This case was last updated from PACER on 04/14/2020 at 08:53:04 (UTC).

Flores et al v. Motorola Solutions Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 02/14/2020 Flores filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against Motorola Solutions Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Illinois Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Charles R. Norgle, Sr. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-01128

  • Filing Date:

    02/14/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Courthouse:

    Illinois Northern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Charles R. Norgle, Sr

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Johnny Flores

Derrick Lewis

Ariel Gomez

Defendants

Vigilant Solutions, LLC

Motorola Solutions Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Arthur R. Loevy

Attorney at Loevy & Loevy

311 North Aberdeen, 3Rd Floor

Chicago, IL 60607

Jonathan I. Loevy

Attorney at Loevy & Loevy

311 N. Aberdeen, 3Rd Fl

Chicago, IL 60607

Scott Robert Drury

Attorney at Loevy & Loevy

311 N. Aberdeen, 3Rd Floor

Chicago, IL 60607

Michael I Kanovitz

Attorney at Loevy & Loevy

311 N. Aberdeen, 3Rd Fl

Chicago, IL 60607

Defendant Attorneys

David Charles Layden

Attorney at Jenner & Block LLP

353 N. Clark Street

Chicago, IL 60654

Reanne Zheng

Attorney at Jenner & Block, Llp

353 N Clark St.

Chicago, IL 60654

Andrew William Vail

Attorney at Jenner & Block LLP

353 N. Clark Street

Chicago, IL 60654

 

Court Documents

#16

(#16) ORDER Seconded Amended General Order 20-0012 IN RE: CORONAVIRUS COVID-19 PUBLIC EMERGENCY Signed by the Chief Judge Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on March 30, 2020. All open cases are impacted by this Second Amended General Order. Amended General Order 20-0012, entered on March 17, 2020, and General Order 20-0014, entered on March 20, 2020, are vacated and superseded by this Second Amended General. See attached Order for guidance.Signed by the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on 3/30/2020: Mailed notice. (docket4, ) (Entered: 03/31/2020)

#15

(#15) EXECUTIVE COMMITTEE ORDER: It appearing that 20 CV 1128, Flores et al v. Motorola Solutions Inc. et al., is currently assigned to the Hon. Charles R. Norgle Sr. and designated to Magistrate Judge Gabriel A. Fuentes; and It further appearing that Magistrate Judge Fuentes has recused himself from being the designated Magistrate Judge in case 20 CV 1128, Flores et al v. Motorola Solutions Inc. et al. pursuant to I.O.P. 13(f)(2)(c); therefore It is hereby ordered that another Magistrate Judge shall be designated by lot in 20 CV 1128, Flores et al v. Motorola Solutions Inc. et al. Signed by Executive Committee on 3/25/2020. (lma, ) (Entered: 03/25/2020)

#14

(#14) ORDER Amended General Order 20-0012 IN RE: CORONAVIRUS COVID-19 PUBLIC EMERGENCY Signed by the Chief Judge Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on March 16, 2020. All open cases are impacted by this Amended General Order. See attached Order for guidance.Signed by the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on 3/16/2020: Mailed notice. (ecw, ) (Entered: 03/18/2020)

#13

(#13) NOTICE of Motion by David Charles Layden for presentment of motion for extension of time to file answer, #12 before Honorable Charles R. Norgle Sr. on 3/20/2020 at 10:30 AM. (Layden, David) (Entered: 03/11/2020)

#12

(#12) MOTION by Defendants Motorola Solutions Inc., Vigilant Solutions, LLC for extension of time to file answer regarding amended complaint #6 - Defendants Motorola Solutions, Inc.'s and Vigilant Solutions, LLC's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiffs' First Amended Class Action Complaint (Layden, David) (Entered: 03/11/2020)

#11

(#11) ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Motorola Solutions Inc., Vigilant Solutions, LLC by Reanne Zheng (Zheng, Reanne) (Entered: 03/11/2020)

#10

(#10) ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Motorola Solutions Inc., Vigilant Solutions, LLC by Andrew William Vail (Vail, Andrew) (Entered: 03/11/2020)

#9

(#9) ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Motorola Solutions Inc., Vigilant Solutions, LLC by David Charles Layden (Layden, David) (Entered: 03/11/2020)

#8

(#8) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Johnny Flores, Derrick Lewis, Ariel Gomez as to Vigilant Solutions, LLC on 2/28/2020, answer due 3/20/2020. (Kanovitz, Michael) (Entered: 03/10/2020)

#7

(#7) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Johnny Flores, Derrick Lewis, Ariel Gomez as to Motorola Solutions Inc. on 2/20/2020, answer due 3/12/2020. (Kanovitz, Michael) (Entered: 02/21/2020)

#6

(#6) First AMENDED complaint by Johnny Flores, Derrick Lewis, Ariel Gomez against All Defendants (Drury, Scott) (Entered: 02/18/2020)

#5

(#5) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Johnny Flores, Ariel Gomez, Derrick Lewis by Arthur R. Loevy (Loevy, Arthur) (Entered: 02/14/2020)

