Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from PACER on 07/29/2021 at 17:21:52 (UTC).

FN Logistics, LLC v. The Compliance Firm LLC

Case Summary

On April 16, 2021, The Compliance Firm LLC, d/b/a Compliant Care Staffing (the “Compliance Firm” or “Plaintiff”), represented by Aaron M. Brian, Harsh P. Parikh and Staci Jennifer Riordan of Nixon Peabody LLP, filed a contract lawsuit against FN Logistics, LLC (“FNL” or “Defendant”), seeking a judgement, exemplary, punitive, and monetary damages for alleged misrepresentations and gross mismanagement. This case was filed in the U.S. District Court for the Central District of California with Judges Margo A. Rocconi and George H. Wu presiding. 

 

In its complaint, the Plaintiff alleged that, “FNL is not a healthcare services provider. It operates a warehouse in Santa Fe Springs, California from which it distributes clothing sold by the retail company Fashion Nova. Compliance Firm, however, represents itself to be an expert healthcare consulting company that specializes in mHealth, health informatics, medical engineering, and the laboratory and life sciences. Compliance Firm advertises that, among other healthcare services, it staffs medical providers at Covid-19 testing clinics, and provides clients with affordable and efficient onsite Covid-19 testing. In November 2020, and in response to the ongoing public health emergency and Covid-19 pandemic, FNL sought to offer Covid-19 testing services for its warehouse employees to safeguard the health and wellbeing of all personnel working at the warehouse. Compliance Firm convinced FNL that it was legally authorized and qualified to offer these testing services. As it turned out, Compliance Firm was not only unqualified and unauthorized to provide Covid-19 testing at FNL’s facility, as requested, Compliance Firm instead used this situation as a business opportunity to charge FNL for a variety of expenses and services that were unnecessary and contrary to the parties’ understanding.”

 

The Plaintiff further alleged that, “Instead of providing FNL with a turnkey solution to help respond quickly to the public health emergency, or arranging to contract with another authorized test kit distributor or logistics provider that could immediately offer Covid-19 testing services to FNL’s employees, Compliance Firm went through the expensive, cumbersome, and unreasonably time-consuming process of “building” a Covid-19 testing infrastructure from scratch that would enable Compliance Firm to be a CLIA-certified laboratory and acquire the testing kits from manufacturers. Compliance Firm also misled FNL into paying $398,893.96, which the Compliance Firm used to purchase thousands of Carestart COVID-19 Antigen devices (“CSA Tests”) from the manufacturer, and then arranged for delivery to FNL premises. Compliance Firm knew, but did not tell FNL, that neither party was authorized to lawfully possess, warehouse, store, sell, broker, distribute, or provide logistics services for the CSA Tests which are regulated by California pharmacy law as a “dangerous device” because they cannot be used or administered without a prescription.”

 

There are multiple claims for relief laid down by the plaintiff. A few of them are alleged Rescission, alleged unilateral Mistake, alleged sale of Covid-19 Testing Kits, alleged Unlawful Contract, alleged Consideration Failed by Creating Covid-19 Testing Lab, alleged Conversion, alleged Breach of Fiduciary Duty, alleged Violation of the Unfair Competition Law (Business & Professions Code § 17200) and alleged Intentional Misrepresentation. 

 

In its prayer for relief, the Plaintiff has requested the Court for a judgment against Compliance Firm for rescission of the sale of the CSA Tests; for monetary damages of $398,893.96; to provide a Covid-19 testing lab and monetary damages of $104,009.15; for prejudgment interest; an award of exemplary and punitive damages in an amount to be proven at trial; and prejudgment interest along with costs of litigation.

 

This case summary may not reflect the current position of the parties to this litigation or the status of this case. Sign up to view the latest case updates and court documents.



Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:21-CV-03312

  • Filing Date:

    04/16/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    California Central District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

George H. Wu

Referral Judge

Margo A. Rocconi

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

FN Logistics, LLC

Defendants

Does 1 through 10

The Compliance Firm LLC doing business as Compliant Care Staffing

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Harsh P Parikh

Attorney at Nixon Peabody LLP

300 South Grand Avenue Suite 4100

Los Angeles, CA 90071

Staci Jennifer Riordan

Attorney at Nixon Peabody LLP

300 South Grand Avenue Suite 4100

Los Angeles, CA 90071

Aaron M Brian

Attorney at Nixon Peabody LLP

300 South Grand Avenue Suite 4100

Los Angeles, CA 90071

 

Court Documents

#13

(#13) DEFAULT JUDGMENT by Clerk entered in favor of plaintiff FN Logistics, LLC against defendant The Compliance Firm LLC in the principal amount of $363,260.35, interest in the amount of $0.00, attorneys fees of $0.00, costs of $0.00 for a total judgment of $363,260.35. Related to: Clerks Entry of Default (CV-37) - optional html form #11 . MD JS-6, Case Terminated. (mrgo) (Entered: 07/15/2021)

