This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 10/01/2021 at 08:43:50 (UTC).

Flores et al v. Amazon.com Inc et al

Case Summary

On 08/02/2021 Flores filed an Other lawsuit against Amazon com Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Illinois Northern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Mary M. Rowland and Franklin U. Valderrama. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-CV-04064

  • Filing Date:

    08/02/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

Mary M. Rowland

Franklin U. Valderrama

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Lucia Flores

Donna Rucker

Jason Stebbins

Sandy White

Julie Bloom Stebbins

Cheri Anne Clarke

Becky White

Defendants

Amazon.com Inc

Amazon.com Services, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Adam John Florek

Attorney at Peiffer Wolf Carr Kane & Conway, APLC

818 Lafayette Ave., Floor 2

St. Louis, MO 63104

Aaron Siri

Attorney at Siri & Glimstad LLP

200 Park Avenue, 17Th Floor

New York, NY 10166

Brandon Michael Wise

Attorney at Peiffer Wolf Carr & Kane, Aplc

818 Lafayette Ave., Floor 2

St. Louis, MO 63104

Mason A Barney

Attorney at Siri & Glimstad LLP

200 Park Avenue, 17Th Floor

New York, NY 10166

David B Richardson

2135 112Th Ave Ne, Ste 200

Bellevue, WA 98004

Defendant Attorneys

Elizabeth Brooke Herrington

Attorney at Morgan, Lewis & Bockius LLP

110 N. Wacker Dr., Suite 2800

Chicago, IL 60606

Alborz Hassani

Attorney at Morgan, Lewis & Bockius Llp

110 North Wacker Drive, Suite 2800

Chicago, IL 60606-1511

Alex David Berger

Attorney at Morgan, Lewis & Bockius LLP

110 North Wacker Drive, Suite 2800

Chicago, IL 60606

Gregory Thomas Fouts

Attorney at Morgan, Lewis & Bockius LLP

110 N. Wacker Dr., Suite 2800

Chicago, IL 60606

Jedediah Wakefield

Attorney at Fenwick & West LLP

555 California St

San Francisco, CA 94104

Laurence F Pulgram

Attorney at Fenwick & West Llp

555 California Street, 12Th Floor

San Francisco, CA 94104

Brian D Buckley

Attorney at FENWICK & WEST (WA)

1191 Second Ave, 10Th Floor

Seattle, WA 98101

 

