This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 09/22/2022 at 06:07:01 (UTC).

Flynn v. Ethicon, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 09/20/2022 Flynn filed a Personal Injury - Medical/Pharmaceutical Product Liability lawsuit against Ethicon, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Georgia Northern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Richard W. Story. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:22-CV-03792

  • Filing Date:

    09/20/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Medical/Pharmaceutical Product Liability

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Richard W. Story

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Chyntera Flynn

Defendants

Ethicon, Inc.

Johnson & Johnson

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

J. Christopher Elliott

Attorney at Bachus & Schanker, LLC

101 West Colfax, Suite 650

Denver, CO 80202

 

Court Documents

1 #1

Main Document

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#2

(#2) PRACTICE AND PROCEDURE ORDER No. 26 Requirements for Record Preservation and Prima Facie Evidence of Implant, Injury and Causation. Signed by Judge Richard W. Story on 05/13/2021. (ddm) (Entered: 09/21/2022)

#3

(#3) Order Re: Qualified Settlement Fund. Signed by Judge Richard W. Story on 9/20/21. (ddm) (Entered: 09/21/2022)

#4

(#4) QUALIFIED PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Judge Richard W. Story on 06/22/2022. (ddm) (Entered: 09/21/2022)

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) QUALIFIED PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Judge Richard W. Story on 06/22/2022. (ddm) (Entered: 09/21/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Order Re: Qualified Settlement Fund. Signed by Judge Richard W. Story on 9/20/21. (ddm) (Entered: 09/21/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) PRACTICE AND PROCEDURE ORDER No. 26 Requirements for Record Preservation and Prima Facie Evidence of Implant, Injury and Causation. Signed by Judge Richard W. Story on 05/13/2021. (ddm) (Entered: 09/21/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) SHORT FORM COMPLAINT, with Jury Demand, filed by Chyntera Flynn. (Direct file MDL) (Filing fee $402, receipt number AGANDC-12081184) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(ddm) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form. (Entered: 09/21/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Ethicon Inc is a litigant

Latest cases where Johnson & Johnson is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer John Christopher Elliott