This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 10/29/2022 at 09:41:52 (UTC).

Florida State University et al v. The Individuals, Corporations, Limited Liability Companies, Partnerships and Unincorporated Associations Identified in Schedule A of the Complaint

Case Summary

On August 30, 2022, Florida State University and The Florida State University Board of Trustees, (collectively, “Plaintiffs”), represented by Christopher M. Tom, David E. Hutchinson and Nathan D. Monroe-yavneh of Thoits Law, filed an intellectual property lawsuit against individuals, corporations, limited liability companies, partnerships, unincorporated associations, and foreign entities identified on Schedule A attached hereto (collectively, “Defendants”), seeking injunctive relief and damages for alleged trademark infringement. This case was filed in the U.S. District Court for Northern District of Illinois.

In the complaint, the plaintiffs claimed, “This action has been filed by Plaintiffs to combat online counterfeiters who trade upon Plaintiffs’ reputation and goodwill by selling and/or offering for sale products in connection with Plaintiffs’ FLORIDA STATE UNIVERSITY (‘FSU’) trademarks.”

Plaintiffs further alleged, “Defendants are improperly advertising, marketing and/or selling unauthorized and illegal products (the ‘Counterfeit Products’) either by reference to or embodying a mark that is identical or substantially identical to at least one of the FSU Trademarks, which causes further confusion and deception in the marketplace.”

The plaintiffs also asserted, “Defendants have created numerous fully interactive commercial internet stores operating under the online marketplace accounts (the ‘Defendant Internet Stores’) and using the account name.”

Plaintiffs then claimed, “Defendants’ online marketplace accounts also share unique identifiers, such as design elements and similarities of the counterfeit products offered for sale, establishing a logical relationship between them and suggesting that Defendants’ illegal operations arise out of the same transaction, occurrence, or series of transactions or occurrences.”

The plaintiffs further alleged, “Defendants attempt to avoid liability by going to great lengths to conceal both their identities and the full scope and interworking of their illegal counterfeiting operation. Plaintiffs are forced to file this action to combat Defendants’ counterfeiting of the FSU Trademarks as well as to protect unknowing consumers from purchasing Counterfeit Products.”

Plaintiffs then alleged that “Plaintiffs have been and continue to be irreparably damaged through consumer confusion, dilution, and tarnishment of their valuable trademarks and goodwill.”

Plaintiffs additionally alleged that “Defendants deceive unknowing consumers by using the FSU Trademarks without authorization within the product descriptions of their Defendant Internet Stores to attract customers, as well as in some instances, embodied by the Counterfeit Products themselves.”

The plaintiffs further alleged that “Defendants also deceive unknowing consumers by using the FSU Trademarks without authorization within the content, text, and/or meta tags of their websites to attract various search engines crawling the Internet looking for websites relevant to consumer searches for FSU Products.”

Plaintiffs also alleged, “Defendants, without any authorization or license from Plaintiffs, have knowingly and willfully used and continue to use the FSU Trademarks in connection with the advertisement, distribution, offering for sale, and sale of Counterfeit Products into the United States and Illinois over the Internet.”

Plaintiffs presented three claims for relief, including claims for alleged trademark infringement and counterfeiting, false designation of origin, and violation of Illinois Uniform Deceptive Trade Practices.

In the prayer for relief, the plaintiffs requested a judgment for temporary and permanent injunctive relief along with an award for profits realized by defendants due to their unlawful acts and statutory damages and costs of litigation. 

This is a summary of a legal complaint. All statements, claims, and allegations listed herein reflect the position of the plaintiff only and do not represent the position of UniCourt. Additionally, this case summary may not reflect the current position of the parties to this litigation or the current status of this case. To view the latest case updates and court documents, please sign up for a UniCourt account.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:22-CV-04635

  • Filing Date:

    08/30/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Trademark

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

John F. Kness

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Florida State University

Florida State University Board of Trustees

Defendant

The Individuals, Corporations, Limited Liability Companies, Partnerships and Unincorporated Associations Identified in Schedule A of the Complaint

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

David Edward Hutchinson

Attorney at Thoits Law

1136 S. Delano Court West, Ste B201, 2068

Chicago, IL 60605

Christopher M. Tom

Attorney at Thoits Law

400 Main Street, Suite 250

Los Altos, CA 94022

Nathan Daniel Monroe-yavneh

Attorney at Thoits Law

400 Main Street, Suite 250

Los Altos, CA 94022

 

