This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 07/13/2020 at 05:46:13 (UTC).

Fluke v. Unlimited Progress Corp.

Case Summary

On 12/04/2019 Fluke filed a Finance - Consumer Credit lawsuit against Unlimited Progress Corp. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Illinois Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is John J. Tharp, Jr. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-CV-07944

  • Filing Date:

    12/04/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Finance - Consumer Credit

  • Courthouse:

    Illinois Northern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

John J. Tharp, Jr

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Steven P. Fluke

Defendants

Unlimited Progress Corp.

Unlimited Progress Corp. doing business as Creditors Discount & Audit

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

David Scott Klain

Attorney at Consumer Law Partners, Llc

333 N. Michigan Avenue, Suite 1300

Chicago, IL 60601

Kristen Carroll Wasieleski

Attorney at Consumer Law Partners, LLC

333 N. Michigan Ave., Suite 1300

Chicago, IL 60601

Defendant Attorneys

David M Schultz

Attorney at Hinshaw & Culbertson LLP

151 North Franklin Street, Suite 2500

Chicago, IL 60606

Lindsey A.L. Conley

Attorney at Hinshaw & Culbertson LLP

151 N. Franklin Street, Suite 2500

Chicago, IL 60606

 

Court Documents

#11

(#11) NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by Unlimited Progress Corp. (Conley, Lindsey) (Entered: 01/27/2020)

#10

(#10) ANSWER to Complaint and Affirmative Defenses by Unlimited Progress Corp.(Conley, Lindsey) (Entered: 01/27/2020)

#9

(#9) MINUTE entry before the Honorable John J. Tharp, Jr:This case is set for an initial status conference on 2/18/20 at 9:00 a.m. The parties are directed to review the procedures for initial status conferences, located at [https://www.ilnd.uscourts.gov/judge-info.aspx?79eF+7uiX7ewBj/ITKrjoA==], and to submit the required initial status report no later than 2/11/20. Mailed notice (air, ) (Entered: 12/18/2019)

#8

(#8) ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Unlimited Progress Corp. by Lindsey A.L. Conley (Conley, Lindsey) (Entered: 12/12/2019)

#7

(#7) ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Unlimited Progress Corp. by David M Schultz (Schultz, David) (Entered: 12/12/2019)

#6

(#6) WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Steven P. Fluke. Unlimited Progress Corp. waiver sent on 12/4/2019, answer due 2/3/2020. (Wasieleski, Kristen) (Entered: 12/12/2019)

#5

(#5) NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP). The key features and deadlines are set forth in this Notice which includes a link to the (MIDP) Standing Order and a Checklist for use by the parties. In cases subject to the pilot, all parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the Standing Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the Standing Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the following documents (Notice of Mandatory Initial Discovery and the Standing Order) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (gcy, ) (Entered: 12/05/2019)

#4

(#4) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Steven P. Fluke by David Scott Klain (Klain, David) (Entered: 12/04/2019)

#3

(#3) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Steven P. Fluke by Kristen Carroll Wasieleski (Wasieleski, Kristen) (Entered: 12/04/2019)

#2

(#2) CIVIL Cover Sheet (Wasieleski, Kristen) (Entered: 12/04/2019)

1 #2

Exhibit B-Payment Portal

1 #1

Exhibit A-Credit Report

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT filed by Steven P. Fluke; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-16498448. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Credit Report, #2 Exhibit B-Payment Portal)(Wasieleski, Kristen) (Entered: 12/04/2019)

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by Unlimited Progress Corp. (Conley, Lindsey) (Entered: 01/27/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) ANSWER to Complaint and Affirmative Defenses by Unlimited Progress Corp.(Conley, Lindsey) (Entered: 01/27/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) MINUTE entry before the Honorable John J. Tharp, Jr:This case is set for an initial status conference on 2/18/20 at 9:00 a.m. The parties are directed to review the procedures for initial status conferences, located at [https://www.ilnd.uscourts.gov/judge-info.aspx?79eF+7uiX7ewBj/ITKrjoA==], and to submit the required initial status report no later than 2/11/20. Mailed notice (air, ) (Entered: 12/18/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Unlimited Progress Corp. by Lindsey A.L. Conley (Conley, Lindsey) (Entered: 12/12/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Unlimited Progress Corp. by David M Schultz (Schultz, David) (Entered: 12/12/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Steven P. Fluke. Unlimited Progress Corp. waiver sent on 12/4/2019, answer due 2/3/2020. (Wasieleski, Kristen) (Entered: 12/12/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP). The key features and deadlines are set forth in this Notice which includes a link to the (MIDP) Standing Order and a Checklist for use by the parties. In cases subject to the pilot, all parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the Standing Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the Standing Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the following documents (Notice of Mandatory Initial Discovery and the Standing Order) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (gcy, ) (Entered: 12/05/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/04/2019
  • DocketCASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable John J. Tharp, Jr. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Young B. Kim. Case assignment: Random assignment. (jg, ) (Entered: 12/04/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Steven P. Fluke by David Scott Klain (Klain, David) (Entered: 12/04/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Steven P. Fluke by Kristen Carroll Wasieleski (Wasieleski, Kristen) (Entered: 12/04/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL Cover Sheet (Wasieleski, Kristen) (Entered: 12/04/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT filed by Steven P. Fluke; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-16498448. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Credit Report, #2 Exhibit B-Payment Portal)(Wasieleski, Kristen) (Entered: 12/04/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less