This case was last updated from PACER on 07/16/2019 at 05:48:35 (UTC).

Flores v. RK Trailer Repair, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 03/22/2019 Flores filed a Labor - Family & Medical Leave lawsuit against RK Trailer Repair, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Indiana Northern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Theresa L Springmann and Andrew P Rodovich. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:19-CV-00114

  • Filing Date:

    03/22/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Family & Medical Leave

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Indiana Northern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Theresa L Springmann

Referral Judge

Andrew P Rodovich

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Demetrio J Flores

Defendants

FCS Industries, Inc.

RK Trailer Repair, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Nathaniel O Hubley

Attorney at Theisen & Associates LLC

810 S Calhoun St Ste 200

Fort Wayne, IN 46802

Nathaniel M Reinking

Attorney at Theisen & Associates LLC

810 S Calhoun St Ste 200

Fort Wayne, IN 46802

John C Theisen

Attorney at Theisen & Associates LLC

810 S Calhoun St Ste 200

Fort Wayne, IN 46802

Defendant Attorneys

Maureen P Rouse-Ayoub

Attorney at Varnum LLP - Nov/MI

39500 High Pointe Blvd Ste 350

Novi, MI 48375

Elizabeth Wells Skaggs

Attorney at Varnum LLP - Nov/MI

39500 High Pointe Blvd Ste 350

Novi, MI 48375

 

Court Documents

#24

(#24) REPLY to Response to Motion re #21 MOTION to Dismiss and to Compel Arbitration filed by FCS Industries, Inc., RK Trailer Repair, Inc.. (Rouse-Ayoub, Maureen) (Entered: 07/03/2019)

#23

(#23) RESPONSE to Motion re #21 MOTION to Dismiss and to Compel Arbitration filed by Demetrio J Flores. (Hubley, Nathaniel) (Entered: 06/14/2019)

22 #6

Exhibit E - Charge of Discrimination 12-31-2018

22 #5

Exhibit D - Charge of Discrimination 8-16-2018

22 #4

Exhibit C - Employment, Non-Compete, Confidentiality and Indemnification Agreeme

22 #3

Exhibit B - Employee Acknowledgement, Indemnification and Hold Harmless Agreemen

22 #2

Exhibit A - Company Policy and Arbitration Agreement

22 #1

Index of Exhibits

#21

(#21) MOTION to Dismiss and to Compel Arbitration by Defendants FCS Industries, Inc., RK Trailer Repair, Inc.. (Rouse-Ayoub, Maureen) (Entered: 05/17/2019)

#2

(#2) NOTICE of Appearance by Nathaniel O Hubley on behalf of Demetrio J Flores (Hubley, Nathaniel) (Entered: 03/22/2019)

1 #7

Proposed Summons Summons RK Trailer

1 #6

Proposed Summons Summons FCS

1 #5

Civil Cover Sheet Cover Sheet

1 #4

Exhibit 4 - Notice of Right to Sue

1 #3

Exhibit 3 - Charge of Discrimination

1 #2

Exhibit 2 - Dr. Snyder release

1 #1

Exhibit 1 - Work Restriction

#1

(#9) ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by FCS Industries, Inc., RK Trailer Repair, Inc..(Skaggs, Elizabeth) (Entered: 04/22/2019)

