This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 07/13/2020 at 15:04:18 (UTC).

FLORIDA COMMUNITY SERVICES CORP OF WALTON COUNTY v. SKANKA USA CIVIL SOUTHEAST INC et al

Case Summary

On 01/15/2019 FLORIDA COMMUNITY SERVICES CORP OF WALTON COUNTY filed a Property - Other Personal Property lawsuit against SKANKA USA CIVIL SOUTHEAST INC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Florida Northern District. The Judges overseeing this case are M CASEY RODGERS, CHARLES J KAHN, JR and HOPE T CANNON. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:19-CV-00077

  • Filing Date:

    01/15/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Personal Property

  • Courthouse:

    Florida Northern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

M CASEY RODGERS

Referral Judges

CHARLES J KAHN, JR

HOPE T CANNON

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

FLORIDA COMMUNITY SERVICES CORP OF WALTON COUNTY

FLORIDA COMMUNITY SERVICES CORP OF WALTON COUNTY doing business as REGIONAL UTILITIES

Defendants

SKANKA USA CIVIL SOUTHEAST INC

FLORIDA DEPARTMENT OF TRANSPORTATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MICHAEL J REILLY

Attorney at LAW OFFICES OF JAMES KEHOE III - FORT LAUDERDALE FL

3230 W Commercial Boulevard, Suite 250

Fort Lauderdale, FL 33309

Defendant Attorney

JOSE PAGAN

Attorney at WALTON LANTAFF SCHROEDER ETC LLP - TALLAHASSEE FL

2074 Centre Pointe Blvd, Ste 100

Tallahassee, FL 32308

 

Court Documents

#11

(#11) ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to MAGISTRATE JUDGE HOPE T CANNON for all further proceedings. MAGISTRATE JUDGE CHARLES J KAHN, JR no longer assigned to case. Signed by CHIEF JUDGE MARK E WALKER on 3/1/2019. (erl)**Please use the new judge's initials for all future filings: 3:19cv77-MCR/HTC. (Entered: 03/05/2019)

#10

(#10) Corporate Disclosure Statement/Certificate of Interested Persons by FLORIDA COMMUNITY SERVICES CORP OF WALTON COUNTY identifying Other Affiliate TRAVELERS PROPERTY CASUALTY COMPANY OF AMERICA for FLORIDA COMMUNITY SERVICES CORP OF WALTON COUNTY.. (REILLY, MICHAEL) (Entered: 02/26/2019)

#9

(#9) INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER : Fed.R.Civ.P. 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement Deadline set for 2/26/2019. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 3/28/2019. Discovery due by 8/12/2019. Signed by JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS on 2/12/2019. (sdw) (Entered: 02/12/2019)

#8

(#8) ANSWER to #1 Complaint by FLORIDA DEPARTMENT OF TRANSPORTATION. (PAGAN, JOSE) (Entered: 02/11/2019)

#7

(#7) NOTICE of Appearance by JOSE PAGAN on behalf of FLORIDA DEPARTMENT OF TRANSPORTATION (PAGAN, JOSE) (Entered: 02/11/2019)

5 #1

Florida Department of Transportation Summons

#5

(#5) Summons Issued as to SKANKA USA CIVIL SOUTHEAST INC. and FLORIDA DEPARTMENT OF TRANSPORTATION. (Attachments: #1 Florida Department of Transportation Summons) (amm) (Entered: 01/18/2019)

#4

(#4) INTRA-DIVISION TRANSER: This cause has been filed in error in the Tallahassee Division of the Northern District of Florida. The Clerk is directed to transfer this case to the Pensacola Division and close the Tallahassee Division file. Signed by CHIEF JUDGE MARK E WALKER on 1/17/19. (amm) (Entered: 01/18/2019)

#2

(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET. (REILLY, MICHAEL) (Entered: 01/15/2019)

1 #2

SUMMONS

1 #1

SUMMONS

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by FLORIDA COMMUNITY SERVICES CORP OF WALTON COUNTY. (Attachments: #1 SUMMONS, #2 SUMMONS) (REILLY, MICHAEL) (Entered: 01/15/2019)

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to MAGISTRATE JUDGE HOPE T CANNON for all further proceedings. MAGISTRATE JUDGE CHARLES J KAHN, JR no longer assigned to case. Signed by CHIEF JUDGE MARK E WALKER on 3/1/2019. (erl)**Please use the new judge's initials for all future filings: 3:19cv77-MCR/HTC. (Entered: 03/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) Corporate Disclosure Statement/Certificate of Interested Persons by FLORIDA COMMUNITY SERVICES CORP OF WALTON COUNTY identifying Other Affiliate TRAVELERS PROPERTY CASUALTY COMPANY OF AMERICA for FLORIDA COMMUNITY SERVICES CORP OF WALTON COUNTY.. (REILLY, MICHAEL) (Entered: 02/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER : Fed.R.Civ.P. 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement Deadline set for 2/26/2019. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 3/28/2019. Discovery due by 8/12/2019. Signed by JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS on 2/12/2019. (sdw) (Entered: 02/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS notified that action is needed Re: #8 Answer to Complaint. (please see proposed ISO) (sdw) (Entered: 02/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) ANSWER to #1 Complaint by FLORIDA DEPARTMENT OF TRANSPORTATION. (PAGAN, JOSE) (Entered: 02/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) NOTICE of Appearance by JOSE PAGAN on behalf of FLORIDA DEPARTMENT OF TRANSPORTATION (PAGAN, JOSE) (Entered: 02/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2019
  • (#6) Case transferred in from Tallahassee Division on 01/17/2019. Case Number 4:19cv31-MW/CAS (amm) (Entered: 01/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Summons Issued as to SKANKA USA CIVIL SOUTHEAST INC. and FLORIDA DEPARTMENT OF TRANSPORTATION. (Attachments: #1 Florida Department of Transportation Summons) (amm) (Entered: 01/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) INTRA-DIVISION TRANSER: This cause has been filed in error in the Tallahassee Division of the Northern District of Florida. The Clerk is directed to transfer this case to the Pensacola Division and close the Tallahassee Division file. Signed by CHIEF JUDGE MARK E WALKER on 1/17/19. (amm) (Entered: 01/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2019
  • (#3) Filing fee: $ 400.00, receipt number FLN400035870. Fee status updated to paid. (amm) (Entered: 01/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET. (REILLY, MICHAEL) (Entered: 01/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by FLORIDA COMMUNITY SERVICES CORP OF WALTON COUNTY. (Attachments: #1 SUMMONS, #2 SUMMONS) (REILLY, MICHAEL) (Entered: 01/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where FLORIDA COMMUNITY SERVICES CORP OF WALTON COUNTY is a litigant

Latest cases where SKANSKA USA CIVIL SOUTHEAST INC is a litigant

Latest cases where Florida Department of Corrections is a litigant