This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 04/16/2023 at 07:16:11 (UTC).

Flora et al v. Prisma Labs, Inc.

Case Summary

On February 15, 2023, Jack Flora, Nathan Matson, Courtney Owens, and D.J. (collectively, “Plaintiffs”), individually and on behalf of similarly situated individuals, represented by Thomas M. Hanson of Loevy & Loevy, filed a civil rights class action lawsuit against Prisma Labs, Inc. (“Defendant”), seeking injunctive and declaratory relief for alleged invasion of privacy rights. This case was filed in the U.S. District Court for the Northern District of California, with Judge Virginia K. DeMarchi presiding.

In the complaint, the plaintiffs claimed, “Founded in 2016, Prisma initially launched an eponymously named app, Prisma. The app was available on the Apple AppStore for iPhone users and on Google Play for Android users.”

The plaintiffs further claimed, “Two years later, in late 2018, Prisma launched its second product, Lensa.”

Plaintiffs alleged, “Once a user downloads the Lensa app from either the AppStore or Google Play and opens the app, they are prompted to agree to the Terms and Conditions and the Privacy Policy, each of which is hyperlinked.”

Plaintiffs then alleged, “Thereafter, every time the app is opened the user is given two options: ‘Add photos’ or ‘Magic Avatars.’ Regardless of which option is chosen, the user cannot proceed without first giving Lensa access to all photos stored on their device.”

The plaintiffs further alleged, “In addition, users discovered that despite Lensa’s Terms of Use mandating a ‘no nudes’ policy, the app would generate sexualized images from images containing nothing but fully-clothed images. Multiple news outlets ran experiments to test this theory, and discovered ‘it’s possible – and way too easy – to use the platform to generate non-consensual soft porn.’ One reporter noted not only that the app generated nude images, but did so even when the photos uploaded were images from her childhood – results which she described as ‘horrifying.’ The same reporter also recounted users receiving avatars which ascribed ‘cartoonishly sexualized features, like sultry poses and gigantic breasts, to their images,’ and anglicized facial features and skin tone for images of people of color.”

The plaintiffs also alleged, “As detailed herein, Defendant has collected, captured, purchased, received through trade or otherwise obtained Plaintiffs’ and Class members’ biometric identifiers or biometric information, without informing Plaintiffs and Class members that a biometric identifier or biometric information was being collected or stored.”

Plaintiffs then alleged that “Defendant intentionally suggests that Defendant deletes Plaintiffs’ and Class members’ biometric data within 24 hours of creating a ‘magic avatar,’ when in fact Plaintiffs’ and Class members’ biometric data is retained indefinitely to train Defendant’s neural network algorithm.”

Plaintiffs additionally alleged, “As detailed herein, Defendant has profited and continues to profit from its collection of Plaintiffs’ and Class members’ biometric identifiers or biometric information, specifically by using such information to improve the Lensa app and, on information and belief, other Prisma products.”

Plaintiffs presented eight claims for relief, including for alleged violation of the Illinois Biometric Information Privacy Act and unjust enrichment.

In the prayer for relief, the plaintiffs requested a judgment for injunctive and declaratory relief. The plaintiffs also requested an award for damages as well as pre- and post- judgment interest.

This is a summary of a legal complaint. All statements, claims, and allegations listed herein reflect the position of the plaintiff only and do not represent the position of UniCourt. Additionally, this case summary may not reflect the current position of the parties to this litigation or the current status of this case. To view the latest case updates and court documents, please sign up for a UniCourt account.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:23-CV-00680

  • Filing Date:

    02/15/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Charles R. Breyer

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Jack Flora

Courtney Owens

D. J.

Nathan Stoner

Eric Matson

Defendant

Prisma Labs, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Thomas M. Hanson

Jon Loevy

Jordan Poole

Mike Kanovitz

 

Court Documents

#11

(#11) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Eric Matson, D. J., Jack Flora, Courtney Owens, Nathan Stoner. Prisma Labs, Inc. served on 3/9/2023, answer due 3/30/2023. (Hanson, Thomas) (Filed on 3/14/2023) (Entered: 03/14/2023)

