This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 10/02/2022 at 08:08:30 (UTC).

Focus Global Solutions LLC v. Dell Technologies Inc.

Case Summary

On August 3, 2022, Focus Global Solutions LLC (“Plaintiff”), represented by Isaac Rabicoff of Rabicoff Law LLC, filed an intellectual property lawsuit against Dell Technologies Inc. (“Defendant”), seeking damages for alleged infringement of the U.S. patent owned by the plaintiff. This case was filed in the U.S. District Court for the Western District of Texas, with Judge Frank Montalvo presiding.

Plaintiff filed the complaint for the alleged infringement of U.S. patent No. 6,920,494 entitled “Storage area network methods and apparatus with virtual SAN recognition” (the “Patent-in-Suit”) owned by the plaintiff.

In the complaint, the plaintiff claimed, “Plaintiff is the assignee of all right, title and interest in United States Patent No. 6,920,494 (the ‘Patent-in-Suit’); including all rights to enforce and prosecute actions for infringement and to collect damages for all relevant times against infringers of the Patent-in-Suit.”

Plaintiff further claimed, “The ’494 Patent is entitled ‘Storage area network methods and apparatus with virtual SAN recognition,’ and issued 2005-07-19. The application leading to the ’494 Patent was filed on 2001-10-05.”

Plaintiff then alleged, “Defendant directly infringed one or more claims of the ’494 Patent in at least this District by making, using, offering to sell, selling and/or importing, without limitation literally or by the doctrine of equivalents. “

Plaintiff then alleged, “Numerous other devices that infringed the claims of the ’494 Patent have been made, used, sold, imported, and offered for sale by Defendant and/or its customers and Defendant also directly infringed, literally or under the doctrine of equivalents, the Exemplary ’494 Patent Claims, by having its employees internally test and use these Exemplary Products.”

Plaintiff presented one claim for relief for alleged infringement of the patent-in-suit.

In the prayer for relief, Plaintiff requested an award of appropriate damages, costs, expenses, and attorneys’ fees.

This is a summary of a legal complaint. All statements, claims, and allegations listed herein reflect the position of the plaintiff only and do not represent the position of UniCourt. Additionally, this case summary may not reflect the current position of the parties to this litigation or the current status of this case. To view the latest case updates and court documents, please sign up for a UniCourt account.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    6:22-CV-00832

  • Filing Date:

    08/03/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Frank Montalvo

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Focus Global Solutions LLC

Defendant

Dell Technologies Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Isaac Rabicoff

Attorney at Rabicoff Law LLC

5680 King Centre Dr, Suite 645

Alexandria, VA 22315

 

Court Documents

1 #1

Main Document

1 #1

Exhibit 1

1 #2

Exhibit 2

1 #3

Civil Cover Sheet

#2

(#2) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Isaac Rabicoff on behalf of Focus Global Solutions LLC (Rabicoff, Isaac) (Entered: 08/03/2022)

#3

(#3) RULE 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Focus Global Solutions LLC. (Rabicoff, Isaac) (Entered: 08/03/2022)

#4

(#4) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Focus Global Solutions LLC. (Rabicoff, Isaac) (Entered: 08/03/2022)

#5

(#5) Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 forwarded to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Rabicoff, Isaac) (Entered: 08/03/2022)

#6

(#6) Summons Issued as to Dell Technologies Inc. (zv) (Entered: 08/03/2022)

7 #7

Main Document

7 #1

Proposed Order

#8

(#8) Report on Patent/Trademark sent to U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (ta) (Entered: 08/09/2022)

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Report on Patent/Trademark sent to U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (ta) (Entered: 08/09/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Focus Global Solutions LLC (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Rabicoff, Isaac) (Entered: 08/09/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/03/2022
  • DocketCase randomly assigned to Judge Frank Montalvo pursuant to the Order Assigning Business of the Court as it Relates to Patent Cases, filed 7/25/2022. Case assigned to Judge Frank Montalvo. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (zv) (Entered: 08/03/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Summons Issued as to Dell Technologies Inc. (zv) (Entered: 08/03/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/03/2022
  • DocketAll parties shall flatten all documents before e-filing. All parties shall comply with the Standing Orders located at https://www.txwd.uscourts.gov/judges-information/standing-orders/. (zv) (Entered: 08/03/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 forwarded to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Rabicoff, Isaac) (Entered: 08/03/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Focus Global Solutions LLC. (Rabicoff, Isaac) (Entered: 08/03/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) RULE 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Focus Global Solutions LLC. (Rabicoff, Isaac) (Entered: 08/03/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Isaac Rabicoff on behalf of Focus Global Solutions LLC (Rabicoff, Isaac) (Entered: 08/03/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT FOR PATENT INFRINGEMENT ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ATXWDC-16345785), filed by Focus Global Solutions LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Rabicoff, Isaac) (Entered: 08/03/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Focus Global Solutions LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where Dell Technologies, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Isaac Philip Rabicoff