This case was last updated from PACER on 07/10/2021 at 07:49:14 (UTC).

FLOWONIX MEDICAL INCORPORATED v. BRANDENBURG et al

Case Summary

On 05/11/2021 FLOWONIX MEDICAL INCORPORATED filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against BRANDENBURG. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New Jersey District. The Judges overseeing this case are Susan D. Wigenton and Mark Falk. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:21-CV-11090

  • Filing Date:

    05/11/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Courthouse:

    New Jersey District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Susan D. Wigenton

Referral Judge

Mark Falk

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

FLOWONIX MEDICAL INCORPORATED

Defendants

ERIC BRANDENBURG

MEDTRONIC, INC.

MEDTRONIC USA, INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

JOSEPH PETER FITENI

Attorney at DONNELLY MINTER & KELLY LLC

163 Madison Avenue, Suite 320

Morristown, NJ 07960

Defendant Attorney

MICHAEL J. SLOCUM

Attorney at Greenberg Traurig

500 Campus Drive, Suite 400

Florham Park, NJ 07932-0677

 

Court Documents

9 #3

Text of Proposed Order

9 #2

Declaration Declaration of Peter Hennigan

9 #1

Declaration Declaration of Michael Slocum

#9

(#9) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of Michael Slocum, #2 Declaration Declaration of Peter Hennigan, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(SLOCUM, MICHAEL) (Entered: 07/02/2021)

8 #3

Text of Proposed Order

8 #2

Declaration Declaration of Sarah Horstmann

8 #1

Declaration Declaration of Michael Slocum

#8

(#8) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of Michael Slocum, #2 Declaration Declaration of Sarah Horstmann, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(SLOCUM, MICHAEL) (Entered: 07/02/2021)

#7

(#7) ORDER that the deadline for each of Defendants Eric Brandenburg, Medtronic, Inc., and Medtronic USA, Inc. to move, answer, or otherwise respond to the Complaint in the above-captioned action is extended through and including 7/20/2021. Signed by Chief Mag. Judge Mark Falk on 6/16/2021. (bt, ) (Entered: 06/16/2021)

#5

(#5) Corporate Disclosure Statement by MEDTRONIC USA, INC., MEDTRONIC, INC. identifying Medtronic plc as Corporate Parent.. (SLOCUM, MICHAEL) (Entered: 06/14/2021)

4 #1

Text of Proposed Order

#4

(#4) STIPULATION Extending Time to Respond to Complaint by All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(SLOCUM, MICHAEL) (Entered: 06/14/2021)

#2

(#2) Corporate Disclosure Statement by FLOWONIX MEDICAL INCORPORATED. (FITENI, JOSEPH) (Entered: 05/11/2021)

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against Eric Brandenburg, MEDTRONIC USA, INC., MEDTRONIC, INC. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 402 receipt number ANJDC-12454377) with JURY DEMAND, filed by FLOWONIX MEDICAL INCORPORATED. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(FITENI, JOSEPH) (Entered: 05/11/2021)

10 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSet/Reset Deadlines as to #9 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice , #8 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion set for 8/2/2021 before Judge Susan D. Wigenton. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (ld, ) (Entered: 07/06/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of Michael Slocum, #2 Declaration Declaration of Peter Hennigan, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(SLOCUM, MICHAEL) (Entered: 07/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of Michael Slocum, #2 Declaration Declaration of Sarah Horstmann, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(SLOCUM, MICHAEL) (Entered: 07/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ORDER that the deadline for each of Defendants Eric Brandenburg, Medtronic, Inc., and Medtronic USA, Inc. to move, answer, or otherwise respond to the Complaint in the above-captioned action is extended through and including 7/20/2021. Signed by Chief Mag. Judge Mark Falk on 6/16/2021. (bt, ) (Entered: 06/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE of Appearance by MICHAEL J. SLOCUM on behalf of All Defendants (SLOCUM, MICHAEL) (Entered: 06/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Corporate Disclosure Statement by MEDTRONIC USA, INC., MEDTRONIC, INC. identifying Medtronic plc as Corporate Parent.. (SLOCUM, MICHAEL) (Entered: 06/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) STIPULATION Extending Time to Respond to Complaint by All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(SLOCUM, MICHAEL) (Entered: 06/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) SUMMONS ISSUED as to ERIC BRANDENBURG, MEDTRONIC USA, INC., MEDTRONIC, INC.. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (bt, ) (Entered: 05/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2021
  • DocketJudge Susan D. Wigenton and Chief Mag. Judge Mark Falk added. (ps) (Entered: 05/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Corporate Disclosure Statement by FLOWONIX MEDICAL INCORPORATED. (FITENI, JOSEPH) (Entered: 05/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Eric Brandenburg, MEDTRONIC USA, INC., MEDTRONIC, INC. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 402 receipt number ANJDC-12454377) with JURY DEMAND, filed by FLOWONIX MEDICAL INCORPORATED. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(FITENI, JOSEPH) (Entered: 05/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Medtronic, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer JOSEPH PETER FITENI