This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 02/13/2023 at 07:55:25 (UTC).

Flores v. Swift Transportation Company of Arizona LLC et al

Case Summary

On 12/15/2022 Flores filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against Swift Transportation Company of Arizona LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Northern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Ed Kinkeade. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:22-CV-02796

  • Filing Date:

    12/15/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Ed Kinkeade

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Hernandes Juana Flores

Defendants

Swift Transportation Company of Arizona LLC

Eelonn Tierre Watts

Not Classified By Court

ADR Provider

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Luis Fernando Baez

Defendant Attorney

David L Sargent

Not Classified By Court Attorney

Paul Michael McCullough, Jr

 

Court Documents

1 #1

Main Document

1 #1

Exhibit(s) 1 - Index of Matters Being Filed

1 #2

Exhibit(s) 2 - Index of State Court File

1 #3

Exhibit(s) 3 - Certificate of Interested Persons

1 #4

Exhibit(s) 4 - Swift Transportation Co. of Arizona LLC's Disclosure Stateme

1 #5

Cover Sheet 5 - Civil Cover Sheet (FED)

1 #6

Cover Sheet Supplement 6 - Supplemental Federal Civil Cover Sheet

#2

(#2) ORDER: This case was removed from State Court on December 15, 2022. Plaintiff's counsel, Luis F. Baez, is not admitted to practice in the United States District Court for the Northern District of Texas. Therefore, within 30 days from the date of this order, counsel for Plaintiff must either become admitted to practice in this District (See LR 83.7), or move the Court to be admitted Pro Hac Vice (See LR 83.9(b)). Further, Local Counsel in this court is required, and therefore within 30 days from the date of this order, counsel for Plaintiff must also designate local counsel pursuant to Local Civil Rule 83.10(a).Failure to comply with this order may result in dis missal of this case without prejudice and without further notice. (Ordered by Judge Ed Kinkeade on 12/15/2022) (chmb) (Main Document 2 replaced on 12/15/2022) (chmb). (Entered: 12/15/2022)

#3

(#3) ORDER REQUIRING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE AND REPORT FOR CONTENTS OF SCHEDULING ORDER. (Ordered by Judge Ed Kinkeade on 12/15/2022) (chmb) (Entered: 12/15/2022)

#4

(#4) NOTICE of Filing of Removal filed by Swift Transportation Company of Arizona, LLC, Eelon Tierre Watts (Sargent, David) (Entered: 12/15/2022)

#5

(#5) New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Rutherford). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (mms) (Entered: 12/16/2022)

#6

(#6) AMENDED DOCUMENT by Swift Transportation Company of Arizona LLC, Eelon Tierre Watts. Amendment to #1 Notice of Removal. Amended Notice of Removal. (Sargent, David) (Entered: 01/03/2023)

#7

(#7) Joint STATUS REPORT Regarding Contents of Scheduling Order filed by Swift Transportation Company of Arizona LLC, Eelon Tierre Watts. (Sargent, David) (Entered: 01/12/2023)

#8

(#8) SCHEDULING ORDER: Jury Trial set for 4/1/2024 09:00 AM before Judge Ed Kinkeade.Deadline for mediation is on or before 5/15/2023. Joinder of Parties due by 6/5/2023. Amended Pleadings due by 6/5/2023. Discovery due by 10/23/2023. Motions due by 11/6/2023. Pretrial Order due by 3/11/2024. Pretrial Materials due by 3/11/2024. (Ordered by Judge Ed Kinkeade on 1/13/2023) (chmb) (Entered: 01/13/2023)

#11

(#11) Designation of Mediator by Swift Transportation Company of Arizona LLC, Eelonn Tierre Watts. (Sargent, David) (Entered: 01/27/2023)

