This case was last updated from PACER on 11/23/2021 at 07:49:48 (UTC).

Flournoy v. Contra Costa County et al

Case Summary

On 09/24/2021 Flournoy filed a Prisoner - Prison Condition lawsuit against Contra Costa County. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Northern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Charles R. Breyer and PSLC LLH. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:21-CV-07480

  • Filing Date:

    09/24/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Prison Condition

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Charles R. Breyer

Referral Judge

PSLC LLH

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

James Henry Flournoy

San Rafael, CA 94903

Defendants

Contra Costa County

Martinez Detention Facility

West County Detention Facility

Clark

Combs

Mary

Navale

Lakeitha

Hollandberry

Stokes

Hernandez

Lario

Kyle McCollin

Jessica

Ashley Island

 

Court Documents

#1

1 #1

Table of Contents

1 #2

Exhibit

1 #3

Declaration

1 #4

Envelope

#2

#3

4 #4

Main Document

4 #1

Certificate/Proof of Service

#5

(#5) REQUEST for Copies of Complaints filed by James Henry Flournoy. (tn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/26/2021) (Entered: 10/26/2021)

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) REQUEST for Copies of Complaints filed by James Henry Flournoy. (tn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/26/2021) (Entered: 10/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Prisoner's Application and Declaration for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by James Henry Flournoy. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service) (tnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/8/2021) (Entered: 10/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMailed copy of #3 to Plaintiff. (wsnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/29/2021) (Entered: 09/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) CLERK'S NOTICE re completion of In Forma Pauperis affidavit or payment of filing fee due within 28 days. IFP Form due by 11/1/2021. (wsnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/24/2021) (Entered: 09/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Declaration in Support of In Forma Pauperis Status filed by James Henry Flournoy. (wsnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/24/2021) (Entered: 09/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants. Filed by James Henry Flournoy. (Attachments: #1 Table of Contents, #2 Exhibit, #3 Declaration, #4 Envelope)(wsnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/24/2021) (Entered: 09/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Martinez Detention Facility is a litigant

Latest cases where STOKES is a litigant

Latest cases where Jessica is a litigant