This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 04/19/2021 at 07:12:06 (UTC).

Flores v. Messino et al

Case Summary

On 02/18/2021 Flores filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against Messino. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Illinois Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Robert M. Dow, Jr. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-CV-00902

  • Filing Date:

    02/18/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

  • Courthouse:

    Illinois Northern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Robert M. Dow, Jr

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

David Flores

Defendants

Raid Ghanimah

William Papastefan

William Messino

City of Chicago, a municipal corporation

Peter Del Nodal

Brian Spreng

Santos Ruiz

Greg Gorzelany

Joseph Simioni

Marco Simonetti

Sergio Corona

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Gregg L. Smith

205 West Randolph Street, Suite 1040

Chicago, IL 60606

Defendant Attorneys

Allison Lynn Romelfanger

Attorney at City of Chicago

2 N. Lasalle, Suite 420

Chicago, IL 60602

Emily Rachel Bammel

Attorney at City Of Chicago - Dept. Of Law, Federal Civil Rights Litigat

2 N. Lasalle St. Suite 420

Chicago, IL 60602

Evan K. Scott

Attorney at City Of Chicago, Department Of Law

2 N La Salle St, Suite 420

Chicago, IL 60602

Raoul Vertick Mowatt

Attorney at City of Chicago Department of Law

2 N. Lasalle St., Suite 420

Chicago, IL 60602

Danielle Marie Alvarez

Attorney at City Of Chicago Department Of Law

2 N Lasalle Street Suite 420

Chicago, IL 60602

 

Court Documents

20 #7

Exhibit G

20 #6

Exhibit F

20 #5

Exhibit E

20 #4

Exhibit D

20 #3

Exhibit C

20 #1

Exhibit A

#20

(#20) RESPONSE by David Floresin Opposition to MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Defendant City of Chicago, a municipal corporation (Monell claim) #12 , MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Defendants Sergio Corona, Peter Del Nodal, Raid Ghanimah, Greg Gorzelany, William Messino, William Papastefan, Santos Ruiz, Joseph Simioni, Marco Simonetti, Brian Spreng All Defendants' Joint M #11 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G)(Smith, Gregg) (Entered: 04/16/2021)

#12

(#12) MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Defendant City of Chicago, a municipal corporation (Monell claim) (Mowatt, Raoul) (Entered: 03/19/2021)

#11

(#11) MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Defendants Sergio Corona, Peter Del Nodal, Raid Ghanimah, Greg Gorzelany, William Messino, William Papastefan, Santos Ruiz, Joseph Simioni, Marco Simonetti, Brian Spreng All Defendants' Joint Motion to Dismiss (Bammel, Emily) (Entered: 03/19/2021)

#7

(#9) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Robert M. Dow, Jr: Defendants' joint unopposed motion for extension of time to answer or otherwise plead #7 is granted to and including 3/19/2021. A joint status report is due no later than 3/26/2021 including (a) a proposed briefing schedule on any motion that Defendants' may file as a responsive pleading; (b) a proposed discovery plan, and (c) a statement in regard to settlement discussions and/or mutual interest in a referral to the Magistrate Judge for an early settlement conference. Emailed notice (cdh, ) (Entered: 02/26/2021)

#6

(#6) ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Sergio Corona, Peter Del Nodal, Raid Ghanimah, Greg Gorzelany, William Messino, William Papastefan, Santos Ruiz, Joseph Simioni, Marco Simonetti, Brian Spreng by Evan K. Scott (Scott, Evan) (Entered: 02/22/2021)

#4

(#4) MAILED Notice of removal letter to Counsel of record. (gcy, ) (Entered: 02/19/2021)

#3

(#3) CIVIL Cover Sheet (Mowatt, Raoul) (Entered: 02/18/2021)

#2

(#2) ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant City of Chicago, a municipal corporation by Raoul Vertick Mowatt (Mowatt, Raoul) (Entered: 02/18/2021)

1 #3

Exhibit C (Orders)

1 #2

Exhibit B (Pleadings)

1 #1

Exhibit A (Amended Complaint)

#1

(#1) NOTICE of Removal from Cook County Circuit Court of Illinois, case number (2020L001208) filed by City of Chicago, a municipal corporation (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (Amended Complaint), #2 Exhibit B (Pleadings), #3 Exhibit C (Orders))(Mowatt, Raoul) (Entered: 02/18/2021)

