This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 04/16/2023 at 07:29:07 (UTC).

Florida 595 Travel Center Corporation v. Commerce and Industry Insurance Company

Case Summary

On 02/15/2023 Florida 595 Travel Center Corporation filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against Commerce and Industry Insurance Company. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Florida Southern District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are William P. Dimitrouleas and Panayotta D Augustin-Birch. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    0:23-CV-60299

  • Filing Date:

    02/15/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

William P. Dimitrouleas

Referral Judge

Panayotta D Augustin-Birch

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Florida 595 Travel Center Corporation

Defendant

Commerce and Industry Insurance Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Stuart Teller

Defendant Attorneys

Ravika Rameshwar

Seth Victor Alhadeff

 

Court Documents

1 #1

Main Document

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet

1 #2

Exhibit Exhibit A

1 #3

Exhibit Exhibit B

1 #4

Exhibit Exhibit C

1 #5

Exhibit Exhibit D

1 #6

Exhibit Exhibit E

1 #7

Exhibit Exhibit F

#3

(#3) ORDER REQUIRING COUNSEL TO MEET, FILE JOINT SCHEDULING REPORT AND JOINT DISCOVERY REPORT Signed by Judge William P. Dimitrouleas on 2/16/2023. See attached document for full details. (cqs) (Entered: 02/16/2023)

#4

(#4) Commerce and Industry Insurance Company's ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Complaint re the Notice of Removal by Commerce and Industry Insurance Company. (Alhadeff, Seth) (Entered: 02/22/2023)

5 #5

Main Document

5 #1

Text of Proposed Order Proposed Scheduling Order

#6

(#6) ORDER SETTING TRIAL DATE & DISCOVERY DEADLINES, REFERRING CASE TO MEDIATION & REFERRING DISCOVERY MOTIONS TO UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE: ( Jury Trial set for 5/6/2024 before Judge William P. Dimitrouleas., Calendar Call set for 5/3/2024 10:00 AM before Judge William P. Dimitrouleas.), ORDER REFERRING CASE to US Magistrate Judge Panayotta D Augustin-Birch for Discovery Matters., ORDER REFERRING CASE to Mediation. Signed by Judge William P. Dimitrouleas on 3/29/2023. See attached document for full details. (cqs) #Pattern Jury Instruction Builder - To access the latest, up to date changes to the 11th Circuit Pattern Jury Instructions go to https://pji.ca11.uscourts.gov or click here. (Entered: 03/30/2023)

#7

(#7) ORDER SETTING DISCOVERY PROCEDURES. Signed by US Magistrate Judge Panayotta D Augustin-Birch on 3/30/2023. See attached document for full details. (mw01) (Entered: 03/30/2023)

8 #8

Main Document

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

04/13/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#8) Joint NOTICE of Mediator Selection and Hearing. Selected/Added Karen A. Brimmer as Mediator. Mediation Hearing set for 10/10/2023 at 10:00 a.m.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Joint Order Scheduling Mediation)(Alhadeff, Seth) (Entered: 04/13/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/30/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#7) ORDER SETTING DISCOVERY PROCEDURES. Signed by US Magistrate Judge Panayotta D Augustin-Birch on 3/30/2023. See attached document for full details. (mw01) (Entered: 03/30/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/29/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#6) ORDER SETTING TRIAL DATE & DISCOVERY DEADLINES, REFERRING CASE TO MEDIATION & REFERRING DISCOVERY MOTIONS TO UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE: ( Jury Trial set for 5/6/2024 before Judge William P. Dimitrouleas., Calendar Call set for 5/3/2024 10:00 AM before Judge William P. Dimitrouleas.), ORDER REFERRING CASE to US Magistrate Judge Panayotta D Augustin-Birch for Discovery Matters., ORDER REFERRING CASE to Mediation. Signed by Judge William P. Dimitrouleas on 3/29/2023. See attached document for full details. (cqs) #Pattern Jury Instruction Builder - To access the latest, up to date changes to the 11th Circuit Pattern Jury Instructions go to https://pji.ca11.uscourts.gov or click here. (Entered: 03/30/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/29/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#5) Joint SCHEDULING REPORT - Rule 16.1 by Commerce and Industry Insurance Company (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Scheduling Order)(Alhadeff, Seth) (Entered: 03/29/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/22/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#4) Commerce and Industry Insurance Company's ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Complaint re the Notice of Removal by Commerce and Industry Insurance Company. (Alhadeff, Seth) (Entered: 02/22/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/16/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#3) ORDER REQUIRING COUNSEL TO MEET, FILE JOINT SCHEDULING REPORT AND JOINT DISCOVERY REPORT Signed by Judge William P. Dimitrouleas on 2/16/2023. See attached document for full details. (cqs) (Entered: 02/16/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/15/2023

Docket(#2) Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge William P. Dimitrouleas. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Panayotta Augustin-Birch is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. (nwn) (Entered: 02/16/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/15/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL (STATE COURT COMPLAINT - Amended Complaint) Filing fee $ 402.00 receipt number AFLSDC-16333411, filed by Commerce and Industry Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 State Court Complaint/Amended Complaint & Motion to Dismiss, #3 Exhibit Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit Exhibit F)(Alhadeff, Seth) Motion To Dismiss Filed/No Answer Filed. Modified Text/Attachment Description on 2/16/2023 (nwn). (Entered: 02/15/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less