27 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#24) REPLY to Response to Motion re #21 MOTION to Dismiss and to Compel Arbitration filed by FCS Industries, Inc., RK Trailer Repair, Inc.. (Rouse-Ayoub, Maureen) (Entered: 07/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#23) RESPONSE to Motion re #21 MOTION to Dismiss and to Compel Arbitration filed by Demetrio J Flores. (Hubley, Nathaniel) (Entered: 06/14/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#22) BRIEF in Support of #21 MOTION to Dismiss and to Compel Arbitration filed by FCS Industries, Inc., RK Trailer Repair, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit A - Company Policy and Arbitration Agreement, #3 Exhibit B - Employee Acknowledgement, Indemnification and Hold Harmless Agreement, #4 Exhibit C - Employment, Non-Compete, Confidentiality and Indemnification Agreement, #5 Exhibit D - Charge of Discrimination 8-16-2018, #6 Exhibit E - Charge of Discrimination 12-31-2018, #7 Exhibit F - Notice of Right to Sue (Issued on Request), #8 Exhibit G - Rules and Guidelines for the Administration of the Arbitration Proceeding)(Rouse-Ayoub, Maureen) (Entered: 05/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#21) MOTION to Dismiss and to Compel Arbitration by Defendants FCS Industries, Inc., RK Trailer Repair, Inc.. (Rouse-Ayoub, Maureen) (Entered: 05/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#20) ORDER: Court GRANTS #19 Uncontested Motion to Withdraw as Attorney for Defendants. The appearance of Attorney Elizabeth Wells Skaggs is hereby WITHDRAWN. By Magistrate Judge Andrew P Rodovich on 5/14/2019. Text entry only. (tc) (Entered: 05/14/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#19) MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Defendants FCS Industries, Inc., RK Trailer Repair, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Stipulated Order)(Rouse-Ayoub, Maureen) (Entered: 05/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2019
  • (#18) RULE 16 PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL CONFERENCE held on 5/10/2019, before Magistrate Judge Andrew P Rodovich. Pla appeared by atty Nathaniel Hubley. Dfts appeared by atty Maureen Rouse-Ayoub. Defendant to file motion to compel arbitration by 5/17/2019. Response to be filed by 6/14/2019. Reply to be filed by 7/3/2019. Discovery deadlines will be set after a ruling on the motion. (tc) (Entered: 05/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#17) NOTICE of Appearance by Maureen P Rouse-Ayoub on behalf of All Defendants (Rouse-Ayoub, Maureen) (Entered: 05/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#16) REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Hubley, Nathaniel) (Entered: 05/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#15) ORDER: The Clerk is hereby directed to reassign this case from Judge Joseph S. Van Bokkelen to Chief Judge Theresa L. Springmann as the presider for all further proceedings. This order does not change the assignment of the Magistrate Judge or any previously scheduled deadlines, hearings or trial dates. Signed by Chief Judge Theresa L Springmann on 5/1/2019. (jss) (Entered: 05/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
5 More Docket Entries
  • 04/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by FCS Industries, Inc., RK Trailer Repair, Inc..(Skaggs, Elizabeth) (Entered: 04/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) NOTICE of Appearance by Elizabeth Wells Skaggs on behalf of FCS Industries, Inc., RK Trailer Repair, Inc. (Skaggs, Elizabeth) (Entered: 04/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Demetrio J Flores. RK Trailer Repair, Inc. served on 4/1/2019, answer due 4/22/2019. (Hubley, Nathaniel) (Entered: 04/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Demetrio J Flores. FCS Industries, Inc. served on 4/1/2019, answer due 4/22/2019. (Hubley, Nathaniel) (Entered: 04/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Summons Issued as to FCS Industries, Inc., RK Trailer Repair, Inc.. NOTE:The attached document is accessible by court personnel only. Summons forms that were electronically submitted to the court for issuance will be returned to counsel via e-mail. (sct) (Entered: 03/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2019
  • Judge Joseph S Van Bokkelen and Magistrate Judge Andrew P Rodovich added. (New Case) (sct) (Entered: 03/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) NOTICE of Appearance by Nathaniel M Reinking on behalf of Demetrio J Flores (Reinking, Nathaniel) (Entered: 03/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) NOTICE of Appearance by John C Theisen on behalf of Demetrio J Flores (Theisen, John) (Entered: 03/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) NOTICE of Appearance by Nathaniel O Hubley on behalf of Demetrio J Flores (Hubley, Nathaniel) (Entered: 03/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0755-3844121.), filed by Demetrio J Flores. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Work Restriction, #2 Exhibit 2 - Dr. Snyder release, #3 Exhibit 3 - Charge of Discrimination, #4 Exhibit 4 - Notice of Right to Sue, #5 Civil Cover Sheet Cover Sheet, #6 Proposed Summons Summons FCS, #7 Proposed Summons Summons RK Trailer)(Hubley, Nathaniel) (Entered: 03/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less