1:19-CV-06045
10/28/2019
Pending - Other Pending
Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle
Roslynn R. Mauskopf
Vera M. Scanlon
Antonio Flores
Kenneth R. Westphall, Jr.
W & A Distribution Services, Inc.
Boris Humberto Linares
Jeffrey A. Segal
Ian Kingsley
(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by W & A Distribution Services, Inc., Kenneth R. Westphall, Jr. from Supreme Court of NY- County of Queens, case number 710126/2019. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number BNYEDC-11983435) (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service, #2 Miscellaneous Case Cover Sheet, #3 Exhibit A - Complaint, #4 Exhibit B - Plaintiff's settlement demand) (Segal, Jeffrey) (Entered: 10/28/2019)
Certificate of Service
Miscellaneous Case Cover Sheet
Exhibit A - Complaint
Exhibit B - Plaintiff's settlement demand
(#5) ANSWER to Complaint by W & A Distribution Services, Inc., Kenneth R. Westphall, Jr.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service) (Segal, Jeffrey) (Entered: 11/06/2019)
Certificate of Service
Docket(#9) SCHEDULING ORDER: As discussed during the 12/19/2019 conference (see attached order for additional detail and deadlines), all discovery must be completed by 9/30/2020. On or before 10/12/2020, the Parties will file a joint status report letter confirming that discovery is complete. On or before 11/13/2020, the Parties will initiate any dispositive motions in accordance with the Individual Rules of the District Judge. On or before 12/11/2020, the Parties will file their joint Proposed Pretrial Order. An in person Status Conference is set for 5/14/2020 at 10:30 AM in Courtroom 13A South before Magistrate Judge Vera M. Scanlon. On or before 5/14/2020, the Parties will file a joint status report letter, of no more than three pages, identifying any outstanding discovery disputes. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Vera M. Scanlon on 12/19/2019. (Quinlan, Krista) (Entered: 12/20/2019)
[-] Read LessDocketMinute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Vera M. Scanlon:Initial Conference Hearing held on 12/19/2019 in Courtroom 13A South. Boris Linares appearing for Plaintiff. Ian Kingsley appearing for Defendant. See separate docket entry for Order issuing from this proceeding. (FTR Log #10:32-10:47.) (Quinlan, Krista) (Entered: 12/20/2019)
[-] Read LessDocket(#8) NOTICE of Appearance by Ian Kingsley on behalf of W & A Distribution Services, Inc., Kenneth R. Westphall, Jr. (aty to be noticed) (Kingsley, Ian) (Entered: 12/18/2019)
[-] Read LessDocket(#7) Proposed Scheduling Order by W & A Distribution Services, Inc., Kenneth R. Westphall, Jr. (Segal, Jeffrey) (Entered: 12/12/2019)
[-] Read LessDocket(#6) SCHEDULING ORDER: As set forth in the attached Order, an Initial Conference is scheduled for 12/19/2019 at 10:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Scanlon in Courtroom 13A South. Plaintiff's counsel is directed to confirm with Defendants' counsel that all necessary participants are aware of this conference. Counsel must complete the attached joint proposed scheduling order and file on ECF no later than 12/12/2019. Any requests for adjournment must be made in writing on notice to opposing parties, and must disclose whether all parties consent. No request for adjournment will be considered unless made at least forty-eight (48) hours before the scheduled conference unless in an emergency. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Vera M. Scanlon on 11/7/2019. (Quinlan, Krista) (Entered: 11/07/2019)
[-] Read LessDocket(#5) ANSWER to Complaint by W & A Distribution Services, Inc., Kenneth R. Westphall, Jr.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service) (Segal, Jeffrey) (Entered: 11/06/2019)
[-] Read LessDocket(#4) This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Bowens, Priscilla) (Entered: 10/29/2019)
[-] Read LessDocket(#3) In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Bowens, Priscilla) (Entered: 10/29/2019)
[-] Read LessDocketCase assigned to Judge Roslynn R. Mauskopf and Magistrate Judge Vera M. Scanlon. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Bowens, Priscilla) (Entered: 10/29/2019)
[-] Read LessDocket(#2) Corporate Disclosure Statement by W & A Distribution Services, Inc. (Segal, Jeffrey) (Entered: 10/28/2019)
[-] Read LessDocket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by W & A Distribution Services, Inc., Kenneth R. Westphall, Jr. from Supreme Court of NY- County of Queens, case number 710126/2019. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number BNYEDC-11983435) (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service, #2 Miscellaneous Case Cover Sheet, #3 Exhibit A - Complaint, #4 Exhibit B - Plaintiff's settlement demand) (Segal, Jeffrey) (Entered: 10/28/2019)
[-] Read Less