9 #1

Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording

#9

(#9) ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Charles R. Breyer for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Virginia K. DeMarchi no longer assigned to case, Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(sfb, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/1/2023) (Entered: 03/01/2023)

#6

(#6) CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Jack Flora, D. J., Eric Matson, Courtney Owens, Nathan Stoner.. (Hanson, Thomas) (Filed on 2/28/2023) (Entered: 02/28/2023)

#5

(#5) Summons Issued as to Prisma Labs, Inc.. (tn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/16/2023) (Entered: 02/16/2023)

#4

(#4) Proposed Summons. (Hanson, Thomas) (Filed on 2/16/2023) (Entered: 02/16/2023)

#3

(#3) Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Joint Case Management Statement due by 5/9/2023. Initial Case Management Conference set for 5/16/2023 at 1:30 PM in San Jose, Courtroom 2, 5th Floor. (tn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/16/2023) (Entered: 02/16/2023)

1 #12

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #11

Exhibit 11

1 #10

Exhibit 10

1 #9

Exhibit 9

1 #8

Exhibit 8

1 #7

Exhibit 7

1 #5

Exhibit 5

1 #3

Exhibit 3

1 #2

Exhibit 2

1 #1

Exhibit 1

#1

(#1) CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES AND EQUITABLE RELIEF; DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL against Prisma Labs, Inc., (Filing Fee: $402.00, receipt number ACANDC-17991881). Filed by Eric Matson, D.J., Jack Flora, Courtney Owens, Nathan Matson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Civil Cover Sheet)(Hanson, Thomas) (Filed on 2/15/2023) Modified on 2/16/2023 (tn, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 02/15/2023)

8 More Documents Available
View All Documents

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/14/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Eric Matson, D. J., Jack Flora, Courtney Owens, Nathan Stoner. Prisma Labs, Inc. served on 3/9/2023, answer due 3/30/2023. (Hanson, Thomas) (Filed on 3/14/2023) (Entered: 03/14/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/02/2023
  • Docket(#10) CLERK'S NOTICE: A Joint Case Management Statement due by 5/19/2023. Initial Case Management Conference set for 5/26/2023 at 8:30 AM in San Francisco - To be determined. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ls, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/2/2023) (Entered: 03/02/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/01/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Charles R. Breyer for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Virginia K. DeMarchi no longer assigned to case, Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(sfb, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/1/2023) (Entered: 03/01/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/01/2023
  • Docket(#8) This case will be randomly reassigned to a District Judge outside the San Jose Division pursuant to the Caseload Rebalancing Pilot Program approved by the Court effective March 1, 2018. For information, visit our web page at #https://cand.uscourts.gov/notices/northern-district-extends-caseload-rebalancing-pilot-program/. (sfb, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/1/2023) (Entered: 03/01/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/28/2023
  • Docket(#7) CLERK'S NOTICE of Impending Reassignment to U.S. District Judge. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (amk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/28/2023) (Entered: 02/28/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/28/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Jack Flora, D. J., Eric Matson, Courtney Owens, Nathan Stoner.. (Hanson, Thomas) (Filed on 2/28/2023) (Entered: 02/28/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/16/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Summons Issued as to Prisma Labs, Inc.. (tn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/16/2023) (Entered: 02/16/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/16/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Proposed Summons. (Hanson, Thomas) (Filed on 2/16/2023) (Entered: 02/16/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/16/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Joint Case Management Statement due by 5/9/2023. Initial Case Management Conference set for 5/16/2023 at 1:30 PM in San Jose, Courtroom 2, 5th Floor. (tn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/16/2023) (Entered: 02/16/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/15/2023
  • Docket(#2) Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Virginia K. DeMarchi. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 3/1/2023. (mbc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/15/2023) (Entered: 02/15/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/15/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES AND EQUITABLE RELIEF; DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL against Prisma Labs, Inc., (Filing Fee: $402.00, receipt number ACANDC-17991881). Filed by Eric Matson, D.J., Jack Flora, Courtney Owens, Nathan Matson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Civil Cover Sheet)(Hanson, Thomas) (Filed on 2/15/2023) Modified on 2/16/2023 (tn, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 02/15/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less