This case was last updated from PACER on 03/09/2020 at 08:32:00 (UTC).

Flores v. Select Portfolio Servicing, Inc.

Case Summary

On 01/09/2020 Flores filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against Select Portfolio Servicing, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Western District. The Judge overseeing this case is Orlando L. Garcia. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    5:20-CV-00025

  • Filing Date:

    01/09/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Texas Western District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Orlando L. Garcia

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Joann B. Flores

Defendant

Select Portfolio Servicing, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Ramon S. Rodriguez, Jr.

Attorney at Ramon S. Rodriguez, Jr. Law Office

200 W. Olmos Dr., Suite 200

San Antonio, TX 78212

Defendant Attorneys

Michael F. Hord, Jr.

Attorney at Hirsch & Westheimer, PC

1415 Louisiana, 36Th Floor

Houston, TX 77002

Eric C. Mettenbrink

Attorney at Hirsch & Westheimer, PC

1415 Louisiana, 36Th Floor

Houston, TX 77002

 

Court Documents

1 #3

Exhibit C

1 #4

Exhibit C-1

1 #5

Exhibit C-2

#3

(#3) ORDER AND ADVISORY The Parties are to submit a proposed scheduling order for the Court's consideration within forty-five (45) days of the filing of this Order. Notice of right to consent to disposition of a civil case by a U.S. Magistrate Judge. Signed by Chief Judge Orlando L. Garcia. (bc) (Entered: 03/02/2020)

1 #11

Supplement Supplement to Civil Cover Sheet

1 #6

Exhibit C-3

1 #2

Exhibit B

1 #9

Exhibit D

1 #7

Exhibit C-4

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Select Portfolio Servicing, Inc. (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0542-13057023), filed by Select Portfolio Servicing, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit C-1, #5 Exhibit C-2, #6 Exhibit C-3, #7 Exhibit C-4, #8 Exhibit C-5, #9 Exhibit D, #10 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #11 Supplement Supplement to Civil Cover Sheet)(Hord, Michael) (Entered: 01/09/2020)

1 #1

Exhibit A

1 #10

Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet

1 #8

Exhibit C-5

#2

(#2) Letter sent to attorney: Ramon S. Rodriguez, Jr. regarding admission into the Western District of Texas (bc) (Entered: 01/10/2020)

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ORDER AND ADVISORY The Parties are to submit a proposed scheduling order for the Court's consideration within forty-five (45) days of the filing of this Order. Notice of right to consent to disposition of a civil case by a U.S. Magistrate Judge. Signed by Chief Judge Orlando L. Garcia. (bc) (Entered: 03/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Letter sent to attorney: Ramon S. Rodriguez, Jr. regarding admission into the Western District of Texas (bc) (Entered: 01/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2020
  • DocketIf ordered by the court, all referrals will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Farrer (bc) (Entered: 01/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2020
  • DocketCase assigned to Chief Judge Orlando L. Garcia. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (bc) (Entered: 01/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Select Portfolio Servicing, Inc. (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0542-13057023), filed by Select Portfolio Servicing, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit C-1, #5 Exhibit C-2, #6 Exhibit C-3, #7 Exhibit C-4, #8 Exhibit C-5, #9 Exhibit D, #10 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #11 Supplement Supplement to Civil Cover Sheet)(Hord, Michael) (Entered: 01/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.