#4

(#4) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Johnny Flores, Ariel Gomez, Derrick Lewis by Jonathan I. Loevy (Loevy, Jonathan) (Entered: 02/14/2020)

#3

(#3) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Johnny Flores, Ariel Gomez, Derrick Lewis by Scott Robert Drury (Drury, Scott) (Entered: 02/14/2020)

#2

(#2) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Johnny Flores, Ariel Gomez, Derrick Lewis by Michael I Kanovitz (Kanovitz, Michael) (Entered: 02/14/2020)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT filed by Johnny Flores, Derrick Lewis, Ariel Gomez; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-16731146. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Kanovitz, Michael) (Entered: 02/14/2020)

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) ORDER Seconded Amended General Order 20-0012 IN RE: CORONAVIRUS COVID-19 PUBLIC EMERGENCY Signed by the Chief Judge Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on March 30, 2020. All open cases are impacted by this Second Amended General Order. Amended General Order 20-0012, entered on March 17, 2020, and General Order 20-0014, entered on March 20, 2020, are vacated and superseded by this Second Amended General. See attached Order for guidance.Signed by the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on 3/30/2020: Mailed notice. (docket4, ) (Entered: 03/31/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) EXECUTIVE COMMITTEE ORDER: It appearing that 20 CV 1128, Flores et al v. Motorola Solutions Inc. et al., is currently assigned to the Hon. Charles R. Norgle Sr. and designated to Magistrate Judge Gabriel A. Fuentes; and It further appearing that Magistrate Judge Fuentes has recused himself from being the designated Magistrate Judge in case 20 CV 1128, Flores et al v. Motorola Solutions Inc. et al. pursuant to I.O.P. 13(f)(2)(c); therefore It is hereby ordered that another Magistrate Judge shall be designated by lot in 20 CV 1128, Flores et al v. Motorola Solutions Inc. et al. Signed by Executive Committee on 3/25/2020. (lma, ) (Entered: 03/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) ORDER Amended General Order 20-0012 IN RE: CORONAVIRUS COVID-19 PUBLIC EMERGENCY Signed by the Chief Judge Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on March 16, 2020. All open cases are impacted by this Amended General Order. See attached Order for guidance.Signed by the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on 3/16/2020: Mailed notice. (ecw, ) (Entered: 03/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) NOTICE of Motion by David Charles Layden for presentment of motion for extension of time to file answer, #12 before Honorable Charles R. Norgle Sr. on 3/20/2020 at 10:30 AM. (Layden, David) (Entered: 03/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) MOTION by Defendants Motorola Solutions Inc., Vigilant Solutions, LLC for extension of time to file answer regarding amended complaint #6 - Defendants Motorola Solutions, Inc.'s and Vigilant Solutions, LLC's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiffs' First Amended Class Action Complaint (Layden, David) (Entered: 03/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Motorola Solutions Inc., Vigilant Solutions, LLC by Reanne Zheng (Zheng, Reanne) (Entered: 03/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Motorola Solutions Inc., Vigilant Solutions, LLC by Andrew William Vail (Vail, Andrew) (Entered: 03/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Motorola Solutions Inc., Vigilant Solutions, LLC by David Charles Layden (Layden, David) (Entered: 03/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Johnny Flores, Derrick Lewis, Ariel Gomez as to Vigilant Solutions, LLC on 2/28/2020, answer due 3/20/2020. (Kanovitz, Michael) (Entered: 03/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Johnny Flores, Derrick Lewis, Ariel Gomez as to Motorola Solutions Inc. on 2/20/2020, answer due 3/12/2020. (Kanovitz, Michael) (Entered: 02/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) First AMENDED complaint by Johnny Flores, Derrick Lewis, Ariel Gomez against All Defendants (Drury, Scott) (Entered: 02/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2020
  • DocketSUMMONS Issued as to Defendants Motorola Solutions Inc., Vigilant Solutions, LLC (dxb, ) (Entered: 02/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Johnny Flores, Ariel Gomez, Derrick Lewis by Arthur R. Loevy (Loevy, Arthur) (Entered: 02/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Johnny Flores, Ariel Gomez, Derrick Lewis by Jonathan I. Loevy (Loevy, Jonathan) (Entered: 02/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Johnny Flores, Ariel Gomez, Derrick Lewis by Scott Robert Drury (Drury, Scott) (Entered: 02/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Johnny Flores, Ariel Gomez, Derrick Lewis by Michael I Kanovitz (Kanovitz, Michael) (Entered: 02/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • DocketCASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Charles R. Norgle, Sr. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Gabriel A. Fuentes. Case assignment: Random assignment. (ng, ) (Entered: 02/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT filed by Johnny Flores, Derrick Lewis, Ariel Gomez; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-16731146. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Kanovitz, Michael) (Entered: 02/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Vigilant Solutions is a litigant

Latest cases where Motorola Solutions Inc is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Scott R. Drury

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Arthur R. Loevy