This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 11/01/2022 at 10:19:43 (UTC).

Focus Global Solutions LLC v. Juniper Networks, Inc.

Case Summary

On 09/02/2022 Focus Global Solutions LLC filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against Juniper Networks, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Delaware District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Colm F. Connolly. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:22-CV-01165

  • Filing Date:

    09/02/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Colm F. Connolly

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Focus Global Solutions LLC

Defendant

Juniper Networks, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

David W. deBruin

Defendant Attorney

Kenneth Laurence Dorsney

 

Court Documents

1 #1

Main Document

1 #1

Exhibit 1

1 #2

Exhibit 2

1 #3

Civil Cover Sheet

#2

(#2) NOTICE of Appearance filed by David W. deBruin on behalf of Focus Global Solutions LLC.(mkr) (Entered: 09/02/2022)

#3

(#3) Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (mkr) (Entered: 09/02/2022)

#4

(#4) Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks for Patent/Trademark Number 6,978,301. (mkr) (Entered: 09/02/2022)

#5

(#5) Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: No Parents or Affiliates Listed filed by Focus Global Solutions LLC.(mkr) (Entered: 09/02/2022)

#6

(#6) Summons Issued as to Juniper Networks, Inc. on 9/2/2022. (mkr) (Entered: 09/02/2022)

#7

(#7) MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Vyson Hsu, Attorney Megan Whyman Olesek and Attorney Marc David Peters - filed by Juniper Networks, Inc.. (Dorsney, Kenneth) (Entered: 09/14/2022)

#8

(#8) Return of Service Executed by Focus Global Solutions LLC. Juniper Networks, Inc. served on 9/8/2022, answer due 9/29/2022. (deBruin, David) (Entered: 09/15/2022)

#9

(#9) STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for Juniper to Answer, Move, or Otherwise respond to the Complaint to October 31,2022 - filed by Juniper Networks, Inc.. (Dorsney, Kenneth) (Entered: 09/19/2022)

#10

(#10) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Focus Global Solutions LLC (deBruin, David) (Entered: 10/14/2022)

11 #11

Main Document

11 #1

Notice of Voluntary Dismissal

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks for Patent/Trademark Number(s) 6,978,301. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal)(kmd) (Entered: 10/17/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCASE CLOSED per #10 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal. (kmd) (Entered: 10/17/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Focus Global Solutions LLC (deBruin, David) (Entered: 10/14/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSO ORDERED, re #9 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for Juniper to Answer, Move, or Otherwise respond to the Complaint to October 31,2022, filed by Juniper Networks, Inc. Reset Answer Deadlines: Juniper Networks, Inc. answer due 10/31/2022. Ordered by Judge Colm F. Connolly on 9/20/2022. (kmd) (Entered: 09/20/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for Juniper to Answer, Move, or Otherwise respond to the Complaint to October 31,2022 - filed by Juniper Networks, Inc.. (Dorsney, Kenneth) (Entered: 09/19/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Return of Service Executed by Focus Global Solutions LLC. Juniper Networks, Inc. served on 9/8/2022, answer due 9/29/2022. (deBruin, David) (Entered: 09/15/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSO ORDERED, re #7 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Vyson Hsu, Attorney Megan Whyman Olesek and Attorney Marc David Peters, filed by Juniper Networks, Inc. Ordered by Judge Colm F. Connolly on 9/14/2022. (kmd) (Entered: 09/14/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Vyson Hsu, Attorney Megan Whyman Olesek and Attorney Marc David Peters - filed by Juniper Networks, Inc.. (Dorsney, Kenneth) (Entered: 09/14/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/07/2022
  • DocketCase Assigned to Judge Colm F. Connolly. Please include the initials of the Judge (CFC) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb) (Entered: 09/07/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Summons Issued as to Juniper Networks, Inc. on 9/2/2022. (mkr) (Entered: 09/02/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: No Parents or Affiliates Listed filed by Focus Global Solutions LLC.(mkr) (Entered: 09/02/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks for Patent/Trademark Number 6,978,301. (mkr) (Entered: 09/02/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (mkr) (Entered: 09/02/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE of Appearance filed by David W. deBruin on behalf of Focus Global Solutions LLC.(mkr) (Entered: 09/02/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT for PATENT INFRINGEMENT filed with Jury Demand against Juniper Networks, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ADEDC-3951186.) - filed by Focus Global Solutions LLC. (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/6/2022: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Civil Cover Sheet) (smg). (Entered: 09/02/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less