Court Documents

#22

(#22) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Florida State University, Florida State University Board of Trustees of Defendant No. 54 (virventurein). (Hutchinson, David) (Entered: 10/25/2022)

#21

(#21) Registry Deposit Information Form by Florida State University, Florida State University Board of Trustees $10,000 Deposit. (Hutchinson, David) (Entered: 10/21/2022)

#20

(#20) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Florida State University, Florida State University Board of Trustees of Defendants No. 66, 67, and 101. (Hutchinson, David) (Entered: 10/20/2022)

#19

RESTRICTED

#18

(#18) MINUTE entry before the Honorable John F. Kness: Plaintiff's motion for leave to file under seal 7 , ex parte motion for a temporary restraining order 8 , and motion for leave to file excess pages #9 are granted in part. Plaintiff's submissions (including the Declaration of Katie Pugh (see Dkt. #9 )) establish that, were Defendants to learn of these proceedings before the execution of Plaintiff's requested preliminary injunctive relief, there is a significant risk that Defendants could destroy relevant documentary evidence and hide or transfer assets beyond the reach of the Court. Accordingly, subject to unsealing at an appropriate time, Plaintiff may for now file under seal the documents identified in the motion to seal and appearing at docket entries #4 , 7 , 8 , and #10 . The Temporary Restraining Order being entered along with this minute order shall also be placed under seal. In addition, for the purpose of the motions cited above, Plaintiff's filings support proceeding (for the time being) on an ex parte basis under FRCP 65(b)(1). Specifically, and as noted above, were defendants to be informed of this proceeding before a TRO could issue, it is likely assets and websites would be redirected, thus defeating Plaintiff's interests in identifying defendants, stopping Defendants' infringing conduct, and obtaining an equitable accounting. In addition, the Court finds, at least for now on this limited and one-sided record and without prejudice to revisiting the issue, that it has personal jurisdiction over the Defendants because they directly target their business activities toward consumers in the United States, including Illinois. Specifically, Defendants have targeted sales to Illinois residents by setting up and operating e-commerce stores that target United States consumers using one or more Seller Aliases, offer shipping to the United States, including Illinois, accept payment in U.S. dollars, and have sold products using infringing and counterfeit versions of Plaintiff's trademarks to residents of Illinois. The evidence presented to the Court also shows that Plaintiff has demonstrated a likelihood of success on the merits (including evidence of active infringement and sales into Illinois), that the harm to plaintiff is irreparable, and that an injunction is in the public interest. An injunction serves the public interest because of the consumer confusion caused by counterfeit goods, and there is no countervailing harm to defendants from an order directing them to stop infringement. Electronic service of process does not violate any treaty and is consistent with due process because it effectively communicates the pendency of this action to Defendants. As this Court and others have noted, there may be reason to question both the propriety of the joinder of all Defendants in this one action and whether plaintiff will pursue an accounting (which Plaintiff asserts as justification for an asset freeze), but at this preliminary stage, the court is persuaded that Plaintiff has provided sufficient evidence of coordinated activity and the prospect of an accounting to justify the requested relief as to all Defendants. Expedited discovery is warranted to identify defendants and to implement the asset freeze. If any defendant appears and objects, the court will reconsider the asset freeze and joinder. Enter Sealed Temporary Restraining Order. Mailed notice (ef, ) (Entered: 10/17/2022)

#11

(#11) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Florida State University, Florida State University Board of Trustees by Christopher M. Tom (Tom, Christopher) (Entered: 08/30/2022)

9 #8

Exhibit Ex. 6 to Attorney Declaration

9 #3

Exhibit Ex. 1 to Attorney Declaration

9 #9

Main Document

6 #1

Supplement AO120 Trademark Form

6 #6

Main Document

#5

(#5) MOTION by Plaintiffs Florida State University, Florida State University Board of Trustees for disclosure Plaintiffs' Corporate Disclosure Statement and Notification as to Affiliates Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1 and Local Rule 3.2 (Hutchinson, David) (Entered: 08/30/2022)

#4

RESTRICTED

#3

(#3) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Florida State University, Florida State University Board of Trustees by David Edward Hutchinson (Hutchinson, David) (Entered: 08/30/2022)

#2

(#2) CIVIL Cover Sheet (Hutchinson, David) (Entered: 08/30/2022)