18 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) RESPONSE by David Floresin Opposition to MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Defendant City of Chicago, a municipal corporation (Monell claim) #12 , MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Defendants Sergio Corona, Peter Del Nodal, Raid Ghanimah, Greg Gorzelany, William Messino, William Papastefan, Santos Ruiz, Joseph Simioni, Marco Simonetti, Brian Spreng All Defendants' Joint M #11 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G)(Smith, Gregg) (Entered: 04/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) First AMENDED complaint by David Flores against All Defendants (Smith, Gregg) (Entered: 04/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) MOTION by Plaintiff David Flores to amend/correct Complaint, MOTION by Plaintiff David Flores for leave to file (Smith, Gregg) (Entered: 04/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Robert M. Dow, Jr: The Court adopts the parties' proposed briefing schedule on the Defendants' motions to dismiss #11 , #12 . [See 14]. Plaintiff's responses are due April 16, 2021, and Defendants replies are due April 30,2021; the Court will issue a ruling by mail. Emailed notice (cdh, ) (Entered: 04/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2021
  • Docket(#16) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Robert M. Dow, Jr: The Court adopts the parties' proposed briefing schedule on the Defendants' motions to dismiss [11, 12]: Plaintiff's responses are due April 16, 2021, and Defendants replies are due April 30,2021; the Court will issue a ruling by mail. Emailed notice(cdh, ) (Entered: 04/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/31/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Sergio Corona, Peter Del Nodal, Raid Ghanimah, Greg Gorzelany, William Messino, William Papastefan, Santos Ruiz, Joseph Simioni, Marco Simonetti, Brian Spreng by Allison Lynn Romelfanger (Romelfanger, Allison) (Entered: 03/31/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) STATUS Report Initial Joint by David Flores (Smith, Gregg) (Entered: 03/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff David Flores by Gregg L. Smith (Smith, Gregg) (Entered: 03/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Defendant City of Chicago, a municipal corporation (Monell claim) (Mowatt, Raoul) (Entered: 03/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Defendants Sergio Corona, Peter Del Nodal, Raid Ghanimah, Greg Gorzelany, William Messino, William Papastefan, Santos Ruiz, Joseph Simioni, Marco Simonetti, Brian Spreng All Defendants' Joint Motion to Dismiss (Bammel, Emily) (Entered: 03/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant City of Chicago, a municipal corporation by Danielle Marie Alvarez (Alvarez, Danielle) (Entered: 03/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Robert M. Dow, Jr: Defendants' joint unopposed motion for extension of time to answer or otherwise plead #7 is granted to and including 3/19/2021. A joint status report is due no later than 3/26/2021 including (a) a proposed briefing schedule on any motion that Defendants' may file as a responsive pleading; (b) a proposed discovery plan, and (c) a statement in regard to settlement discussions and/or mutual interest in a referral to the Magistrate Judge for an early settlement conference. Emailed notice (cdh, ) (Entered: 02/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Sergio Corona, Peter Del Nodal, Raid Ghanimah, Greg Gorzelany, William Messino, William Papastefan, Santos Ruiz, Joseph Simioni, Marco Simonetti, Brian Spreng by Emily Rachel Bammel (Bammel, Emily) (Entered: 02/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) MOTION by Defendants Sergio Corona, Peter Del Nodal, Raid Ghanimah, Greg Gorzelany, William Messino, William Papastefan, Santos Ruiz, Joseph Simioni, Marco Simonetti, Brian Spreng for extension of time to answer or otherwise plead. (Scott, Evan) (Entered: 02/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Sergio Corona, Peter Del Nodal, Raid Ghanimah, Greg Gorzelany, William Messino, William Papastefan, Santos Ruiz, Joseph Simioni, Marco Simonetti, Brian Spreng by Evan K. Scott (Scott, Evan) (Entered: 02/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) MAILED Notice of removal letter to Counsel of record. (gcy, ) (Entered: 02/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2021
  • DocketCASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Robert M. Dow, Jr. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Jeffrey Cummings. FEE DUE, NO INFORMA PAUPERIS APPLICATION SUBMITTED. Case assignment: Random assignment. (txl, ) (Entered: 02/18/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) CIVIL Cover Sheet (Mowatt, Raoul) (Entered: 02/18/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant City of Chicago, a municipal corporation by Raoul Vertick Mowatt (Mowatt, Raoul) (Entered: 02/18/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE of Removal from Cook County Circuit Court of Illinois, case number (2020L001208) filed by City of Chicago, a municipal corporation (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (Amended Complaint), #2 Exhibit B (Pleadings), #3 Exhibit C (Orders))(Mowatt, Raoul) (Entered: 02/18/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less