Court Documents

#26

#25

#24

#23

#22

#21

20 #1

Joint Status Report

#20

#19

#18

17 #1

*Restricted*

#9

#8

#4

#3

#2

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet

#1

15 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#26) MOTION by Defendants Amazon.com Inc, Amazon.com Services, Inc. to vacate Responsive Pleading Deadline Pending Filing of Consolidated Amended Complaint or, in the Alternative, for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint [Unopposed] (Herrington, Elizabeth) (Entered: 09/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#25) ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Amazon.com Inc, Amazon.com Services, Inc. by Alborz Hassani (Hassani, Alborz) (Entered: 09/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#24) ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Amazon.com Inc, Amazon.com Services, Inc. by Alex David Berger (Berger, Alex) (Entered: 09/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#23) ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Amazon.com Inc, Amazon.com Services, Inc. by Gregory Thomas Fouts (Fouts, Gregory) (Entered: 09/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#22) ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Amazon.com Inc, Amazon.com Services, Inc. by Elizabeth Brooke Herrington (Herrington, Elizabeth) (Entered: 09/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Cheri Anne Clarke, Lucia Flores, Donna Rucker, Jason Stebbins, Julie Bloom Stebbins, Becky White, Sandy White by Adam John Florek (Florek, Adam) (Entered: 09/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Franklin U. Valderrama: All counsel are reminded of their obligation to comply with the Court's Rule 83.15 requirement #18 by 9/1/2021. Defendants Amazon.com, Inc. and Amazon.com Services, Inc. are directed to answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint #1 by 9/22/2021. On or before 09/29/2021, the parties shall file a joint initial status report. A template for the Joint Initial Status Report, setting forth the information required, may be found at http://www.ilnd.uscourts.gov/Judges.aspx by clicking on Judge Valderrama's name and then again on the link entitled 'Joint Initial Status Report.' The parties are further ordered to review all of Judge Valderrama's standing orders and the information available on his webpage. Mailed notice (Attachments: #1 Joint Status Report) (axc). (Entered: 08/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) EXECUTIVE COMMITTEE ORDER: Case reassigned to the Honorable Franklin U. Valderrama for all further proceedings. Honorable Mary M. Rowland no longer assigned to the case. Signed by Executive Committee on 8/25/2021.(gw, ) (Entered: 08/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) Rule 83.15 Letter to all counsel of record. (ph, ) (Entered: 08/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) RECEIVED from Washington Western; Case Number 2:21-cv-00873 (ph) (Entered: 08/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
7 More Docket Entries
  • 06/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Laurence F. Pulgram FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Defendants Amazon.com Inc, Amazon.com Services Inc (Fee Paid) Receipt No. AWAWDC-7146783 (Buckley, Brian) [Transferred from Washington Western on 8/2/2021.] (Entered: 06/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Brian D Buckley on behalf of Defendants Amazon.com Inc, Amazon.com Services Inc. (Buckley, Brian) [Transferred from Washington Western on 8/2/2021.] (Entered: 06/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ORDER re #4 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Mason Barney for Plaintiffs Cheri Anne Clarke, Lucia Flores, Donna Rucker, Jason Stebbins, Julie Bloom Stebbins, Becky White, and Sandy White, by Clerk William M McCool. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(DS) [Transferred from Washington Western on 8/2/2021.] (Entered: 06/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ORDER re #3 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Aaron Siri for Plaintiffs Cheri Anne Clarke, Lucia Flores, Donna Rucker, Jason Stebbins, Julie Bloom Stebbins, Becky White, and Sandy White, by Clerk William M McCool. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(DS) [Transferred from Washington Western on 8/2/2021.] (Entered: 06/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2021
  • DocketJudge Barbara J. Rothstein added. (CDA) [Transferred from Washington Western on 8/2/2021.] (Entered: 06/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ORDER re #2 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Brandon Michael Wise for Plaintiffs Lucia Flores, Donna Rucker, Jason Stebbins, Sandy White, Julie Bloom Stebbins, Cheri Anne Clarke and Becky White, by Clerk William M McCool. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(DS) [Transferred from Washington Western on 8/2/2021.] (Entered: 06/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Mason Barney FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Plaintiffs Lucia Flores, Donna Rucker, Jason Stebbins, Sandy White, Julie Bloom Stebbins, Cheri Anne Clarke and Becky White,(Fee Paid) Receipt No. AWAWDC-7143576 (Richardson, David) Added all Plaintiffs 6/29/2021 (DS). [Transferred from Washington Western on 8/2/2021.] (Entered: 06/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Aaron Siri FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Plaintiffs Lucia Flores, Donna Rucker, Jason Stebbins, Sandy White, Julie Bloom Stebbins, Cheri Anne Clarke and Becky White,(Fee Paid) Receipt No. AWAWDC-7143568 (Richardson, David) Added all Plaintiffs 6/29/2021 (DS). [Transferred from Washington Western on 8/2/2021.] (Entered: 06/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Brandon M. Wise FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Plaintiffs Lucia Flores, Donna Rucker, Jason Stebbins, Sandy White, Julie Bloom Stebbins, Cheri Anne Clarke and Becky White, (Fee Paid) Receipt No. AWAWDC-7143565 (Richardson, David) Added all plaintiffs on 6/29/2021 (DS). [Transferred from Washington Western on 8/2/2021.] (Entered: 06/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants with JURY DEMAND (Receipt # AWAWDC-7143551) Attorney David B Richardson added to party Lucia Flores(pty:pla), filed by Lucia Flores. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(Richardson, David) (Attachment 1 replaced on 6/29/2021 to replace malformed PDF) (MET). [Transferred from Washington Western on 8/2/2021.] (Entered: 06/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Amazon.Com, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Brian D. Buckley

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Alborz Hassani

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Alex David Berger