1 #2

Supplement Provisionally Filed Under Seal - Schedule A Slipsheet

1 #1

Exhibit Ex. 1 - FSU Trademarks

1 #1

Main Document

20 More Documents Available
View All Documents

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/27/2022
  • DocketSUMMONS Issued as to Defendant The Individuals, Corporations, Limited Liability Companies, Partnerships and Unincorporated Associations Identified in Schedule A of the Complaint (smb, ) (Entered: 10/27/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#22) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Florida State University, Florida State University Board of Trustees of Defendant No. 54 (virventurein). (Hutchinson, David) (Entered: 10/25/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) Registry Deposit Information Form by Florida State University, Florida State University Board of Trustees $10,000 Deposit. (Hutchinson, David) (Entered: 10/21/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/21/2022
  • DocketBOND in the amount of $ 10,000.00 company check, Receipt No. 4624278107, posted by Florida State University, Florida State University Board of Trustees. (emc, ) (Entered: 10/21/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Florida State University, Florida State University Board of Trustees of Defendants No. 66, 67, and 101. (Hutchinson, David) (Entered: 10/20/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) SEALED TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER Signed by the Honorable John F. Kness on 10/17/2022. (lxk, ) (Entered: 10/17/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) MINUTE entry before the Honorable John F. Kness: Plaintiff's motion for leave to file under seal 7 , ex parte motion for a temporary restraining order 8 , and motion for leave to file excess pages #9 are granted in part. Plaintiff's submissions (including the Declaration of Katie Pugh (see Dkt. #9 )) establish that, were Defendants to learn of these proceedings before the execution of Plaintiff's requested preliminary injunctive relief, there is a significant risk that Defendants could destroy relevant documentary evidence and hide or transfer assets beyond the reach of the Court. Accordingly, subject to unsealing at an appropriate time, Plaintiff may for now file under seal the documents identified in the motion to seal and appearing at docket entries #4 , 7 , 8 , and #10 . The Temporary Restraining Order being entered along with this minute order shall also be placed under seal. In addition, for the purpose of the motions cited above, Plaintiff's filings support proceeding (for the time being) on an ex parte basis under FRCP 65(b)(1). Specifically, and as noted above, were defendants to be informed of this proceeding before a TRO could issue, it is likely assets and websites would be redirected, thus defeating Plaintiff's interests in identifying defendants, stopping Defendants' infringing conduct, and obtaining an equitable accounting. In addition, the Court finds, at least for now on this limited and one-sided record and without prejudice to revisiting the issue, that it has personal jurisdiction over the Defendants because they directly target their business activities toward consumers in the United States, including Illinois. Specifically, Defendants have targeted sales to Illinois residents by setting up and operating e-commerce stores that target United States consumers using one or more Seller Aliases, offer shipping to the United States, including Illinois, accept payment in U.S. dollars, and have sold products using infringing and counterfeit versions of Plaintiff's trademarks to residents of Illinois. The evidence presented to the Court also shows that Plaintiff has demonstrated a likelihood of success on the merits (including evidence of active infringement and sales into Illinois), that the harm to plaintiff is irreparable, and that an injunction is in the public interest. An injunction serves the public interest because of the consumer confusion caused by counterfeit goods, and there is no countervailing harm to defendants from an order directing them to stop infringement. Electronic service of process does not violate any treaty and is consistent with due process because it effectively communicates the pendency of this action to Defendants. As this Court and others have noted, there may be reason to question both the propriety of the joinder of all Defendants in this one action and whether plaintiff will pursue an accounting (which Plaintiff asserts as justification for an asset freeze), but at this preliminary stage, the court is persuaded that Plaintiff has provided sufficient evidence of coordinated activity and the prospect of an accounting to justify the requested relief as to all Defendants. Expedited discovery is warranted to identify defendants and to implement the asset freeze. If any defendant appears and objects, the court will reconsider the asset freeze and joinder. Enter Sealed Temporary Restraining