12 #3

Certificate of Service

12 #2

Proposed Judgment

12 #1

Exhibit A-C

12 #12

Main Document

#11

(#11) DEFAULT BY CLERK F.R.Civ.P.55(a) as to The Compliance Firm LLC dba Compliant Care Staffing. (lom) (Entered: 06/14/2021)

#10

(#10) REQUEST for Clerk to Enter Default against defendant The Compliance Firm LLC filed by Plaintiff FN Logistics, LLC. (Riordan, Staci) (Entered: 06/14/2021)

#9

(#9) PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff FN Logistics, LLC, upon Defendant The Compliance Firm LLC served on 4/19/2021, answer due 5/10/2021. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon McKayla Sides, Registered Agent in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons returned. (Brian, Aaron) (Entered: 04/22/2021)

#8

(#8) STANDING ORDER RE FINAL PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCES FOR CIVIL JURY TRIALS by Judge George H. Wu, (lc) (Entered: 04/19/2021)

#7

(#7) 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant The Compliance Firm LLC. (lh) (Entered: 04/16/2021)

#6

(#6) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (lh) (Entered: 04/16/2021)

#5

(#5) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge George H. Wu and Magistrate Judge Margo A. Rocconi. (lh) (Entered: 04/16/2021)

#4

(#4) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties #3 , Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 , Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) #2 filed by Plaintiff FN LOGISTICS, LLC. (Riordan, Staci) (Entered: 04/16/2021)

#3

(#3) NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff FN LOGISTICS, LLC, identifying FN Logistics, LLC; The Compliance Firm LLC; Brittany Ann Stillwell. (Riordan, Staci) (Entered: 04/16/2021)

#2

(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff FN LOGISTICS, LLC. (Riordan, Staci) (Entered: 04/16/2021)

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-31131531 - Fee: $402, filed by Plaintiff FN LOGISTICS, LLC. (Attorney Staci Jennifer Riordan added to party FN LOGISTICS, LLC(pty:pla))(Riordan, Staci) (Entered: 04/16/2021)

5 More Documents Available
View All Documents

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) DEFAULT JUDGMENT by Clerk entered in favor of plaintiff FN Logistics, LLC against defendant The Compliance Firm LLC in the principal amount of $363,260.35, interest in the amount of $0.00, attorneys fees of $0.00, costs of $0.00 for a total judgment of $363,260.35. Related to: Clerks Entry of Default (CV-37) - optional html form #11 . MD JS-6, Case Terminated. (mrgo) (Entered: 07/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) APPLICATION for Default Judgment against Defendant The Compliance Firm LLC d/b/a Compliant Care Staffing filed by Plaintiff FN Logistics, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-C, #2 Proposed Judgment, #3 Certificate of Service) (Riordan, Staci) (Entered: 07/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) DEFAULT BY CLERK F.R.Civ.P.55(a) as to The Compliance Firm LLC dba Compliant Care Staffing. (lom) (Entered: 06/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) REQUEST for Clerk to Enter Default against defendant The Compliance Firm LLC filed by Plaintiff FN Logistics, LLC. (Riordan, Staci) (Entered: 06/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff FN Logistics, LLC, upon Defendant The Compliance Firm LLC served on 4/19/2021, answer due 5/10/2021. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon McKayla Sides, Registered Agent in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons returned. (Brian, Aaron) (Entered: 04/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) STANDING ORDER RE FINAL PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCES FOR CIVIL JURY TRIALS by Judge George H. Wu, (lc) (Entered: 04/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant The Compliance Firm LLC. (lh) (Entered: 04/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (lh) (Entered: 04/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge George H. Wu and Magistrate Judge Margo A. Rocconi. (lh) (Entered: 04/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties #3 , Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 , Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) #2 filed by Plaintiff FN LOGISTICS, LLC. (Riordan, Staci) (Entered: 04/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff FN LOGISTICS, LLC, identifying FN Logistics, LLC; The Compliance Firm LLC; Brittany Ann Stillwell. (Riordan, Staci) (Entered: 04/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff FN LOGISTICS, LLC. (Riordan, Staci) (Entered: 04/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-31131531 - Fee: $402, filed by Plaintiff FN LOGISTICS, LLC. (Attorney Staci Jennifer Riordan added to party FN LOGISTICS, LLC(pty:pla))(Riordan, Staci) (Entered: 04/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where FN LOGISTICS INC. DBA FASHION NOVA A DELAWARE CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Staci Jennifer Riordan

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Aaron M Brian