koschineg

Attorney at Cipriani & Werner, P.C.

450 Sentry Parkway, Suite 200

Blue Bell, PA 19422

 

Court Documents

#4

(#4) MULTIDISTRICT CONDITIONAL LITIGATION TRANSFER ORDER to the District Court of New Jersey Signed by John W. Nichols,Clerk of the Panel on 7/7/2021. (KM) (Entered: 07/09/2021)

2 #3

Exhibit

2 #2

Exhibit

2 #1

Memorandum in Support

#2

(#2) MOTION to Stay by Aurobindo Pharma USA, Inc., Mylan Pharmaceuticals Inc., Prinston Pharmaceuticals Inc., Solco Healthcare U.S., LLC. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit)(Koschineg, Ernest) (Entered: 06/29/2021)

1 #6

Exhibit Exhibit E

1 #5

Exhibit Exhibit D

1 #4

Exhibit Exhibit C

1 #3

Exhibit Exhibit B

1 #2

Exhibit Exhibit A

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Aurobindo Pharma USA, Inc. from Supreme Court of the State of New York, County of Erie, case number 802227/2021. (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0209-4286826), filed by Aurobindo Pharma USA, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit Exhibit E)(Koschineg, Ernest) (Entered: 06/25/2021)

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/09/2021
  • DocketCase transferred to the District Court of New Jersey as case 1:21-cv-13480, filed 7/9/2021. (KM) (Entered: 07/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) MULTIDISTRICT CONDITIONAL LITIGATION TRANSFER ORDER to the District Court of New Jersey Signed by John W. Nichols,Clerk of the Panel on 7/7/2021. (KM) (Entered: 07/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) TEXT ORDER granting the motion for a stay, Docket Item #2 . The parties shall alert the Court when a decision by the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation has been made. SO ORDERED. Signed by Hon. Lawrence J. Vilardo on 6/30/2021. (MLA)-CLERK TO FOLLOW UP- (Entered: 06/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) MOTION to Stay by Aurobindo Pharma USA, Inc., Mylan Pharmaceuticals Inc., Prinston Pharmaceuticals Inc., Solco Healthcare U.S., LLC. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit)(Koschineg, Ernest) (Entered: 06/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2021
  • DocketNotified Multi-District Litigation Panel of potential tag-along case. (TMK) (Entered: 06/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2021
  • DocketNotice of Availability of Magistrate Judge: A United States Magistrate of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form (AO-85) is available for download at #http://www.uscourts.gov/services-forms/forms. (TMK) (Entered: 06/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2021
  • DocketAUTOMATIC REFERRAL to Mediation The ADR Plan is available for download at #http://www.nywd.uscourts.gov/alternative-dispute-resolution.(TMK) (Entered: 06/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2021
  • DocketCase Assigned to Hon. Lawrence J. Vilardo. Notification to Chambers of on-line civil case opening. (TMK) (Entered: 06/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Aurobindo Pharma USA, Inc. from Supreme Court of the State of New York, County of Erie, case number 802227/2021. (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0209-4286826), filed by Aurobindo Pharma USA, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit Exhibit E)(Koschineg, Ernest) (Entered: 06/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Aurolife Pharma, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where ZHEJIANG HUAHAI PHARMACEUTICAL, CO., LTD is a litigant

Latest cases where Aurobindo Pharma USA, Inc. is a litigant