Order. Mailed notice (ef, ) (Entered: 10/17/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) CERTIFICATE of Service of Mediation Program Documents by David Edward Hutchinson on behalf of Florida State University, Florida State University Board of Trustees regarding lanham notification #14 (Hutchinson, David) (Entered: 09/15/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) MINUTE entry before the Honorable John F. Kness: The notice of motion #15 is stricken. Counsel is directed to review the Court's motions policy. There will be no hearing on 9/6/2022. Mailed notice (ef, ) (Entered: 09/02/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) Notice of Motion for presentment of Ex Parte Motion for Leave to File Under Seal 7 , Ex Parte motion for Entry of a Temporary Restraining order, including a Temporary Transfer of the Defendant Internet Stores, a Temporary Asset Restraint, Expedited Discovery, and Service of Process by Email and/or Electronic Publication 8 , and Motion to Exceed Page Limitation in their Memorandum in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for a Temporary Restraining Order #9 NOTICE of Motion by David Edward Hutchinson for presentment of motion for leave to file excess pages,, #9 before Honorable John F. Kness on 9/6/2022 at 09:30 AM. (Hutchinson, David) (Entered: 09/01/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 08/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Florida State University, Florida State University Board of Trustees by Nathan Daniel Monroe-yavneh (Monroe-yavneh, Nathan) (Entered: 08/30/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Florida State University, Florida State University Board of Trustees by Christopher M. Tom (Tom, Christopher) (Entered: 08/30/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) SEALED EXHIBIT by Plaintiffs Florida State University, Florida State University Board of Trustees to Katie Pugh Declaration (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex 2. (2 of 24) to Katie Pugh Declaration, #2 Exhibit Ex. 2 (3 of 24), #3 Exhibit Ex. 2 (4 of 24), #4 Exhibit Ex. 2 (5 of 24), #5 Exhibit Ex. 2 (6 of 24), #6 Exhibit Ex. 2 (7 of 24), #7 Exhibit Ex 2 (8 of 24), #8 Exhibit Ex. 2 (9 of 24), #9 Exhibit Ex. 2 (10 of 24), #10 Exhibit Ex. 2 (11 of 24), #11 Exhibit Ex. 2 (12 of 24), #12 Exhibit Ex. 2 (13 of 24), #13 Exhibit Ex. 2 (14 of 24), #14 Exhibit Ex. 2 (15 of 24), #15 Exhibit Ex. 2 (16 of 24), #16 Exhibit Ex. 2 (17 of 24), #17 Exhibit Ex. 2 (18 of 24), #18 Exhibit Ex. 2 (19 of 24), #19 Exhibit Ex. 2 (20 of 24), #20 Exhibit Ex. 2 (21 of 24), #21 Exhibit Ex. 2 (22 of 24), #22 Exhibit Ex. 2 (23 of 24), #23 Exhibit Ex 2 (24 of 24))(Hutchinson, David) (Entered: 08/30/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) MOTION by Plaintiffs Florida State University, Florida State University Board of Trustees for leave to file excess pages (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. A. FSU Memorandum in support of TRO, #2 Declaration Attorney Declaration (David E. Hutchinson), #3 Exhibit Ex. 1 to Attorney Declaration, #4 Exhibit Ex. 2 to Attorney Declaration, #5 Exhibit Ex. 3 to Attorney Declaration, #6 Exhibit Ex. 4 to Attorney Declaration, #7 Exhibit Ex. 5 to Attorney Declaration, #8 Exhibit Ex. 6 to Attorney Declaration, #9 Declaration Declaration of Katie Pugh (Client), #10 Exhibit Ex. 1 to Declaration of Katie Pugh (FSU Trademarks))(Hutchinson, David) (Entered: 08/30/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) CLAIM by Florida State University, Florida State University Board of Trustees regarding INVOLVING TRADEMARKS (Attachments: #1 Supplement AO120 Trademark Form)(Hutchinson, David) (Entered: 08/30/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) MOTION by Plaintiffs Florida State University, Florida State University Board of Trustees for disclosure Plaintiffs' Corporate Disclosure Statement and Notification as to Affiliates Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1 and Local Rule 3.2 (Hutchinson, David) (Entered: 08/30/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) SEALED EXHIBIT by Plaintiffs Florida State University, Florida State University Board of Trustees Schedule A to Complaint regarding complaint, #1 (Hutchinson, David) (Entered: 08/30/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Florida State University, Florida State University Board of Trustees by David Edward Hutchinson (Hutchinson, David) (Entered: 08/30/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL Cover Sheet (Hutchinson, David) (Entered: 08/30/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT filed by Florida State University, Florida State University Board of Trustees; Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AILNDC-19793661. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. 1 - FSU Trademarks, #2 Supplement Provisionally Filed Under Seal - Schedule A Slipsheet)(Hutchinson, David) (Entered: 08/30/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less