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/27/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) Designation of Mediator by Swift Transportation Company of Arizona LLC, Eelonn Tierre Watts. (Sargent, David) (Entered: 01/27/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/19/2023
  • Docket(#10) ELECTRONIC ORDER: On December 15, 2022, the Court Ordered Plaintiffs counsel, Luis F. Baez, to, by January 17, 2023, (1) either become admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas or move to be admitted Pro Hac Vice, N.D. Tex. L. Civ. R. 83.7, 83.9(b); and (2) designate local counsel pursuant to N.D. Tex. L. Civ. R. 83.10(a). Doc. No. 2. Today is January 19, 2023, and Plaintiff's counsel has not complied with either portion of the Court's December 15th Order. Doc. No. 2. Thus, Plaintiff's counsel is ORDERED to, by February 17, 2023, (1) either become admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas or move to be admitted Pro Hac Vice, N.D. Tex. L. Civ. R. 83.7, 83.9(b); AND (2) designate local counsel pursuant to N.D. Tex. L. Civ. R. 83.10(a). Failure to timely comply with this Order WILL result in the dismissal of this case without prejudice and without further notice. (Ordered by Judge Ed Kinkeade on 1/19/2023) (chmb) (Entered: 01/19/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) SCHEDULING ORDER: Jury Trial set for 4/1/2024 09:00 AM before Judge Ed Kinkeade.Deadline for mediation is on or before 5/15/2023. Joinder of Parties due by 6/5/2023. Amended Pleadings due by 6/5/2023. Discovery due by 10/23/2023. Motions due by 11/6/2023. Pretrial Order due by 3/11/2024. Pretrial Materials due by 3/11/2024. (Ordered by Judge Ed Kinkeade on 1/13/2023) (chmb) (Entered: 01/13/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/12/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Joint STATUS REPORT Regarding Contents of Scheduling Order filed by Swift Transportation Company of Arizona LLC, Eelon Tierre Watts. (Sargent, David) (Entered: 01/12/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/03/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) AMENDED DOCUMENT by Swift Transportation Company of Arizona LLC, Eelon Tierre Watts. Amendment to #1 Notice of Removal. Amended Notice of Removal. (Sargent, David) (Entered: 01/03/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Rutherford). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (mms) (Entered: 12/16/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Swift Transportation Company of Arizona LLC, Eelon Tierre Watts. (See document #1 -3 for image) (Clerk QC note: No affiliate entered in ECF). (mms) (Entered: 12/16/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE of Filing of Removal filed by Swift Transportation Company of Arizona, LLC, Eelon Tierre Watts (Sargent, David) (Entered: 12/15/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ORDER REQUIRING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE AND REPORT FOR CONTENTS OF SCHEDULING ORDER. (Ordered by Judge Ed Kinkeade on 12/15/2022) (chmb) (Entered: 12/15/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) ORDER: This case was removed from State Court on December 15, 2022. Plaintiff's counsel, Luis F. Baez, is not admitted to practice in the United States District Court for the Northern District of Texas. Therefore, within 30 days from the date of this order, counsel for Plaintiff must either become admitted to practice in this District (See LR 83.7), or move the Court to be admitted Pro Hac Vice (See LR 83.9(b)). Further, Local Counsel in this court is required, and therefore within 30 days from the date of this order, counsel for Plaintiff must also designate local counsel pursuant to Local Civil Rule 83.10(a).Failure to comply with this order may result in dis missal of this case without prejudice and without further notice. (Ordered by Judge Ed Kinkeade on 12/15/2022) (chmb) (Main Document 2 replaced on 12/15/2022) (chmb). (Entered: 12/15/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL WITH JURY DEMAND filed by Swift Transportation Company of Arizona LLC Eelon Tierre Watts. (Filing fee $402; receipt number ATXNDC-13375374) In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the # Judges Copy Requirements and # Judge Specific Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) 1 - Index of Matters Being Filed, #2 Exhibit(s) 2 - Index of State Court File, #3 Exhibit(s) 3 - Certificate of Interested Persons, #4 Exhibit(s) 4 - Swift Transportation Co. of Arizona LLC's Disclosure Statement, #5 Cover Sheet 5 - Civil Cover Sheet (FED), #6 Cover Sheet Supplement 6 - Supplemental Federal Civil Cover Sheet) (Sargent, David) Modified text on 12/16/2022 (mms). (Entered: 12/15/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less